Brooks et al v. Gilead Sciences, Inc.
Plaintiff: Adrian Brooks, Alejandro N. Reyes, Alice Llaneras, Calvin J. Zeigler, Carol G. Samuel, Cecilio Webb, David L. Bailey, Dennis M. Knott, Donald J. Orth, Edwin Brooks, Gerald McNeal, Geraldine P. Davis, James N. Burton, James Pennington, Jeffery Wayne Jones, Jerry J. Gonzalez, John-Kent C. McFarren, Kristina Marie Krusec, Luc Jean-Pierre, Manuel A. Gonzales, Margaret M. Rumpf, Matthew C. Hanson, Mitchell Burroughs, Nadine D. Carter-Wallace, Nathan T. Ivy, Pedro L. Hernandez, Phoenix JD Gabe, Raymond Febus, Renaldo C. Hill, Robert W. Vogt, Shakwita M. Wright, Sherry L. Brower, Tanita S. Hogue and Kristin E. McClure
Defendant: Gilead Sciences, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2021cv06458
Filed: August 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Donna M Ryu
Referring Judge: Jon S Tigar
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REGARDING DISMISSAL OF CLAIMS AND RESPONSIVE PLEADINGS by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting (792) Stipulation in case 4:18-cv-06972-JST; granting (21) Stipulation in case 4:21-cv-06184-JST; granting (13) Stipulation in case 4:21-cv-06458-JST; granting (13) Stipulation in case 4:21-cv-06461-JST; granting (30) Stipulation in case 4:21-cv-06574-JST; granting (21) Stipulation in case 4:21-cv-06581-JST; granting (26) Stipulation in case 4:21-cv-06658-JST; granting (22) Stipulation in case 4:21-cv-06807-JST; granting (10) Stipulation in case 4:21-cv-06822-JST; granting (20) Stipulation in case 4:21-cv-06947-JST; granting (9) Stipulation in case 4:21-cv-07017-JST. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2021)
September 30, 2021 Filing 13 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Dismissal of Claims and Responsive Pleadings filed by Gilead Sciences, Inc.. (Anderson, Joshua) (Filed on 9/30/2021)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES FOR PRETRIAL PURPOSES. Motions terminated: (20 in 4:21-cv-06807-JST) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re (18) Order Relating Case,,, Terminate Motions,, filed by Gilead Sciences Inc, (7 in 4:21-cv-07017-JST) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re (5) Order Relating Case,,, Terminate Motions,, filed by Gilead Sciences, Inc., (11 in 4:21-cv-06458-JST) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re (9) Order Relating Case,,, Terminate Motions,, filed by Gilead Sciences, Inc., (18 in 4:21-cv-06947-JST) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re (16) Order Relating Case,,, Terminate Motions,, filed by Gilead Sciences Inc, (28 in 4:21-cv-06574-JST) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re (26) Order Relating Case,,, Terminate Motions,, filed by Gilead Sciences Inc, (790 in 4:18-cv-06972-JST) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re (788) Order Relating Case,,, Terminate Motions,, filed by Gilead Sciences, Inc., (24 in 4:21-cv-06658-JST) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re (22) Order Relating Case,,, Terminate Motions,, filed by Gilead Sciences Inc, (19 in 4:21-cv-06581-JST) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re (17) Order Relating Case,,, Terminate Motions,, filed by Gilead Sciences Inc, (8 in 4:21-cv-06822-JST) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re (6) Order Relating Case,,, Terminate Motions,, filed by Gilead Sciences, Inc., (11 in 4:21-cv-06461-JST) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re (9) Order Relating Case,,, Terminate Motions,, filed by Gilead Sciences Inc, (19 in 4:21-cv-06184-JST) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re (17) Order Relating Case,,, Terminate Motions,, filed by Gilead Sciences Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 29, 2021. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2021)
September 29, 2021 Filing 11 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #9 Order Relating Case,,, Terminate Motions,, filed by Gilead Sciences, Inc.. (Anderson, Joshua) (Filed on 9/29/2021)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 9/28/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2021)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RELATING CASES. Motions terminated: (785 in 4:18-cv-06972-JST) Joint ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related filed by Adrian Holley, (787 in 4:18-cv-06972-JST) Amended ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related filed by Adrian Holley, (784 in 4:18-cv-06972-JST) Joint ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related filed by Adrian Holley. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 27, 2021. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2021)
September 22, 2021 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Tanita S. Hogue, Sherry L. Brower, Margaret M. Rumpf, David L. Bailey, Pedro L. Hernandez, Alejandro N. Reyes, John-Kent C. McFarren, Adrian Brooks, Kristina Marie Krusec, Robert W. Vogt, Jerry J. Gonzalez, Nathan T. Ivy, Phoenix JD Gabe, Raymond Febus, James Pennington, Manuel A. Gonzales, Nadine D. Carter-Wallace, Edwin Brooks, Shakwita M. Wright, Gerald McNeal, Matthew C. Hanson, James N. Burton, Mitchell Burroughs, Renaldo C. Hill, Cecilio Webb, Alice Llaneras, Donald J. Orth, Geraldine P. Davis, Jeffery Wayne Jones, Dennis M. Knott, Calvin J. Zeigler, Kristin E. McClure, Luc Jean-Pierre, Carol G. Samuel. Service waived by Gilead Sciences, Inc. waiver sent on 9/22/2021, answer due 11/22/2021. (Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 9/22/2021)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 9/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2021)
