Abidog et al v. New York Life Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Gloria Leon, Virginia Teng, Grace Abidog, George Dirnu, Kiet Linh Ha, Gloria Najarro, Maryellen Rodriguez, Enrique Rodriguez, Sara Rodriguez, Wei Lan Teng, Jennifer Toy, Jack Wang, Shirley Win, Poleon Win, Johnny Wong, Cui Ting Yang and Jennifer Shuk Ming Yu
Defendant: New York Life Insurance Company, NYLIFE Securities, LLC and Felix Chu
Case Number: 4:2021cv06425
Filed: August 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Referring Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2021 Filing 32 REPLY (re #12 First MOTION to Remand to San Francisco Superior Court ) filed byGrace Abidog, George Dirnu, Kiet Linh Ha, Gloria Leon, Enrique Rodriguez, Maryellen Rodriguez, Sara Rodriguez, Virginia Teng, Jennifer Toy, Jack Wang, Poleon Win, Shirley Win, Johnny Wong, Cui Ting Yang, Jennifer Shuk Ming Yu. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Feldman, Jeffrey) (Filed on 10/6/2021)
October 6, 2021 Filing 31 REPLY (re #11 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint ) filed byNYLIFE Securities, LLC, New York Life Insurance Company. (Azarmi, Andrew) (Filed on 10/6/2021)
September 22, 2021 Filing 30 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #11 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint ) filed byGrace Abidog, George Dirnu, Kiet Linh Ha, Gloria Leon, Enrique Rodriguez, Maryellen Rodriguez, Sara Rodriguez, Virginia Teng, Jennifer Toy, Jack Wang, Poleon Win, Shirley Win, Johnny Wong, Cui Ting Yang, Jennifer Shuk Ming Yu. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeffrey A. Feldman in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Feldman, Jeffrey) (Filed on 9/22/2021)
September 22, 2021 Filing 29 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #12 First MOTION to Remand to San Francisco Superior Court ) filed byNYLIFE Securities, LLC, New York Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Declaration of Andrew Azarmi, with Exs. 1-4, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Azarmi, Andrew) (Filed on 9/22/2021)
September 10, 2021 Filing 28 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Felix Chu.. (Agnetti, Melissa) (Filed on 9/10/2021)
September 10, 2021 Filing 27 ANSWER to Complaint byFelix Chu. (Agnetti, Melissa) (Filed on 9/10/2021)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #25 Stipulation. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2021)
September 1, 2021 Filing 25 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Felix Chu. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fredricks, Timothy) (Filed on 9/1/2021)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #23 Stipulation to Extend Deadlines to Oppose Motions to Dismiss and Remand signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Replies due by 10/6/2021. Responses due by 9/22/2021. (wft, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2021)
August 30, 2021 Filing 23 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #12 First MOTION to Remand to San Francisco Superior Court, #11 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint Regarding Briefing Schedules filed by Grace Abidog, George Dirnu, Kiet Linh Ha, Gloria Leon, Enrique Rodriguez, Maryellen Rodriguez, Sara Rodriguez, Virginia Teng, Jennifer Toy, Jack Wang, Poleon Win, Shirley Win, Johnny Wong, Cui Ting Yang, Jennifer Shuk Ming Yu, New York Life Insurance Company and NYLIFE Securities, LLC . (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeffrey A Feldman in Support of Stipulated Request to Extend Deadlines to Oppose Motions to Dismiss and Remand and to Reply Thereto, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Feldman, Jeffrey) (Filed on 8/30/2021) Modified on 8/31/2021 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
August 30, 2021 #Electronic filing error. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Melissa Anne Agnet. The docket shows a different address from what is appearing on the document (dkt. #: 22 Notice of Appearanc e filed by Felix Chu ). Please update your personal profile on ECF. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2021)
August 27, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa Anne Agnetti (Agnetti, Melissa) (Filed on 8/27/2021)
August 26, 2021 Reset Hearings as to #11 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint and #12 First MOTION to Remand, See Docket No. #18 and #19 : Motion Hearing set for 12/9/2021 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam Jr. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2021)
August 26, 2021 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Grace Abidog, George Dirnu, Kiet Linh Ha, Gloria Leon, Enrique Rodriguez, Maryellen Rodriguez, Sara Rodriguez, Virginia Teng, Jennifer Toy, Jack Wang, Poleon Win, Shirley Win, Johnny Wong, Cui Ting Yang, Jennifer Shuk Ming Yu re #17 Renotice motion hearing, #19 Renotice motion hearing, (Feldman, Jeffrey) (Filed on 8/26/2021)
