Walsh et al v. Gilead Sciences, Inc.
Plaintiff: Barbara Walsh, Charles Sanchez, Charles Antonelli, Christophe Lee Jones, Dana Diamond, Donnavon Morgan, Franki Valle, Genoux Baez, Glora Freeman, Jimmy J. Melendez, Joel K. Vinson, Kelvin Hilton, Linda Perry, Luis Grisales, Michael Watt, Nancy Duncan, Raymond Knight, Raymond Hayes, Robert Morea, Roberto Gabrielle, Timmy Masa, Victor Chapman and Walter S. Banks, Jr.
Defendant: Gilead Sciences Inc
Case Number: 4:2021cv06184
Filed: August 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
Presiding Judge: Jon S Tigar
Referring Judge: Kandis A Westmore
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER REGARDING DISMISSAL OF CLAIMS AND RESPONSIVE PLEADINGS by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting (792) Stipulation in case 4:18-cv-06972-JST; granting (21) Stipulation in case 4:21-cv-06184-JST; granting (13) Stipulation in case 4:21-cv-06458-JST; granting (13) Stipulation in case 4:21-cv-06461-JST; granting (30) Stipulation in case 4:21-cv-06574-JST; granting (21) Stipulation in case 4:21-cv-06581-JST; granting (26) Stipulation in case 4:21-cv-06658-JST; granting (22) Stipulation in case 4:21-cv-06807-JST; granting (10) Stipulation in case 4:21-cv-06822-JST; granting (20) Stipulation in case 4:21-cv-06947-JST; granting (9) Stipulation in case 4:21-cv-07017-JST. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2021)
September 30, 2021 Filing 21 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Dismissal of Claims and Responsive Pleadings filed by Gilead Sciences Inc. (Anderson, Joshua) (Filed on 9/30/2021)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES FOR PRETRIAL PURPOSES. Motions terminated: (20 in 4:21-cv-06807-JST) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re (18) Order Relating Case,,, Terminate Motions,, filed by Gilead Sciences Inc, (7 in 4:21-cv-07017-JST) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re (5) Order Relating Case,,, Terminate Motions,, filed by Gilead Sciences, Inc., (11 in 4:21-cv-06458-JST) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re (9) Order Relating Case,,, Terminate Motions,, filed by Gilead Sciences, Inc., (18 in 4:21-cv-06947-JST) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re (16) Order Relating Case,,, Terminate Motions,, filed by Gilead Sciences Inc, (28 in 4:21-cv-06574-JST) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re (26) Order Relating Case,,, Terminate Motions,, filed by Gilead Sciences Inc, (790 in 4:18-cv-06972-JST) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re (788) Order Relating Case,,, Terminate Motions,, filed by Gilead Sciences, Inc., (24 in 4:21-cv-06658-JST) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re (22) Order Relating Case,,, Terminate Motions,, filed by Gilead Sciences Inc, (19 in 4:21-cv-06581-JST) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re (17) Order Relating Case,,, Terminate Motions,, filed by Gilead Sciences Inc, (8 in 4:21-cv-06822-JST) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re (6) Order Relating Case,,, Terminate Motions,, filed by Gilead Sciences, Inc., (11 in 4:21-cv-06461-JST) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re (9) Order Relating Case,,, Terminate Motions,, filed by Gilead Sciences Inc, (19 in 4:21-cv-06184-JST) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re (17) Order Relating Case,,, Terminate Motions,, filed by Gilead Sciences Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 29, 2021. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2021)
September 29, 2021 Filing 19 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #17 Order Relating Case,,, Terminate Motions,, filed by Gilead Sciences Inc. (Anderson, Joshua) (Filed on 9/29/2021)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 9/28/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2021)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER RELATING CASES. Motions terminated: (785 in 4:18-cv-06972-JST) Joint ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related filed by Adrian Holley, (787 in 4:18-cv-06972-JST) Amended ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related filed by Adrian Holley, (784 in 4:18-cv-06972-JST) Joint ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related filed by Adrian Holley. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 27, 2021. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2021)
August 11, 2021 Filing 16 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/2/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/9/2021 01:30 PM in Oakland, - To be determined. (elyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2021)
August 11, 2021 Filing 15 Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:21-cv-05952. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 10, 2021 Filing 14 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of Northern District of California. (va)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TRANSFER ORDER: Under Title 28, United States Code, Section 1404(a), a district court has discretion to transfer venue to any other district where a case might have been brought "[f]or the convenience of parties and witnesses, in the interest of justice." 28 U.S.C. 1404(a); see, e.g., New York Marine and General Ins. Co. v. Lafarge North America, Inc., 599 F.3d 102, 112 (2d Cir. 2010) (discussing the factors to be considered in determining whether to transfer venue). Substantially for the reasons set forth in the parties' memorandum of law, the Court exercises its discretion under Section 1404(a) to transfer this case to the Northern District of California. In light of that, the initial pretrial conference scheduled for September 9, 2021, is hereby canceled. The Clerk of Court is directed to transfer this action to the Northern District of California forthwith that is, immediately and notwithstanding Local Rule 83.1 and then to close the case in this Court. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 8/10/2021) (va)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Robert C. Hilliard to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse)
