Hill v. Rivera et al
Plaintiff: Cymeyon V. Hill
Defendant: M. Rivera, C. Martinez, Emily Perez and Case Manager Macias
Case Number: 4:2021cv05638
Filed: July 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: PSLC GRC
Referring Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Change of Address by Cymeyon V. Hill. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jlgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2021)
August 13, 2021 Filing 5 Truth Affidavit from Cymeyon Hill. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2021)
August 13, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Cymeyon V. Hill. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2021)
August 13, 2021 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Macias, C. Martinez, Emily Perez, M. Rivera. Filed byCymeyon V. Hill. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2021)
July 26, 2021 Copy of blank IFP Application with case number mailed to plaintiff via US Mail. (jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2021)
July 23, 2021 Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 8/30/2021. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
July 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Macias, C. Martinez, Emily Perez, M. Rivera (FEE NOT PAID). Filed byCymeyon V. Hill. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hill v. Rivera et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cymeyon V. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emily Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Case Manager Macias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?