Kraft Heinz Foods Company v. Agri Stats, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Kraft Heinz Foods Company
Defendant: Agri Stats, Inc., Clemens Food Group, LLC, The Clemens Family Corporation, JBS USA Food Company, Seaboard Foods LLC, Smithfield Foods, Inc., Triumph Foods, LLC, Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc. and Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2021cv05684
Filed: July 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the District of Minnesota.Signed by MDL Panel on 8/19/2021. (bnsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2021)
August 19, 2021 Remark- Case transferred from California Northern has been opened in U.S. District of Minnesota as case 0:21-cv-01872. (bnsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2021)
August 12, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Jack G. Stern (Stern, Jack) (Filed on 8/12/2021)
August 12, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Philip J Iovieno (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 8/12/2021)
August 12, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas A. Gravante, Jr (Gravante, Nicholas) (Filed on 8/12/2021)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr granting #11 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Philip J. Iovieno. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2021)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #12 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Jack Stern. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2021)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #10 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Nicholas A. Gravante, Jr. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2021)
August 5, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Jack Stern ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-16254980.) filed by Kraft Heinz Foods Company. (Stern, Jack) (Filed on 8/5/2021)
August 5, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Philip J. Iovieno ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-16254900.) filed by Kraft Heinz Foods Company. (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 8/5/2021)
August 5, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Nicholas A. Gravante, Jr. ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-16254636.) filed by Kraft Heinz Foods Company. (Gravante, Nicholas) (Filed on 8/5/2021)
July 29, 2021 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE. Notice is hereby given that a Case Management Conference has been set for October 26, 2021, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m., in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA. Case Management Statement due by October 19th. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. All future filings should reflect the case number as 4:21-cv-05684-HSG. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2021)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson no longer assigned to case,. Signed by The Clerk on 7/28/21. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2021)
July 28, 2021 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2021)
July 28, 2021 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Kraft Heinz Foods Company.. (Dickerson, Robert) (Filed on 7/28/2021)
July 26, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Agri Stats, Inc., Clemens Food Group, LLC, JBS USA Food Company, Seaboard Foods LLC, Smithfield Foods, Inc., The Clemens Family Corporation, Triumph Foods, LLC, Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc., Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc.. (elyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2021)
July 26, 2021 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/14/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/21/2021 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (elyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2021)
July 23, 2021 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/6/2021. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2021)
July 23, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Dickerson, Robert) (Filed on 7/23/2021)
July 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-16212232.). Filed byKraft Heinz Foods Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dickerson, Robert) (Filed on 7/23/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kraft Heinz Foods Company v. Agri Stats, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kraft Heinz Foods Company
Represented By: Robert William Dickerson
Represented By: Jack G. Stern
Represented By: Nicholas A. Gravante, Jr.
Represented By: Philip J Iovieno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Agri Stats, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clemens Food Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Clemens Family Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JBS USA Food Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seaboard Foods LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smithfield Foods, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Triumph Foods, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyson Foods, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?