August 26, 2021 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Grace Abidog, George Dirnu, Kiet Linh Ha, Gloria Leon, Enrique Rodriguez, Maryellen Rodriguez, Sara Rodriguez, Virginia Teng, Jennifer Toy, Jack Wang, Poleon Win, Shirley Win, Johnny Wong, Cui Ting Yang, Jennifer Shuk Ming Yu re #13 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge, #12 First MOTION to Remand to San Francisco Superior Court (Feldman, Jeffrey) (Filed on 8/26/2021)
August 26, 2021 Filing 19 Renotice motion hearing re #12 First MOTION to Remand to San Francisco Superior Court filed byGrace Abidog, George Dirnu, Kiet Linh Ha, Gloria Leon, Enrique Rodriguez, Maryellen Rodriguez, Sara Rodriguez, Virginia Teng, Jennifer Toy, Jack Wang, Poleon Win, Shirley Win, Johnny Wong, Cui Ting Yang, Jennifer Shuk Ming Yu. (Related document(s) #12 ) (Feldman, Jeffrey) (Filed on 8/26/2021)
August 26, 2021 Filing 18 Renotice motion hearing re #11 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed byNYLIFE Securities, LLC, New York Life Insurance Company. (Related document(s) #11 ) (Azarmi, Andrew) (Filed on 8/26/2021)
August 26, 2021 Filing 17 Renotice motion hearing re #12 First MOTION to Remand to San Francisco Superior Court filed byGrace Abidog, George Dirnu, Kiet Linh Ha, Gloria Leon, Enrique Rodriguez, Maryellen Rodriguez, Sara Rodriguez, Virginia Teng, Jennifer Toy, Jack Wang, Poleon Win, Shirley Win, Johnny Wong, Cui Ting Yang, Jennifer Shuk Ming Yu. (Related document(s) #12 ) (Feldman, Jeffrey) (Filed on 8/26/2021)
August 26, 2021 Filing 16 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE.Notice is hereby given that a Case Management Conference has been set for November 23, 2021, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m., in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA. Case Management Statement due by November 16th. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. All future filings should reflect the case number as 4:21-cv-06425-HSG. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2021)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to case,. Signed by Clerk on 08/26/2021. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2021)
August 25, 2021 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2021)
August 25, 2021 Filing 13 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Grace Abidog, George Dirnu, Kiet Linh Ha, Gloria Leon, Enrique Rodriguez, Maryellen Rodriguez, Sara Rodriguez, Virginia Teng, Jennifer Toy, Jack Wang, Poleon Win, Shirley Win, Johnny Wong, Cui Ting Yang, Jennifer Shuk Ming Yu.. (Feldman, Jeffrey) (Filed on 8/25/2021)
August 25, 2021 Filing 12 First MOTION to Remand to San Francisco Superior Court filed by Grace Abidog, George Dirnu, Kiet Linh Ha, Gloria Leon, Enrique Rodriguez, Maryellen Rodriguez, Sara Rodriguez, Virginia Teng, Jennifer Toy, Jack Wang, Poleon Win, Shirley Win, Johnny Wong, Cui Ting Yang, Jennifer Shuk Ming Yu. Motion Hearing set for 9/30/2021 09:00 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Responses due by 9/8/2021. Replies due by 9/15/2021. (Feldman, Jeffrey) (Filed on 8/25/2021)
August 25, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by NYLIFE Securities, LLC, New York Life Insurance Company. Motion Hearing set for 9/30/2021 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Responses due by 9/8/2021. Replies due by 9/15/2021. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Declaration of Andrew Azarmi, with Exs. 1-4, 6-7, #3 Declaration of Zachary Rigdon, with Ex. 5, #4 Proposed Order, #5 Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction, #6 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Azarmi, Andrew) (Filed on 8/25/2021)
August 24, 2021 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by NYLIFE Securities, LLC, New York Life Insurance Company re #9 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, Proof of Service by Email and U.S. Mail on 8/24/2021 (Azarmi, Andrew) (Filed on 8/24/2021)
August 23, 2021 Filing 9 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/11/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/18/2021 01:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (arkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2021)
August 20, 2021 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Grace Abidog, George Dirnu, Kiet Linh Ha, Gloria Leon, Enrique Rodriguez, Maryellen Rodriguez, Sara Rodriguez, Virginia Teng, Jennifer Toy, Jack Wang, Poleon Win, Shirley Win, Johnny Wong, Cui Ting Yang, Jennifer Shuk Ming Yu re #7 Amended Complaint,,, (Feldman, Jeffrey) (Filed on 8/20/2021)
