Lin v. Solta Medical, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Hsin Lin
Defendant: Bausch Health Americas, Inc. and Solta Medical, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2021cv05062
Filed: June 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J Hamilton
Referring Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2021 Filing 24 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #8 MOTION to Dismiss Based on Lack or Personal Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim filed by Bausch Health Americas, Inc., Solta Medical, Inc.. (Lewis, Ryan) (Filed on 8/27/2021)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE HEARING DATE AND TO EXTEND BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR DEFENDANTS SOLTA MEDICAL, INC. AND BAUSCH HEALTH AMERICAS, INC.S MOTION TO DISMISS BASED ON LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION AND FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #22 Stipulation. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2021)
July 30, 2021 Reset Deadlines as to #8 MOTION to Dismiss Based on Lack or Personal Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim. Opposition due by 8/31/2021. Reply due by 9/14/2021. Motion Hearing set for 10/7/2021 at 01:30 PM - Videoconference Only before Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2021)
July 29, 2021 Filing 22 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE HEARING DATE AND TO EXTEND BRIEFING SCHEDULE re #8 MOTION to Dismiss Based on Lack or Personal Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim, filed by Bausch Health Americas, Inc., Solta Medical, Inc., Hsin Lin. (Lewis, Ryan) (Filed on 7/29/2021) Modified on 7/30/2021 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #20 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to David F. Norden. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2021)
July 23, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for David F. Norden (Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-16208748.) filed by Bausch Health Americas, Inc., Solta Medical, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Norden, David) (Filed on 7/23/2021) Modified on 7/26/2021 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
July 22, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE OF SUBMISSION IN RESPONSE TO STANDING ORDER REGARDING REMOVED CASES by Bausch Health Americas, Inc., Solta Medical, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal (Lewis, Ryan) (Filed on 7/22/2021) Modified on 7/23/2021 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION AND ORDER **AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT** TO EXTEND BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR DEFENDANTS SOLTA MEDICAL, INC. AND BAUSCH HEALTH AMERICAS, INC.S MOTION TO DISMISS BASED ON LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION AND FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM [DKT. 8] by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #17 Stipulation. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2021)
July 22, 2021 Reset Deadlines as to #8 MOTION to Dismiss Based on Lack or Personal Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim. Opposition due by 7/30/2021. Reply due by 8/6/2021. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2021)
July 21, 2021 Filing 17 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO EXTEND BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR DEFENDANTS SOLTA MEDICAL, INC. AND BAUSCH HEALTH AMERICAS, INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS BASED ON LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION AND FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM re #8 MOTION to Dismiss Based on Lack or Personal Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim, filed by Bausch Health Americas, Inc., Solta Medical, Inc., Hsin Lin. (Lewis, Ryan) (Filed on 7/21/2021) Modified on 7/22/2021 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
July 20, 2021 Reset Deadlines as to #8 MOTION to Dismiss Based on Lack or Personal Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim. Motion Hearing set for 9/2/2021 at 01:30 PM - Videoconference Only before Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2021)
July 20, 2021 Filing 16 Renotice motion hearing re #8 MOTION to Dismiss Based on Lack or Personal Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim filed byBausch Health Americas, Inc., Solta Medical, Inc.. (Related document(s) #8 ) (Lewis, Ryan) (Filed on 7/20/2021)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/14/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/21/2021 at 02:00 PM - Videoconference Only. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 7/12/2021. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2021)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case, Signed by The Clerk on 7/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2021)
July 9, 2021 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2021)
July 8, 2021 Filing 12 Proposed Order re #8 MOTION to Dismiss Based on Lack or Personal Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim by Bausch Health Americas, Inc., Solta Medical, Inc.. (Lewis, Ryan) (Filed on 7/8/2021)
July 8, 2021 Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Bausch Health Americas, Inc., Solta Medical, Inc... (Lewis, Ryan) (Filed on 7/8/2021)
July 7, 2021 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANTS Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff and Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 7/14/2021. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2021)
July 7, 2021 Filing 9 Request for Judicial Notice re #8 MOTION to Dismiss Based on Lack or Personal Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim filed byBausch Health Americas, Inc., Solta Medical, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Related document(s) #8 ) (Lewis, Ryan) (Filed on 7/7/2021)
July 7, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss Based on Lack or Personal Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim filed by Bausch Health Americas, Inc., Solta Medical, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/26/2021 01:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Responses due by 7/21/2021. Replies due by 7/28/2021. (Lewis, Ryan) (Filed on 7/7/2021)
July 1, 2021 Filing 7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/22/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/29/2021 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2021)
July 1, 2021 Filing 6 Certificate of Interested Entities by Bausch Health Americas, Inc., Solta Medical, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Bausch Health Companies Inc. for Bausch Health Americas, Inc., Solta Medical, Inc.. re #3 Certificate of Interested Entities, (Lewis, Ryan) (Filed on 7/1/2021)
June 30, 2021 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bausch Health Americas, Inc. (Lewis, Ryan) (Filed on 6/30/2021)
June 30, 2021 Filing 4 ***DISREGARD. ERROR IN FILING SEE DOCKET #5 FOR CORRECTED FILING.*** Corporate Disclosure Statement by Solta Medical, Inc. (Lewis, Ryan) (Filed on 6/30/2021) Modified on 7/1/2021 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
June 30, 2021 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Baush Health Americas, Inc., Solta Medical, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Bausch Health Americas for Bausch Health Americas, Inc., Solta Medical, Inc.. (Lewis, Ryan) (Filed on 6/30/2021) Modified on 7/1/2021 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
June 30, 2021 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/14/2021. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2021)
June 30, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Alameda County Superior Court. Their case number is RG21086292. (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0971-16130873). Filed bySolta Medical, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Ryan A. Lewis in Support of Defendants Solta Medical Clinic and Bausch Health Americas, Inc.'s Notice of Removal Under 28 U.S.C. 1332, 1441, 1446 (DIVERSITY, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Case Cover Sheet)(Lewis, Ryan) (Filed on 6/30/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lin v. Solta Medical, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hsin Lin
Represented By: Carter M. Zinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bausch Health Americas, Inc.
Represented By: Ryan A. Lewis
Represented By: David F. Norden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Solta Medical, Inc.
Represented By: Ryan A. Lewis
Represented By: David F. Norden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?