Swanson v. County of Contra Costa et al
Plaintiff: Jesse Swanson
Defendant: County of Contra Costa, Jessica Standish and Elizabeth Hollandberry
Case Number: 4:2021cv06419
Filed: August 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: PSLC CHC
Referring Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
2 Judge: PSLC MBI
3 Judge: Jon S Tigar
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2022 Filing 28 AMENDED COMPLAINT against County of Contra Costa, Elizabeth Hollandberry, Jessica Standish. Filed byJesse Swanson. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2022)
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING AMENDED COMPLAINT. Amended Pleadings due by 9/30/2022. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 2, 2022. (mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 30, 2022 Filing 26 RESPONSE re #25 Order on Motion to Dismiss, by Jesse Swanson. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2022)
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION TO DISMISS; DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND; DIRECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting in part and denying in part #17 Motion to Dismiss.(mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
May 31, 2022 Filing 24 Declaration of Jody Dye-Jones filed byby Jesse Swanson. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2022)
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar denying #22 Motion to Appoint Counsel.(mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
April 18, 2022 Filing 22 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Jesse Swanson. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2022)
February 23, 2022 Filing 21 REPLY (re #17 MOTION to Dismiss CORRECTION OF DOCKET #13 ) filed byCounty of Contra Costa, Elizabeth Hollandberry, Jessica Standish. (Mauck, Jason) (Filed on 2/23/2022)
February 9, 2022 Filing 20 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #17 MOTION to Dismiss CORRECTION OF DOCKET #13 ) filed byJesse Swanson. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2022)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting in part and denying in part #18 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #15 Certificate of Service, #17 MOTION to Dismiss CORRECTION OF DOCKET #13. Responses due by 2/18/2022.(mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
December 10, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #15 Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kmg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2021)
December 6, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss CORRECTION OF DOCKET #13 filed by County of Contra Costa, Elizabeth Hollandberry, Jessica Standish. Responses due by 12/29/2021. Replies due by 1/12/2022. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Mauck, Jason) (Filed on 12/6/2021)
December 2, 2021 Filing 16 CLERKS NOTICE VACATING HEARING DATE AND DIRECTING RENOTICE OF #13 MOTION TO DISMISS (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
December 1, 2021 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by County of Contra Costa, Elizabeth Hollandberry, Jessica Standish re #13 MOTION to Dismiss , #14 Request for Judicial Notice, (Mauck, Jason) (Filed on 12/1/2021)
December 1, 2021 Filing 14 Request for Judicial Notice re #13 MOTION to Dismiss filed byCounty of Contra Costa, Elizabeth Hollandberry, Jessica Standish. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #13 ) (Mauck, Jason) (Filed on 12/1/2021)
December 1, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss filed by County of Contra Costa, Elizabeth Hollandberry, Jessica Standish. Motion Hearing set for 1/13/2022 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 12/15/2021. Replies due by 12/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mauck, Jason) (Filed on 12/1/2021)
November 12, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jesse Swanson. County of Contra Costa served on 11/10/2021, answer due 12/1/2021; Elizabeth Hollandberry served on 11/10/2021, answer due 12/1/2021; Jessica Standish served on 11/10/2021, answer due 12/1/2021. (msr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2021)
November 9, 2021 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to County of Contra Costa, Elizabeth Hollandberry, Jessica Standish. (Attachments: #1 Jessica Standish, #2 Elizabeth Hollandberry)(mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2021)
October 6, 2021 Filing 10 Letter from Nicolas Ajuder on behalf of Jesse Swanson. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2021)
September 28, 2021 Filing 8 Declaration of Jody Dye-Jones filed byJesse Swanson. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2021)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins no longer assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 9/28/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
September 27, 2021 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge. (lmhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
September 8, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ATTORNEY by Jesse Swanson. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2021) Modified on 9/21/2021 (lmd, COURT STAFF).
August 19, 2021 Filing 4 Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 19, 2021 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 9/27/2021. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 19, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Jesse Swanson. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2021)
August 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against County of Contra Costa, Elizabeth Hollandberry, Jessica Standish. Filed by Jesse Swanson. Consent/Declination due by 9/20/2021. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2021)
August 19, 2021 Plaintiff Location and ID number provided by ProSe Clerk. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2021) .

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Swanson v. County of Contra Costa et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Contra Costa
Represented By: Jason William Mauck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica Standish
Represented By: Jason William Mauck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Hollandberry
Represented By: Jason William Mauck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?