August 10, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #9 MOTION for Robert C. Hilliard to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24907128. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
August 9, 2021 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #10 JOINT MOTION to Transfer Case to the Northern District of California. . Document filed by Gilead Sciences, Inc...(Rothman, Alan)
August 9, 2021 Filing 10 JOINT MOTION to Transfer Case to the Northern District of California. Document filed by Gilead Sciences, Inc...(Rothman, Alan)
August 9, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Robert C. Hilliard to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24907128. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Charles Antonelli, Genoux Baez, Walter S. Banks, Jr, Victor Chapman, Dana Diamond, Nancy Duncan, Glora Freeman, Roberto Gabrielle, Luis Grisales, Raymond Hayes, Kelvin Hilton, Christophe Lee Jones, Raymond Knight, Timmy Masa, Jimmy J. Melendez, Robert Morea, Donnavon Morgan, Linda Perry, Charles Sanchez, Franki Valle, Joel K. Vinson, Barbara Walsh, Michael Watt. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order).(Hilliard, Robert)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Application GRANTED. In light of the extension, the initial pretrial conference currently scheduled for August 24, 2021, is hereby adjourned to September 9, 2021, at 4:00 p.m. All pre-conference procedures remain in effect. See ECF No. 5. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate ECF No. 7. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 7/28/2021) (cf)
July 28, 2021 Filing 7 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint (Unopposed) addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Alan E. Rothman dated July 28, 2021. Document filed by Gilead Sciences, Inc...(Rothman, Alan)
July 28, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Gilead Sciences, Inc. answer due 9/1/2021., Set/Reset Hearings:( Initial Conference set for 9/9/2021 at 04:00 PM before Judge Jesse M. Furman.) (cf)
July 15, 2021 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Initial Pretrial Conference and Judge Furman's Individual Rules and Practices in Civil Cases on July 14, 2021. Document filed by Gilead Sciences, Inc...(Rothman, Alan)
July 13, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 8/24/2021 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 1105, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jesse M. Furman. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 7/13/2021) (kv)
July 13, 2021 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
July 13, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
July 13, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
July 12, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alan Edward Rothman on behalf of Gilead Sciences, Inc...(Rothman, Alan)
July 12, 2021 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Gilead Sciences, Inc...(Rothman, Alan)
July 12, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Rothman, Alan)
July 12, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from New York Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 155649/2021. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24780127).Document filed by Gilead Sciences, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Verified Complaint).(Rothman, Alan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walsh et al v. Gilead Sciences, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Walsh
Represented By: Robert Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Sanchez
Represented By: Robert Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Antonelli
Represented By: Robert Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christophe Lee Jones
Represented By: Robert Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dana Diamond
Represented By: Robert Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donnavon Morgan
Represented By: Robert Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Franki Valle
Represented By: Robert Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Genoux Baez
Represented By: Robert Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glora Freeman
Represented By: Robert Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmy J. Melendez
Represented By: Robert Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joel K. Vinson
Represented By: Robert Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelvin Hilton
Represented By: Robert Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Perry
Represented By: Robert Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Grisales
Represented By: Robert Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Watt
Represented By: Robert Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Duncan
Represented By: Robert Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Knight
Represented By: Robert Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Hayes
Represented By: Robert Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Morea
Represented By: Robert Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roberto Gabrielle
Represented By: Robert Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timmy Masa
Represented By: Robert Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Chapman
Represented By: Robert Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter S. Banks, Jr.
Represented By: Robert Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gilead Sciences Inc
Represented By: Alan Edward Rothman
Represented By: Joshua Eugene Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?