Poorsina v. Gutierrez et al
Plaintiff: Ali R. Poorsina and Ali Poorsina
Defendant: Jose Javier Gutierrez, Mark R. Hartney and Kent W. Toland
Case Number: 4:2021cv05749
Filed: July 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1391
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER DISMISSING CASE FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION. Civil case terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 9/9/2021. (dmrlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2021)
August 27, 2021 Filing 17 REPLY (re #10 MOTION for Joinder in Motion of Defendant Jose Javier Gutierrez to Dismiss Complaint for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction) filed by Ali Poorsina. (Poorsina, Ali) (Filed on 8/27/2021) Modified on 8/27/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 AMENDED ORDER to Show Cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 8/26/2021. (dmrlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2021)
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PLEASE DISREGARD DOCKET ENTRY #15 , FILED IN ERROR. SEE AMENDED ORDER DOCKET ENTRY #16 INSTEAD. ORDER to Show Cause. By September 8, 2021, Plaintiff shall respond in writing and show cause as to why this case should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Plaintiff need not file an opposition to the pending motion to dismiss unless the court later permits him to do so. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 8/25/2021. (dmrlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2021) Modified on 8/26/2021 (ig, COURT STAFF).
August 25, 2021 Filing 14 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Jose Javier Gutierrez.. (Toland, Kent) (Filed on 8/25/2021)
August 25, 2021 Filing 13 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Mark R. Hartney, Kent W. Toland.. (Marino, Matthew) (Filed on 8/25/2021)
August 24, 2021 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE TO DEFENDANTS MARK R. HARTNEY AND KENT W. TOLAND Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants Mark R. Hartney and Kent W. Toland shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 8/31/2021. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 24, 2021 Filing 11 Certificate of Interested Entities by Mark R. Hartney, Kent W. Toland identifying Other Affiliate Allen Matkins Leck Gamble Mallory & Natsis LLP for Kent W. Toland, Mark R. Hartney. (Marino, Matthew) (Filed on 8/24/2021)
August 24, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Joinder in Motion of Defendant Jose Javier Gutierrez to Dismiss Complaint for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by Mark R. Hartney, Kent W. Toland. (Marino, Matthew) (Filed on 8/24/2021)
August 24, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Joseph Marino (Marino, Matthew) (Filed on 8/24/2021)
August 24, 2021 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE TO DEFENDANT JOSE JAVIER GUTIERREZ Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant Jose Javier Gutierrez shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 8/31/2021. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 23, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Jose Javier Gutierrez. Motion Hearing set for 9/30/2021 01:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Responses due by 9/7/2021. Replies due by 9/14/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Defendant Jose Javier Gutierrez's Motion to Dismiss, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Toland, Kent) (Filed on 8/23/2021) Modified on 8/24/2021 (bnsS, COURT STAFF).
August 9, 2021 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Ali Poorsina.. (Poorsina, Ali) (Filed on 8/9/2021)
August 5, 2021 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Ali Poorsina.. (Poorsina, Ali) (Filed on 8/5/2021)
August 3, 2021 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ali Poorsina served with process server (Poorsina, Ali) (Filed on 8/3/2021)
July 27, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Jose Javier Gutierrez, Mark R. Hartney. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2021)
July 27, 2021 Filing 2 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/27/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/3/2021 01:30 PM. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
July 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jose Javier Gutierrez, Mark R. Hartney, Kent W. Toland (Filing fee $ 402, Receipt # 34611155429.). Filed byAli R. Poorsina. Consent/Declination due by 8/10/2021. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Receipt for filing fee)(mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Poorsina v. Gutierrez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ali R. Poorsina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ali Poorsina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Javier Gutierrez
Represented By: Kent William Toland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark R. Hartney
Represented By: Matthew Joseph Marino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kent W. Toland
Represented By: Matthew Joseph Marino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?