Strezsak v. Ardelyx Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Steven Strezsak
Defendant: Ardelyx Inc., Mike Raab and Justin Renz
Petitioner: Chad Bryant, Richard Bryant, City of Pontiac General Employees' Retirement System, Mark Allen, Miami Firefighters' Relief & Pension Fund, Peifa Xu and Jatin Malhotra
Case Number: 4:2021cv05868
Filed: July 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2021 Filing 47 Certificate of Interested Entities by Jatin Malhotra Pursuant to LR 3-15 (Jasnoch, John) (Filed on 9/28/2021)
September 28, 2021 Filing 46 CERTIFICATE of Counsel Pursuant to Local Rule 3-7(d) by John T. Jasnoch on behalf of Jatin Malhotra (Jasnoch, John) (Filed on 9/28/2021)
September 28, 2021 Filing 45 Declaration of John T. Jasnoch in Support of #43 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel and Memorandum of Law In Support Thereof filed byJatin Malhotra. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - PSLRA Notice, #2 Exhibit B - Movant's PSLRA Certification, #3 Exhibit C- Declaration of Movant, #4 Exhibit D - Movant's Loss Chart, #5 Exhibit E - Scott+Scott Resume)(Related document(s) #43 ) (Jasnoch, John) (Filed on 9/28/2021)
September 28, 2021 Filing 44 Certificate of Interested Entities by Peifa Xu re #40 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel (Pafiti, Jennifer) (Filed on 9/28/2021)
September 28, 2021 Filing 43 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel and Memorandum of Law In Support Thereof filed by Jatin Malhotra. Motion Hearing set for 2/3/2022 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr.. Responses due by 10/12/2021. Replies due by 10/19/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jasnoch, John) (Filed on 9/28/2021)
September 28, 2021 Filing 42 CERTIFICATE of Counsel re #40 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel by Jennifer Pafiti on behalf of Peifa Xu (Pafiti, Jennifer) (Filed on 9/28/2021)
September 28, 2021 Filing 41 CERTIFICATE of Counsel of Constantine P. Economides by Ivy T. Ngo on behalf of Mark Allen (Ngo, Ivy) (Filed on 9/28/2021)
September 28, 2021 Filing 40 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed by Peifa Xu. Motion Hearing set for 2/3/2022 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr.. Responses due by 10/12/2021. Replies due by 10/19/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Jennifer Pafiti, #3 Exhibit A - Assignment, #4 Exhibit B - Loss Chart, #5 Exhibit C - Press Release, #6 Exhibit D - Certification, #7 Exhibit E - Movant Declaration, #8 Exhibit F - Firm Resume)(Pafiti, Jennifer) (Filed on 9/28/2021)
September 28, 2021 Filing 39 CERTIFICATE of Counsel by Ivy T. Ngo on behalf of Mark Allen (Ngo, Ivy) (Filed on 9/28/2021)
September 28, 2021 Filing 38 Declaration of Ivy T. Ngo in Support of #37 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed byMark Allen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (PSLRA Cert), #2 Exhibit B (Loss Chart), #3 Exhibit C (Allen Declaration), #4 Exhibit D (Firm Resume), #5 Exhibit E ( PSLRA Notice))(Related document(s) #37 ) (Ngo, Ivy) (Filed on 9/28/2021)
September 28, 2021 Filing 37 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed by Mark Allen. Motion Hearing set for 10/28/2021 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr.. Responses due by 10/12/2021. Replies due by 10/19/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ngo, Ivy) (Filed on 9/28/2021)
September 28, 2021 Filing 36 CERTIFICATE of Counsel by Takeo A Kellar on behalf of Miami Firefighters' Relief & Pension Fund (Kellar, Takeo) (Filed on 9/28/2021)
September 28, 2021 Filing 35 CERTIFICATE of Counsel by Ian David Berg on behalf of Miami Firefighters' Relief & Pension Fund (Berg, Ian) (Filed on 9/28/2021)
September 28, 2021 Filing 34 Certificate of Interested Entities by Miami Firefighters' Relief & Pension Fund (Berg, Ian) (Filed on 9/28/2021)
September 28, 2021 Filing 33 Declaration of Ian D. Berg in Support of #32 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel , MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed byMiami Firefighters' Relief & Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certification, #2 Exhibit B - Notice, #3 Exhibit C - Firm Resume)(Related document(s) #32 ) (Berg, Ian) (Filed on 9/28/2021)
September 28, 2021 Filing 32 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel , MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Miami Firefighters' Relief & Pension Fund. Motion Hearing set for 1/27/2022 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr.. Responses due by 10/12/2021. Replies due by 10/19/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Berg, Ian) (Filed on 9/28/2021)
September 28, 2021 Filing 31 Certificate of Interested Entities by Mark Allen Pursuant to LR 3-15 (Ngo, Ivy) (Filed on 9/28/2021)
September 28, 2021 Filing 30 CERTIFICATE of Counsel Pursuant to Local Rule 3-7(d) by Juan Carlos Sanchez on behalf of City of Pontiac General Employees' Retirement System (Sanchez, Juan) (Filed on 9/28/2021)
September 28, 2021 Filing 29 CERTIFICATE of Counsel Pursuant to Local Rule 3-7(d) by Michael Albert on behalf of City of Pontiac General Employees' Retirement System (Albert, Michael) (Filed on 9/28/2021)
September 28, 2021 Filing 28 CERTIFICATE of Counsel Pursuant to Local Rule 3-7(d) by Danielle Suzanne Myers on behalf of City of Pontiac General Employees' Retirement System (Myers, Danielle) (Filed on 9/28/2021)
September 28, 2021 Filing 27 CERTIFICATE of Counsel Pursuant to Local Rule 3-7(d) by Shawn A. Williams on behalf of City of Pontiac General Employees' Retirement System (Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 9/28/2021)
September 28, 2021 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE of Counsel Pursuant to Local Rule 3-7(d) by Jennifer N. Caringal on behalf of City of Pontiac General Employees' Retirement System (Caringal, Jennifer) (Filed on 9/28/2021)
September 28, 2021 Filing 25 Certificate of Interested Entities by City of Pontiac General Employees' Retirement System (Caringal, Jennifer) (Filed on 9/28/2021)
September 28, 2021 Filing 24 Declaration of Jennifer N. Caringal in Support of #23 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel ; Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof filed byCity of Pontiac General Employees' Retirement System. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) #23 ) (Caringal, Jennifer) (Filed on 9/28/2021)