September 21, 2021 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2021)
September 21, 2021 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by David L. Bailey, Adrian Brooks, Edwin Brooks, Sherry L. Brower, Mitchell Burroughs, James N. Burton, Nadine D. Carter-Wallace, Geraldine P. Davis, Raymond Febus, Phoenix JD Gabe, Manuel A. Gonzales, Jerry J. Gonzalez, Matthew C. Hanson, Pedro L. Hernandez, Renaldo C. Hill, Tanita S. Hogue, Nathan T. Ivy, Luc Jean-Pierre, Jeffery Wayne Jones, Dennis M. Knott, Kristina Marie Krusec, Alice Llaneras, Kristin E. McClure, John-Kent C. McFarren, Gerald McNeal, Donald J. Orth, James Pennington, Alejandro N. Reyes, Margaret M. Rumpf, Carol G. Samuel, Robert W. Vogt, Cecilio Webb, Shakwita M. Wright, Calvin J. Zeigler.. (Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 9/21/2021)
September 7, 2021 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFFS Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 9/21/2021. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2021)
August 20, 2021 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/24/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/1/2021 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2021)
August 20, 2021 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/3/2021. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2021)
August 20, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (with jury demand) (no process) against Gilead Sciences, Inc. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-16304452). Filed by Gerald McNeal, Tanita S. Hogue, Sherry L. Brower, Margaret M. Rumpf, David L. Bailey, Pedro L. Hernandez, Alejandro N. Reyes, John-Kent C. McFarren, Matthew C. Hanson, Adrian Brooks, Kristina Marie Krusec, Robert W. Vogt, Mitchell Burroughs, James N. Burton, Jerry J. Gonzalez, Renaldo C. Hill, Cecilio Webb, Nathan T. Ivy, Phoenix JD Gabe, Raymond Febus, Alice Llaneras, Donald J. Orth, Geraldine P. Davis, James Pennington, Jeffery Wayne Jones, Manuel A. Gonzales, Dennis M. Knott, Calvin J. Zeigler, Nadine D. Carter-Wallace, Luc Jean-Pierre, Edwin Brooks, Shakwita M. Wright, Carol G. Samuel, Kristin E. McClure. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice Letter, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 8/20/2021) Modified on 8/20/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brooks et al v. Gilead Sciences, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adrian Brooks
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alejandro N. Reyes
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alice Llaneras
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Calvin J. Zeigler
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol G. Samuel
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cecilio Webb
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David L. Bailey
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis M. Knott
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald J. Orth
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edwin Brooks
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald McNeal
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geraldine P. Davis
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James N. Burton
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Pennington
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffery Wayne Jones
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry J. Gonzalez
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John-Kent C. McFarren
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristina Marie Krusec
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luc Jean-Pierre
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manuel A. Gonzales
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret M. Rumpf
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew C. Hanson
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mitchell Burroughs
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nadine D. Carter-Wallace
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathan T. Ivy
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pedro L. Hernandez
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phoenix JD Gabe
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Febus
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renaldo C. Hill
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert W. Vogt
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shakwita M. Wright
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherry L. Brower
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tanita S. Hogue
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristin E. McClure
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gilead Sciences, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua Eugene Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?