MILLER et al v. GILEAD SCIENCES, INC.
Plaintiff: Charles Miller, CORNELIUS JACKSON, DEVON TROTTER, Gregory Robertson, RITA COVINGTON, VANESSA PHILLIPS and William Davis
Defendant: Gilead Sciences Inc
Case Number: 4:2021cv06947
Filed: September 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Kandis A Westmore
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2021 Filing 15 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/30/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/7/2021 01:30 PM in Oakland, - To be determined. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2021)
September 8, 2021 Filing 14 Case transferred in from District of District of Columbia; Case Number 1:21-cv-01819. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 7, 2021 Filing 13 Case transferred to the USDC for the Northern District of California pursuant to Order on Motion to Transfer Case,, Sent to Court via extraction. (ztd)
August 27, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Transfer by 9/7/2021. (znbn)
August 26, 2021 Filing 12 Joint MOTION to Transfer Case Venue to the Northern District of California by RITA COVINGTON, WILLIAM F. DAVIS, CORNELIUS JACKSON, CHARLES E. MILLER, VANESSA PHILLIPS, GREGORY ROBERTSON, DEVON TROTTER. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A)(Watts, Mikal)
August 26, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Mikal C. Watts on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Watts, Mikal)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court GRANTS #12 the parties' Joint Motion to Transfer Venue. It is hereby ORDERED that this case is transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 08/26/2021. (lccrc2)
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court GRANTS in part #10 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiffs' Complaint. Defendant shall file any response to Plaintiffs' Complaint by 9/13/2021. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 8/13/2021. (lccrc2)
August 11, 2021 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to move, plead, or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint by GILEAD SCIENCES, INC.. (Zidlicky, Paul) Modified event on 8/12/2021 (ztd).
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court GRANTS #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint. Defendant shall have until 08/13/2021 to file its Answer or other Response in this matter. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 7/13/2021. (lccrc2)
July 12, 2021 Filing 9 Receipt on 7/12/2021 of ORIGINAL FILE, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet from Superior Court. Superior Court Number 2021 CA 001961 B. (ztd)
July 12, 2021 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to MOVE, PLEAD, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT by GILEAD SCIENCES, INC.. (Zidlicky, Paul)
July 9, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE to Counsel/Party re #1 Notice of Removal (zsb)
July 9, 2021 Filing 6 ERRATA Notice of Removal by GILEAD SCIENCES, INC. re Notice of QC- New Case,. (Zidlicky, Paul)
July 9, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zsb)
July 8, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE to Plaintiff of Notice of Removal by GILEAD SCIENCES, INC. re #1 Notice of Removal (Zidlicky, Paul)
July 8, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by GILEAD SCIENCES, INC.. Case related to Case No. 18-cv-06972-JST; 20-cv-01026-MMH-PDB; 21-cv-01418-KM-JBC; 21-cv-01774-MGL; 20-cv-01523-MTS; 21-cv-481-TDS-JEP. (Zidlicky, Paul)
July 8, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul John Zidlicky on behalf of GILEAD SCIENCES, INC. (Zidlicky, Paul)
July 8, 2021 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by GILEAD SCIENCES, INC. (Zidlicky, Paul)
July 8, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from DC Superior Court, case number 2021CA001961B Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADCDC-8584891 filed by GILEAD SCIENCES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A)(Zidlicky, Paul)
July 8, 2021 NOTICE OF ERROR re #1 Notice of Removal; emailed to pzidlicky@sidley.com, cc'd 3 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Noncompliance with LCvR 5.1(c). Please file an errata correcting the initiating pleading to include the name & full residence address of each party using the event Errata., 2. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (zsb, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MILLER et al v. GILEAD SCIENCES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Miller
Represented By: Mikal C. Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CORNELIUS JACKSON
Represented By: Mikal C. Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEVON TROTTER
Represented By: Mikal C. Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Robertson
Represented By: Mikal C. Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RITA COVINGTON
Represented By: Mikal C. Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VANESSA PHILLIPS
Represented By: Mikal C. Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Davis
Represented By: Mikal C. Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gilead Sciences Inc
Represented By: Paul John Zidlicky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?