September 28, 2021 Filing 23 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel ; Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof filed by City of Pontiac General Employees' Retirement System. Motion Hearing set for 1/27/2022 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr.. Responses due by 10/12/2021. Replies due by 10/19/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Caringal, Jennifer) (Filed on 9/28/2021)
September 28, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer N. Caringal (Caringal, Jennifer) (Filed on 9/28/2021)
September 28, 2021 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE of Counsel of Kristen O'Connor by Brett M. Middleton on behalf of Chad Bryant, Richard Bryant (Middleton, Brett) (Filed on 9/28/2021)
September 28, 2021 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE of Counsel of Frank J. Johnson by Brett M. Middleton on behalf of Chad Bryant, Richard Bryant (Middleton, Brett) (Filed on 9/28/2021)
September 28, 2021 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE of Counsel by Brett M. Middleton on behalf of Chad Bryant, Richard Bryant (Middleton, Brett) (Filed on 9/28/2021)
September 28, 2021 Filing 18 Certificate of Interested Entities by Chad Bryant, Richard Bryant (Middleton, Brett) (Filed on 9/28/2021)
September 28, 2021 Filing 17 Declaration of Brett M. Middleton in Support of #16 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed byChad Bryant, Richard Bryant. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Related document(s) #16 ) (Middleton, Brett) (Filed on 9/28/2021)
September 28, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel , MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Chad Bryant, Richard Bryant. Motion Hearing set for 2/3/2022 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr.. Responses due by 10/12/2021. Replies due by 10/19/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Middleton, Brett) (Filed on 9/28/2021)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #11 Stipulation Extending Time To Respond To Complaint And Continuing Case Management Conference Deadlines. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2021)
August 20, 2021 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Steven Strezsak. Service waived by Ardelyx Inc. waiver sent on 8/6/2021, answer due 10/5/2021. (Jasnoch, John) (Filed on 8/20/2021)
August 20, 2021 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Steven Strezsak. Service waived by Mike Raab waiver sent on 8/6/2021, answer due 10/5/2021. (Jasnoch, John) (Filed on 8/20/2021)
August 20, 2021 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Steven Strezsak. Service waived by Justin Renz waiver sent on 8/6/2021, answer due 10/5/2021. (Jasnoch, John) (Filed on 8/20/2021)
August 20, 2021 Filing 11 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Time To Respond To Complaint And Continuing Case Management Conference Deadlines filed by Ardelyx Inc., Mike Raab, Justin Renz and Steven Strezsak. (Rawlinson, Matthew) (Filed on 8/20/2021) Modified on 8/23/2021 (bnsS, COURT STAFF).
August 20, 2021 Filing 10 Certificate of Interested Entities by Ardelyx Inc., Mike Raab, Justin Renz (Rawlinson, Matthew) (Filed on 8/20/2021)
August 20, 2021 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ardelyx Inc., Mike Raab, Justin Renz (Rawlinson, Matthew) (Filed on 8/20/2021)
August 20, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Robert Gherardi (Gherardi, Daniel) (Filed on 8/20/2021)
August 20, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Melanie Marilyn Blunschi (Blunschi, Melanie) (Filed on 8/20/2021)
August 20, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Rawlinson (Rawlinson, Matthew) (Filed on 8/20/2021)
August 2, 2021 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/26/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/2/2021 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor. (bnsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2021)
August 2, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Ardelyx Inc., Mike Raab, Justin Renz. (bnsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2021)
July 30, 2021 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2021)
July 30, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Jasnoch, John) (Filed on 7/30/2021)
July 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Ardelyx Inc., Mike Raab, Justin Renz ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-16233931.). Filed bySteven Strezsak. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Strezsak PSLRA Cert, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Jasnoch, John) (Filed on 7/30/2021) Modified on 8/2/2021 (bnsS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strezsak v. Ardelyx Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Strezsak
Represented By: John T. Jasnoch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ardelyx Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Rawlinson
Represented By: Daniel Robert Gherardi
Represented By: Melanie Marilyn Blunschi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Raab
Represented By: Matthew Rawlinson
Represented By: Daniel Robert Gherardi
Represented By: Melanie Marilyn Blunschi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Renz
Represented By: Matthew Rawlinson
Represented By: Daniel Robert Gherardi
Represented By: Melanie Marilyn Blunschi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Chad Bryant
Represented By: Brett M. Middleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Richard Bryant
Represented By: Brett M. Middleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: City of Pontiac General Employees' Retirement System
Represented By: Danielle Suzanne Myers
Represented By: Jennifer N. Caringal
Represented By: Juan Carlos Sanchez
Represented By: Michael Albert
Represented By: Shawn A. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mark Allen
Represented By: Ivy T. Ngo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Miami Firefighters' Relief & Pension Fund
Represented By: Ian David Berg
Represented By: Takeo A Kellar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Peifa Xu
Represented By: Jennifer Pafiti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jatin Malhotra
Represented By: John T. Jasnoch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?