National Family Farm Coalition et al v. Vilsack et al
Plaintiff: National Family Farm Coalition, Center for Food Safety, Pesticide Action Network North America, Center for Environmental Health, Friends of the Earth and Center for Biological Diversity
Defendant: Tom Vilsack, Kevin M. Shea, US Department of Agriculture and Animal and Plant Health Inspection Service
Case Number: 4:2021cv05695
Filed: July 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Kandis A Westmore
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Robert Healy (Healy, Christopher) (Filed on 9/22/2021)
September 21, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Krystal-Rose Perez (Perez, Krystal-Rose) (Filed on 9/21/2021)
September 21, 2021 Filing 17 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 10/5/2021. (wft, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2021)
September 21, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert M. Norway (Norway, Robert) (Filed on 9/21/2021)
August 16, 2021 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Pesticide Action Network North America, Center for Food Safety, Center for Environmental Health, National Family Farm Coalition, Center for Biological Diversity, Friends of the Earth. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Leonard, Audrey) (Filed on 8/16/2021)
August 9, 2021 Filing 14 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Center for Biological Diversity, Center for Environmental Health, Center for Food Safety, Friends of the Earth, National Family Farm Coalition, Pesticide Action Network North America.. (Leonard, Audrey) (Filed on 8/9/2021)
July 28, 2021 Filing 13 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/19/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/26/2021 01:30 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. (arkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2021)
July 28, 2021 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Animal and Plant Health Inspection Service, Kevin M. Shea, US Department of Agriculture, Tom Vilsack, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (arkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2021)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore Granting #8 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2021)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore Granting #7 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2021)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore Granting #6 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2021)
July 26, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-16217580.) filed by Center for Biological Diversity, Center for Environmental Health, Center for Food Safety, Friends of the Earth, National Family Farm Coalition, Pesticide Action Network North America. (Attachments: #1 Cert. of Good Standing)(Kimbrell, George) (Filed on 7/26/2021)
July 26, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-16217508.) filed by Center for Biological Diversity, Center for Environmental Health, Center for Food Safety, Friends of the Earth, National Family Farm Coalition, Pesticide Action Network North America. (Attachments: #1 Cert. of Good Standing)(van Saun, Amy) (Filed on 7/26/2021)
July 26, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-16217369.) filed by Center for Biological Diversity, Center for Environmental Health, Center for Food Safety, Friends of the Earth, National Family Farm Coalition, Pesticide Action Network North America. (Attachments: #1 Cert. of Good Standing)(Leonard, Audrey) (Filed on 7/26/2021)
July 26, 2021 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Center for Biological Diversity, Center for Environmental Health, Center for Food Safety, Friends of the Earth, National Family Farm Coalition, Pesticide Action Network North America (Stevenson, Meredith) (Filed on 7/26/2021)
July 26, 2021 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Entities by Center for Biological Diversity, Center for Environmental Health, Center for Food Safety, Friends of the Earth, National Family Farm Coalition, Pesticide Action Network North America (Stevenson, Meredith) (Filed on 7/26/2021)
July 26, 2021 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Stevenson, Meredith) (Filed on 7/26/2021)
July 26, 2021 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/9/2021. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2021)
July 26, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-16215903.). Filed byPesticide Action Network North America, Center for Food Safety, Center for Environmental Health, National Family Farm Coalition, Center for Biological Diversity, Friends of the Earth. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stevenson, Meredith) (Filed on 7/26/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: National Family Farm Coalition et al v. Vilsack et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Family Farm Coalition
Represented By: Audrey Leonard
Represented By: Amy L. van Saun
Represented By: George Andreas Kimbrell
Represented By: Meredith Lee Stevenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center for Food Safety
Represented By: Audrey Leonard
Represented By: Amy L. van Saun
Represented By: George Andreas Kimbrell
Represented By: Meredith Lee Stevenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pesticide Action Network North America
Represented By: Audrey Leonard
Represented By: Amy L. van Saun
Represented By: George Andreas Kimbrell
Represented By: Meredith Lee Stevenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center for Environmental Health
Represented By: Audrey Leonard
Represented By: Amy L. van Saun
Represented By: George Andreas Kimbrell
Represented By: Meredith Lee Stevenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Friends of the Earth
Represented By: Audrey Leonard
Represented By: Amy L. van Saun
Represented By: George Andreas Kimbrell
Represented By: Meredith Lee Stevenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center for Biological Diversity
Represented By: Audrey Leonard
Represented By: Amy L. van Saun
Represented By: George Andreas Kimbrell
Represented By: Meredith Lee Stevenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Vilsack
Represented By: Christopher Robert Healy
Represented By: Krystal-Rose Perez
Represented By: Robert M. Norway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin M. Shea
Represented By: Christopher Robert Healy
Represented By: Krystal-Rose Perez
Represented By: Robert M. Norway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Department of Agriculture
Represented By: Christopher Robert Healy
Represented By: Krystal-Rose Perez
Represented By: Robert M. Norway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Animal and Plant Health Inspection Service
Represented By: Christopher Robert Healy
Represented By: Krystal-Rose Perez
Represented By: Robert M. Norway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?