August 20, 2021 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES for: Fraud by Intentional Misrepresentation; Fraud by Concealment; Constructive Fraud; Breach of Fiduciary Duty; Negligence; Aiding and Abetting; Violation of Corporations Code Section 25401 et seq.; Violation of Corporations Code Section 25504.1 et seq.; Violation of Business and Professions Code Section 17200; Negligent Supervision; Control Person Liability under California Corp. Code Sections 25403, 25504, and 25504.1; Elder Abuse Under the California Welfare and Institutions Code; 3rd Party Beneficiary Contract; Negligent Misrepresentation; Exhibits A-O against All Defendants. Filed byJennifer Toy, Enrique Rodriguez, Jennifer Shuk Ming Yu, George Dirnu, Grace Abidog, Cui Ting Yang, Shirley Win, Maryellen Rodriguez, Kiet Linh Ha, Virginia Teng, Jack Wang, Poleon Win, Johnny Wong, Sara Rodriguez, Gloria Leon. (Feldman, Jeffrey) (Filed on 8/20/2021)
August 20, 2021 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by NYLIFE Securities, LLC, New York Life Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Certificate of Interested Entities, #3 Notice of Appearance, 4 Case Assigned by Intake,,, #5 Notice (Other) Proof of Service on 8/20/2021 (Azarmi, Andrew) (Filed on 8/20/2021)
August 20, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE by NYLIFE Securities, LLC, New York Life Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal, Notice To Plaintiffs That Action Has Been Removed To Federal Court (Azarmi, Andrew) (Filed on 8/20/2021)
August 19, 2021 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/2/2021. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2021)
August 19, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Alina Pavlova and Kelly Graf for Defendants New York Life Insurance Company and NYLIFE Securities, LLC (Pavlova, Alina) (Filed on 8/19/2021)
August 19, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by NYLIFE Securities, LLC, New York Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent NYLIFE, LLC, Corporate Parent New York Life Insurance Company for NYLIFE Securities, LLC; Corporate Parent New York Life Insurance Company, Other Affiliate NYLIFE Securities, LLC, Other Affiliate NYLIFE, LLC for New York Life Insurance Company. re #1 Notice of Removal, (Azarmi, Andrew) (Filed on 8/19/2021)
August 19, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL of Civil Action to the United States District Court Based on a Claim Arising Under Federal Law, Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sections 1367, 1441, and 1446 from San Francisco. Their case number is CGC-21-592926. (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0971-16300767). Filed byNew York Life Insurance Company, NYLIFE Securities, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Azarmi, Andrew) (Filed on 8/19/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abidog et al v. New York Life Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria Leon
Represented By: Jeffrey Alan Feldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virginia Teng
Represented By: Jeffrey Alan Feldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grace Abidog
Represented By: Jeffrey Alan Feldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Dirnu
Represented By: Jeffrey Alan Feldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kiet Linh Ha
Represented By: Jeffrey Alan Feldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria Najarro
Represented By: Jeffrey Alan Feldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maryellen Rodriguez
Represented By: Jeffrey Alan Feldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Enrique Rodriguez
Represented By: Jeffrey Alan Feldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sara Rodriguez
Represented By: Jeffrey Alan Feldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wei Lan Teng
Represented By: Jeffrey Alan Feldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Toy
Represented By: Jeffrey Alan Feldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack Wang
Represented By: Jeffrey Alan Feldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley Win
Represented By: Jeffrey Alan Feldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Poleon Win
Represented By: Jeffrey Alan Feldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnny Wong
Represented By: Jeffrey Alan Feldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cui Ting Yang
Represented By: Jeffrey Alan Feldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Shuk Ming Yu
Represented By: Jeffrey Alan Feldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Alina Pavlova
Represented By: Andrew S. Azarmi
Represented By: Kelly Ryan Graf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NYLIFE Securities, LLC
Represented By: Alina Pavlova
Represented By: Andrew S. Azarmi
Represented By: Kelly Ryan Graf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Felix Chu
Represented By: Timothy W. Fredricks
Represented By: Melissa Anne Agnetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?