Kuntz et al v. A. W. Chesterton Company et al
Plaintiff: Mary Kuntz as Successor-in-Interest to and as Wrongful Death Hear of William Kuntz, Deceased, Annie Graye, Jennie Martin, Sarah Thornton as Wrongful Death Heirs of William Kuntz, Deceased, Mary Kuntz and Sarah Thorton
Defendant: A. W. Chesterton Company, Crane Co., THE J.R. CLARKSON COMPANY LLC, Paxton Products Corporation, SANTA FE BRAUN, INC. AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO C.F. BRAUN, INC., Does 1 through 800, inclusive and Santa Fe Braun Inc.
Case Number: 4:2021cv06935
Filed: September 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S White
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2021 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by THE J.R. CLARKSON COMPANY LLC re #9 Order Reassigning Case,,, Case Assigned/Reassigned,, #10 Order,, Set Deadlines/Hearings, (Soriano, Jocelyn) (Filed on 9/14/2021)
September 14, 2021 Filing 13 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Mary Kuntz.. (Chu, Kimberly) (Filed on 9/14/2021)
September 14, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly Joy Wai Jun Chu (Chu, Kimberly) (Filed on 9/14/2021)
September 14, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by David R. Donadio (Donadio, David) (Filed on 9/14/2021)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/14/21. Joint Case Management Statement due by 12/30/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/7/2022 11:00 AM in Oakland, - Telephonic Only. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2021)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jeffrey S. White for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 9/13/21. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2021)
September 13, 2021 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2021)
September 9, 2021 Filing 7 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by THE J.R. CLARKSON COMPANY LLC identifying Corporate Parent Emerson Electric Company, Corporate Parent Emerson Final Control US Holding LLC, Corporate Parent Flow Control US Holding Corporation for THE J.R. CLARKSON COMPANY LLC. (Soriano, Jocelyn) (Filed on 9/9/2021)
September 9, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE by THE J.R. CLARKSON COMPANY LLC OF INTERESTED PARTIES (Soriano, Jocelyn) (Filed on 9/9/2021)
September 9, 2021 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by THE J.R. CLARKSON COMPANY LLC.. (Soriano, Jocelyn) (Filed on 9/9/2021)
September 9, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jocelyn Mislang Soriano (Soriano, Jocelyn) (Filed on 9/9/2021)
September 8, 2021 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/3/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/10/2021 02:00 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (arkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2021)
September 8, 2021 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/22/2021. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2021)
September 7, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Francisco Superior Court. Their case number is CGC-21-276952. (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0971-16364358). Filed byTHE J.R. CLARKSON COMPANY LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Soriano, Jocelyn) (Filed on 9/7/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kuntz et al v. A. W. Chesterton Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Kuntz as Successor-in-Interest to and as Wrongful Death Hear of William Kuntz, Deceased
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annie Graye
Represented By: Brayton Purcell
Represented By: Kimberly Joy Wai Jun Chu
Represented By: David R. Donadio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennie Martin
Represented By: Brayton Purcell
Represented By: David R. Donadio
Represented By: Kimberly Joy Wai Jun Chu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Thornton as Wrongful Death Heirs of William Kuntz, Deceased
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Kuntz
Represented By: Brayton Purcell
Represented By: Kimberly Joy Wai Jun Chu
Represented By: David R. Donadio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Thorton
Represented By: Brayton Purcell
Represented By: Kimberly Joy Wai Jun Chu
Represented By: David R. Donadio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. W. Chesterton Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE J.R. CLARKSON COMPANY LLC
Represented By: Jocelyn Mislang Soriano
Represented By: Andrew Livingston Sharp
Represented By: Gary David Sharp
Represented By: Tsun-Chi Eric Sun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paxton Products Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANTA FE BRAUN, INC. AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO C.F. BRAUN, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 800, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santa Fe Braun Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?