Unlockd Media, Inc. Liquidation Trust v. Google LLC et al
Plaintiff: Unlockd Media, Inc. Liquidation Trust
Defendant: Google LLC, Google Ireland Limited, Google Commerce Limited, Alphabet, Inc. and Google Asia Pacific Pte. Ltd.
Case Number: 4:2021cv07250
Filed: September 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Referring Judge: Alex G Tse
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 2
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #36 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Bansal, Deepti. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2021)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING #37 JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO ANSWER OR RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT AND CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Motions due by 1/13/2022; Case Management Statement due by 1/25/2021; and Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/1/2022 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2021)
October 15, 2021 Filing 38 FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT AND LOCAL RULE 3-15 CERTIFICATION OF INTERESTED ENTITIES OR PARTIES filed by Alphabet, Inc., Google Asia Pacific Pte. Ltd., Google Commerce Limited, Google Ireland Limited, Google LLC identifying Other Affiliate XXVI Holdings Inc., Other Affiliate Holding Company of XXVI Holdings Inc. for Alphabet, Inc.; Other Affiliate XXVI Holdings Inc., Other Affiliate Holding Company of Google LLC. for Google LLC. (Rhodes, Michael) (Filed on 10/15/2021)
October 15, 2021 Filing 37 JOINT STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO ANSWER OR RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT AND CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Alphabet, Inc., Google Asia Pacific Pte. Ltd., Google Commerce Limited, Google Ireland Limited, Google LLC. (Mejia, Beatriz) (Filed on 10/15/2021)
October 15, 2021 Filing 36 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice, (Filing Fee: $317.00, receipt number 0971-16503199) filed by Alphabet, Inc., Google Asia Pacific Pte. Ltd., Google Commerce Limited, Google Ireland Limited, Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Bansal, Deepti) (Filed on 10/15/2021) Modified on 10/20/2021 to remove previously paid remark(ndrS, COURT STAFF).
October 15, 2021 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Ashley K Corkery as counsel of record for Defendants Google LLC, Google Ireland Limited, Google Commerce Limited, Google Asia Pacific Pte. Limited, and Alphabet Inc. (Corkery, Ashley) (Filed on 10/15/2021)
October 15, 2021 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by John C. Dwyer as counsel of record for Defendants Google LLC, Google Ireland Limited, Google Commerce Limited, Google Asia Pacific Pte. Limited, and Alphabet Inc. (Dwyer, John) (Filed on 10/15/2021)
October 15, 2021 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Beatriz Mejia as counsel of record for Defendants Google LLC, Google Ireland Limited, Google Commerce Limited, Google Asia Pacific Pte. Limited, and Alphabet Inc. (Mejia, Beatriz) (Filed on 10/15/2021)
October 15, 2021 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Graham Rhodes as counsel of record for Defendants Google LLC, Google Ireland Limited, Google Commerce Limited, Google Asia Pacific Pte. Limited, and Alphabet Inc. (Rhodes, Michael) (Filed on 10/15/2021)
October 13, 2021 Filing 31 PROOF OF SERVICE by mail re #11 Summons Issued upon defendant Google Commerce Limited. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2021)
October 13, 2021 Filing 30 PROOF OF SERVICE by mail re #11 Summons Issued upon defendant Google Ireland Limited. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2021)
October 13, 2021 Filing 29 PROOF OF SERVICE by mail re #11 Summons Issued upon defendant Google Asia Pacific Pte Ltd. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2021)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #25 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Rosenberg, Lauren. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2021)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #24 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Even, Yonatan. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2021)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #23 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Hummel, Keith. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2021)
October 11, 2021 Filing 25 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice, (Filing Fee: $317.00, receipt number 0971-16484233) filed by Unlockd Media, Inc. Liquidation Trust. (Rosenberg, Lauren) (Filed on 10/11/2021)
October 11, 2021 Filing 24 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice, (Filing Fee: $317.00, receipt number 0971-16484027) filed by Unlockd Media, Inc. Liquidation Trust. (Even, Yonatan) (Filed on 10/11/2021)
October 11, 2021 Filing 23 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice, (Filing Fee: $317.00, receipt number 0971-16483989) filed by Unlockd Media, Inc. Liquidation Trust. (Hummel, Keith) (Filed on 10/11/2021)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #14 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Allan B. Diamond(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2021)
