Sierra Club et al v. Regan
Plaintiff: Sierra Club, Natural Resources Defense Council and Environmental Integrity Project
Defendant: United States Environmental Protection Agency and Michael Regan
Case Number: 4:2021cv06956
Filed: September 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Referring Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 7604
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ***DISREGARD. DUPLICATIVE FILING.***ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg Granting #19 STIPULATION TO ENLARGE TIME FOR DEFENDANT'S ANSWER AND TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.Joint Case Management Statement due by 2/10/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/17/2022 02:30 PM in Oakland, - Telephonic Only.(amg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2021) Modified on 11/3/2021 (amg, COURT STAFF).
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ***DISREGARD. DUPLICATIVE FILING.***ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg Granting #19 STIPULATION TO ENLARGE TIME FOR DEFENDANT'S ANSWER AND TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.Joint Case Management Statement due by 2/10/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/17/2022 02:30 PM in Oakland, - Telephonic Only.(amg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2021) Modified on 11/3/2021 (amg, COURT STAFF).
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg Granting #19 STIPULATION TO ENLARGE TIME FOR DEFENDANT'S ANSWER AND TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.Joint Case Management Statement due by 2/10/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/17/2022 02:30 PM in Oakland, - Telephonic Only.(amg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2021)
November 3, 2021 Filing 19 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO ENLARGE TIME FOR DEFENDANTS ANSWER AND TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Michael Regan. (Coghlan, Andrew) (Filed on 11/3/2021)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong Granting #13 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2021)
September 30, 2021 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sierra Club. Michael Regan served on 9/9/2021, answer due 11/8/2021. (Issod, Andrea) (Filed on 9/30/2021)
September 29, 2021 Filing 16 ***DISREGARD. ERROR IN FILING. SEE #17 FOR CORRECTED FILING. *** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sierra Club. Michael Regan served on 9/13/2021, answer due 10/4/2021. (Issod, Andrea) (Filed on 9/29/2021) Modified on 9/30/2021 (amgS, COURT STAFF).
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE:Joint Case Management Statement due by 12/9/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/16/2021 02:45 PM in Oakland, - Telephonic Only. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 9/28/2021. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order)(amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2021)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case, Signed by the Clerk on 9/27/2021. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2021)
September 27, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-16435333.) filed by Environmental Integrity Project. (Dycus, Patton) (Filed on 9/27/2021)
September 27, 2021 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2021)
September 24, 2021 Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Michael Regan.. (Coghlan, Andrew) (Filed on 9/24/2021)
September 24, 2021 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Natural Resources Defense Council.. (Davis, Emily) (Filed on 9/24/2021)
September 24, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Stephen Coghlan (Coghlan, Andrew) (Filed on 9/24/2021)
September 24, 2021 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION (CORRECTED) to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Sierra Club.. (Issod, Andrea) (Filed on 9/24/2021) Modified on 9/24/2021 (ig, COURT STAFF).
September 22, 2021 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Sierra Club.. (Issod, Andrea) (Filed on 9/22/2021)
September 9, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Michael Regan, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2021) Modified on 9/9/2021 (fabS, COURT STAFF).
September 9, 2021 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/8/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/15/2021 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
September 8, 2021 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/22/2021. (asS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2021)
September 8, 2021 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Sierra Club (Issod, Andrea) (Filed on 9/8/2021)
September 8, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Issod, Andrea) (Filed on 9/8/2021)
September 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Injunctive and Declaratory Relief against United States Environmental Protection Agency ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-16367803.). Filed bySierra Club. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Issod, Andrea) (Filed on 9/8/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sierra Club et al v. Regan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sierra Club
Represented By: Andrea S. Issod
Represented By: Louisa Sue Eberle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natural Resources Defense Council
Represented By: Emily Kingsbury Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Environmental Integrity Project
Represented By: Patton Dycus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Environmental Protection Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Regan
Represented By: Andrew Stephen Coghlan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?