Cymeyon Hill v. T. Lemon et al
Plaintiff: Cymeyon V. Hill
Defendant: T. Lemon, Sgt Officer M. Celso, Guzman, Lieutenant Maturiono, Jeneffer Weaver and Kimberly Siekiel
Case Number: 4:2021cv05230
Filed: July 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: PSLC GRC
Referring Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2021 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE Acknowledging receipt of case transfer in from CENTRAL DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA, 2:21cv03831JLSE. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
July 7, 2021 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 2:21-cv-03831. Case file, copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Modified on 7/7/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TRANSFERRING ACTION by Judge Josephine L. Staton that this action is hereby transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California and the Clerk of this Court shall effect such transfer. Case transferred electronically. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (jp)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. Within 30 days of the date of this Order, the parties shall show cause in writing, if there be any, why this action should not be transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California on the ground that venue is improper in the Central District of California. Failure timely to respond to this Order to Show Cause may result in the transfer of the action. (vmun)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Re REQUEST to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support #2 by Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. IT IS ORDERED that the Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is hereby GRANTED. (vmun)
May 6, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and referred to Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (et)
May 4, 2021 Filing 2 REQUEST to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Cymeyolvv Hill. (et)
May 4, 2021 Filing 1 CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed against Defendants M. Celso (individual), M. Celso (Sgt. Officer in Facility Sand 6 Block, official capacity), Guzman(individual), Guzman (official capacity), T. Lemon (official capacity), T. Lemon (individual), Maturiono (official capacity), Maturiono (individual), Kimberly Siekiel, Jeneffer Weaver pursuant to 42:1983. Case assigned to Judge Josephine L. Staton and referred to Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick., filed by Plaintiff Cymeyolvv Hill. (et)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cymeyon Hill v. T. Lemon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cymeyon V. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Lemon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt Officer M. Celso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lieutenant Maturiono
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeneffer Weaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly Siekiel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?