Aniel v. PHH Mortgage Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Erlinda Abibas Aniel
Defendant: PHH Mortgage Corporation, PHH Mortgage Services, Western Progressive LLC, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC and Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2021cv06071
Filed: August 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2021 Filing 21 REPLY (re #15 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities ) filed byMortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, PHH Mortgage Corporation, Western Progressive LLC. (Barasch, Adam) (Filed on 10/4/2021)
October 1, 2021 Filing 20 ADR Clerk's Notice Setting Early Assessment ADR Phone Conference in Mortgage Foreclosure Case on Thursday, October 14, 2021, at 2:00 PM Pacific time. Please note that you must be logged into an ECF account of counsel of record in order to view this document. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Order Referring Case to ADR for Telephone Conference. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 10/1/2021. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2021)
September 27, 2021 Filing 18 Request for Judicial Notice re #17 Opposition/Response to Motion in Support of Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed byErlinda Abibas Aniel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Related document(s) #17 ) (Aniel, Erlinda) (Filed on 9/27/2021)
September 27, 2021 Filing 17 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #15 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities ) filed byErlinda Abibas Aniel. (Aniel, Erlinda) (Filed on 9/27/2021)
September 13, 2021 Filing 16 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Dismiss (Barasch, Adam) (Filed on 9/13/2021)
September 13, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, PHH Mortgage Corporation, Western Progressive LLC. Motion Hearing set for 10/26/2021 02:00 PM before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Responses due by 9/27/2021. Replies due by 10/4/2021. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibits to Request for Judicial Notice)(Barasch, Adam) (Filed on 9/13/2021)
August 31, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by PHH Mortgage Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 10/26/2021 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Responses due by 9/14/2021. Replies due by 9/21/2021. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Defendants Motion to Dismiss the Complaint of Plaintiff Erlinda Abibas Aniel, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Barasch, Adam) (Filed on 8/31/2021)
August 30, 2021 Filing 13 Letter from Plaintiff re: Service of Summons on Defendant Western . (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Aniel, Erlinda) (Filed on 8/30/2021)
August 26, 2021 Filing 12 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT (with jury demand) against Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, PHH Mortgage Corporation, Western Progressive LLC. Filed by Erlinda Abibas Aniel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2021) Modified on 8/27/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
August 19, 2021 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Western Progressive LLC. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2021)
August 19, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Erlinda Abibas Aniel. Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. served on 8/17/2021, answer due 9/7/2021. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2021)
August 10, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Erlinda Abibas Aniel. Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC served on 8/9/2021, answer due 8/30/2021; PHH Mortgage Corporation served on 8/9/2021, answer due 8/30/2021; Western Progressive LLC served on 8/9/2021, answer due 8/30/2021. (Attachments: #1 Western Progressive LLC, #2 PHH Mortgage Corporation)(cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2021)
August 10, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Court Approval of Plaintiff's Recording of a Notice of Pendency (Lis Pendens) Pursuant to CCP 405.21 filed by Erlinda Abibas Aniel. Responses due by 8/24/2021. Replies due by 8/31/2021. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2021)
August 6, 2021 Filing 7 Remark : copy of Order at Dkt. 6 emailed to plaintiff and mailed US Mail to plaintiff. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2021)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying #2 Motion for TRO. (cwlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2021)
August 6, 2021 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Case Management Statement due by 11/1/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/8/2021 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Notice of eligibility for video recording)(wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 6, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, PHH Mortgage Corporation, Western Progressive LLC. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2021)
August 6, 2021 Filing 3 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Erlinda Abibas Aniel. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2021)
August 6, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. Emergency Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause; Memorandum of Points and Authorities, filed by Erlinda Abibas Aniel. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2021)
August 6, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (with jury demand) against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402, receipt 34611155592). Filed by Erlinda Abibas Aniel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Receipt)(wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2021) Modified on 8/6/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aniel v. PHH Mortgage Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHH Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Adam Neil Barasch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHH Mortgage Services
Represented By: Adam Neil Barasch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Progressive LLC
Represented By: Adam Neil Barasch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Adam Neil Barasch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Adam Neil Barasch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erlinda Abibas Aniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?