Center for Environmental Health et al v. Regan
Plaintiff: Center for Environmental Health, Sierra Club and Center For Biological Diversity
Defendant: Michael S. Regan
Case Number: 4:2021cv06166
Filed: August 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Joseph C Spero
Referring Judge: Jon S Tigar
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 7604
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Leslie M. Hill (Hill, Leslie) (Filed on 9/10/2021)
August 30, 2021 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Center for Environmental Health, Center For Biological Diversity, Sierra Club. (Ukeiley, Robert) (Filed on 8/30/2021)
August 30, 2021 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Center for Environmental Health, Center For Biological Diversity, Sierra Club. (Ukeiley, Robert) (Filed on 8/30/2021)
August 30, 2021 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Center for Environmental Health, Center For Biological Diversity, Sierra Club. Michael S. Regan served on 8/18/2021, answer due 10/18/2021. (Ukeiley, Robert) (Filed on 8/30/2021)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #4 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Robert Ukeiley.(mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2021)
August 27, 2021 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 11/23/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/30/2021 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jst Court Appearances: Adv anced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. One list of names of all counsel appearing for all parties must be sent in one email to the CRD at JSTCRD@cand.uscourts.gov no later than November 29, 2021 by 2:00 p.m.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts. gov/zoom/. Case Management Statement due by 11/23/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/30/2021 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2021)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 08/27/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2021)
August 26, 2021 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2021)
August 24, 2021 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Center For Biological Diversity, Center for Environmental Health, Sierra Club.. (Evans, Jonathan) (Filed on 8/24/2021)
August 12, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Michael S. Regan. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2021)
August 12, 2021 Filing 7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/5/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/12/2021 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2021)
August 11, 2021 Filing 6 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/25/2021. (asS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2021)
August 11, 2021 Filing 5 Civil Cover Sheet by Center For Biological Diversity, Center for Environmental Health, Sierra Club Re: #1 Complaint. (Evans, Jonathan) (Filed on 8/11/2021)
August 11, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-16271687.) filed by Center For Biological Diversity, Center for Environmental Health, Sierra Club. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Ukeiley, Robert) (Filed on 8/11/2021)
August 11, 2021 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Center For Biological Diversity, Center for Environmental Health, Sierra Club (Evans, Jonathan) (Filed on 8/11/2021)
August 11, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Evans, Jonathan) (Filed on 8/11/2021)
August 11, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against Michael S. Regan ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-16271276.). Filed byCenter for Environmental Health, Center For Biological Diversity, Sierra Club. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Evans, Jonathan) (Filed on 8/11/2021)
August 11, 2021 #Electronic filing error. Please resubmit Civil Cover Sheet. Use October 2020 version which can be downloaded from https://cand.uscourts.gov/. No judge assignment will be made unti l the document is e-filed. Submit your document using Civil Events > Other Filings > Other Documents > Civil Cover Sheet Re: #1 Complaint, filed by Center for Environmental Health, Sierra Club, Center For Biological Diversity (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Center for Environmental Health et al v. Regan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center for Environmental Health
Represented By: Robert Ukeiley
Represented By: Jonathan Carter Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sierra Club
Represented By: Robert Ukeiley
Represented By: Jonathan Carter Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center For Biological Diversity
Represented By: Robert Ukeiley
Represented By: Jonathan Carter Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael S. Regan
Represented By: Leslie M. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?