October 7, 2021 Filing 21 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE.Notice is hereby given that a Case Management Conference has been set for January 4, 2022, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m., in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA. Case Management Statement due by December 28th. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. All future filings should reflect the case number as 4:21-cv-07250-HSG. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2021)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse no longer assigned to case,. Signed by Clerk on 10/04/2021. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2021)
October 1, 2021 Filing 19 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2021)
October 1, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Quentin Alexandre Roberts (Roberts, Quentin) (Filed on 10/1/2021)
October 1, 2021 Filing 17 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Unlockd Media, Inc. Liquidation Trust.. (Sullivan, Christopher) (Filed on 10/1/2021)
September 30, 2021 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Unlockd Media, Inc. Liquidation Trust ("Affidavit of Service on Alphabet Inc.") (Chesler, Evan) (Filed on 9/30/2021)
September 30, 2021 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Unlockd Media, Inc. Liquidation Trust ("Affidavit of Service on Google LLC") (Chesler, Evan) (Filed on 9/30/2021)
September 30, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Allan B. Diamond, (Filing Fee: $317.00, receipt number 0971-16450317) filed by Unlockd Media, Inc. Liquidation Trust. (Diamond, Allan) (Filed on 9/30/2021)
September 30, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Sevana Zadourian (Zadourian, Sevana) (Filed on 9/30/2021)
September 30, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Daniel Sullivan (Sullivan, Christopher) (Filed on 9/30/2021)
September 21, 2021 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Defendants Alphabet, Inc., Google Asia Pacific Pte. Ltd., Google Commerce Limited, Google Ireland Limited, Google LLC. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2021)
September 21, 2021 Filing 10 Proposed Summons. (Chesler, Evan) (Filed on 9/21/2021)
September 21, 2021 Filing 9 Proposed Summons. (Chesler, Evan) (Filed on 9/21/2021)
September 21, 2021 Filing 8 Proposed Summons. (Chesler, Evan) (Filed on 9/21/2021)
September 21, 2021 Filing 7 Proposed Summons. (Chesler, Evan) (Filed on 9/21/2021)
September 21, 2021 Filing 6 Proposed Summons. (Chesler, Evan) (Filed on 9/21/2021)
September 20, 2021 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/10/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/17/2021 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom A, 15th Floor. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2021)
September 20, 2021 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/4/2021. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2021)
September 17, 2021 Filing 3 Certification of Interested Entities or Persons filed by Unlockd Media, Inc. Liquidation Trust re #1 Complaint (Chesler, Evan) (Filed on 9/17/2021)
September 17, 2021 Filing 2 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of the Complaint filed by Unlockd Media, Inc. Liquidation Trust. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Peter S. Kaufman, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Unredacted Complaint)(Chesler, Evan) (Filed on 9/17/2021)
September 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY TRIAL DEMAND (Redacted Version) against Alphabet, Inc., Google Asia Pacific Pte. Ltd., Google Commerce Limited, Google Ireland Limited, Google LLC. Filed by Unlockd Media, Inc. Liquidation Trust. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Chesler, Evan) (Filed on 9/17/2021) Modified on 9/20/2021 (slhS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Unlockd Media, Inc. Liquidation Trust v. Google LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Unlockd Media, Inc. Liquidation Trust
Represented By: Evan R. Chesler
Represented By: Keith R Hummel
Represented By: Lauren Rosenberg
Represented By: Yonatan Even
Represented By: Christopher Daniel Sullivan
Represented By: Allan Brent Diamond
Represented By: Lauren M Rosenberg
Represented By: Quentin Alexandre Roberts
Represented By: Sevana Zadourian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google LLC
Represented By: Michael Graham Rhodes
Represented By: Ashley K Corkery
Represented By: Beatriz Mejia
Represented By: Deepti Bansal
Represented By: John C. Dwyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google Ireland Limited
Represented By: Michael Graham Rhodes
Represented By: Ashley K Corkery
Represented By: Beatriz Mejia
Represented By: Deepti Bansal
Represented By: John C. Dwyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google Commerce Limited
Represented By: Michael Graham Rhodes
Represented By: Ashley K Corkery
Represented By: Beatriz Mejia
Represented By: Deepti Bansal
Represented By: John C. Dwyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alphabet, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Graham Rhodes
Represented By: Ashley K Corkery
Represented By: Beatriz Mejia
Represented By: Deepti Bansal
Represented By: John C. Dwyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google Asia Pacific Pte. Ltd.
Represented By: Michael Graham Rhodes
Represented By: Ashley K Corkery
Represented By: Beatriz Mejia
Represented By: Deepti Bansal
Represented By: John C. Dwyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?