Busby v. United Airlines, Inc.
Plaintiff: Cheryl Ann Busby
Defendant: United Airlines, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2021cv06084
Filed: August 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacqueline Darlene DeWarr (DeWarr, Jacqueline) (Filed on 9/28/2021)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE :Joint Case Management Statement due by 11/10/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/17/2021 03:00 PM in Oakland, - Telephonic Only. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 8/20/2021. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order)(amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case, Signed by the Clerk on 8/19/2021. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 18, 2021 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 18, 2021 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United Airlines, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, #6 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge, #5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, #2 Certificate of Interested Entities, 4 Case Assigned by Intake,,, #3 Certificate of Interested Entities (Cutler, Michael) (Filed on 8/18/2021)
August 17, 2021 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by United Airlines, Inc... (Cutler, Michael) (Filed on 8/17/2021)
August 9, 2021 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/10/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/17/2021 01:30 PM. (bnsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 9, 2021 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by United Airlines, Inc.. (bnsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2021)
August 6, 2021 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/20/2021. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2021)
August 6, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by United Airlines, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent United Airlines Holdings, Inc. for United Airlines, Inc.. (Lazenby, Richard) (Filed on 8/6/2021)
August 6, 2021 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by United Airlines, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent United Airlines Holdings, Inc. for United Airlines, Inc.. (Lazenby, Richard) (Filed on 8/6/2021)
August 6, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Mateo Superor Court. Their case number is 20-CIV-03655. (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0971-16259989). Filed byUnited Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lazenby, Richard) (Filed on 8/6/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Busby v. United Airlines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl Ann Busby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Airlines, Inc.
Represented By: Richard Anthony Lazenby
Represented By: Michael Cutler
Represented By: Jacqueline Darlene DeWarr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?