Fobb v. Uber Technologies, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Fobb Kendrick and Kendrick Fobb
Defendant: Uber Technologies, Inc., Rasier, LLC and Rasier-CA, LLC
Case Number: 4:2021cv07778
Filed: October 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Referring Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2021 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. The correct event for return of summons is, "Summons Returned Executed." [err101]Corrected by Clerk's Office . No further action is necessary. Re: #33 Affidavit of Service filed by Kendrick Fobb (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2021)
November 29, 2021 Filing 33 Summons returned executed as to: Defendants Uber Technologies, Inc.; Rasier, LLC; Rasier-CA, LLC on November 24, 2021, filed by Kendrick Fobb. (Camastra, Ryan) (Filed on 11/29/2021) Modified on 11/30/2021 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
November 29, 2021 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Andre Camastra (Camastra, Ryan) (Filed on 11/29/2021)
November 24, 2021 Filing 31 REPLY (re #21 MOTION to Remand ) filed byKendrick Fobb. (Carney, Michael) (Filed on 11/24/2021)
November 22, 2021 Filing 30 Summons Issued as to Rasier, LLC, Rasier-CA, LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (kmg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2021)
November 19, 2021 Filing 29 Proposed Summons. (Carney, Michael) (Filed on 11/19/2021)
November 18, 2021 Filing 28 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #21 MOTION to Remand ) filed byRasier, LLC, Rasier-CA, LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Paul Alarcon, #2 Declaration of Alejandra Vasquez)(Alarcon, Paul) (Filed on 11/18/2021)
November 15, 2021 Filing 27 NOTICE by Kendrick Fobb re #21 MOTION to Remand Amended Notice of Motion (Carney, Michael) (Filed on 11/15/2021)
November 15, 2021 Set Hearing as to #21 MOTION to Remand, See Docket No. #27 : Motion Hearing set for 3/24/2022 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam Jr. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2021) Modified on 11/15/2021 to correct hearing date (year)(ndr, COURT STAFF).
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #18 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Jaime M. Farrell. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2021)
November 5, 2021 Filing 25 CLERK'S NOTICE Re Docket No. #23 . Notice is hereby given that counsel must re-notice not re-file the #21 motion to remand. Hearing date of December 16, 2021, is vacated. The briefing schedule remains in effect. Counsel is directed to check the Court's scheduling notes before re-noticing the motion for a new hearing date. December 16th was not the Court's next available hearing date when this motion was e-filed. If counsel would like to request an earlier date, an administrative motion or a stipulation and proposed order should be filed after the motion is re-noticed. And if granted, the Court will advance the hearing date. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2021)
November 5, 2021 Filing 24 NOTICE by Kendrick Fobb Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance as Counsel for Plaintiff (Higgins, Sean) (Filed on 11/5/2021)
November 5, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE by Kendrick Fobb re #21 MOTION to Remand Notice of Motion (Carney, Michael) (Filed on 11/5/2021)
November 5, 2021 Filing 22 CLERK'S NOTICE. Notice is hereby given that counsel must notice the #21 motion to remand for hearing. The briefing schedule remains in effect. The motion should not be re-filed. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2021)
November 4, 2021 Filing 21 MOTION to Remand filed by Kendrick Fobb. Responses due by 11/18/2021. Replies due by 11/26/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law In Support of Motion to Remand, #2 Declaration of Michael W. Carney, #3 Proposed Order)(Carney, Michael) (Filed on 11/4/2021) Modified on 11/5/2021 to remove hearing date, motion hasn't been noticed for hearing. (ndr, COURT STAFF).
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #19 Stipulation re [14 ]MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Enlarging Plaintiff's Time to Respond. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2021)
November 4, 2021 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. In future use event "Stipulation and Proposed Order," when including order with stipulation Re: #19 STIPULATION filed by Kendrick Fobb (msr, COURT STAFF)
November 4, 2021 Reset Deadlines as to #14 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint, See Docket No. #20 : Responses due by 12/20/2021 and Replies due by 1/19/2022. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2021)
November 3, 2021 Filing 19 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER re #14 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Enlarging Plaintiff's Time to Respond filed by Kendrick Fobb. (Farrell, Jaime) (Filed on 11/3/2021) Modified on 11/4/2021 (msr, COURT STAFF).
October 27, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Jaime M. Farrell ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-16554990.) filed by Kendrick Fobb. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Application, #3 Exhibit A)(Farrell, Jaime) (Filed on 10/27/2021)
October 22, 2021 Set Hearing as to #14 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint, See Docket No. #17 : Motion Hearing set for 3/3/2022 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam Jr. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2021)
October 22, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE by Rasier, LLC, Rasier-CA, LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc. re #14 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint ; Hearing Set for 3/3/2022 at 2:00 pm (Alarcon, Paul) (Filed on 10/22/2021)
October 22, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Wayne Carney on behalf of Plaintiff (Carney, Michael) (Filed on 10/22/2021)
October 22, 2021 Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE. Notice is hereby given that counsel must notice the #14 motion to dismiss for hearing. The motion should not be re-filed. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2021)
October 21, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Rasier, LLC, Rasier-CA, LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. Responses due by 11/4/2021. Replies due by 11/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Paul Alarcon ISO MTD Complaint, #2 Proposed Order re MTD Complaint)(Alarcon, Paul) (Filed on 10/21/2021) Modified on 10/22/2021 to remove hearing date, motion not noticed for hearing(ndrS, COURT STAFF).
October 21, 2021 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Rasier, LLC, Rasier-CA, LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc. re: Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr Standing Order (Alarcon, Paul) (Filed on 10/21/2021)
October 21, 2021 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE.Notice is hereby given that a Case Management Conference has been set for January 11, 2022, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m., in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA. Case Management Statement due by January 4th. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. All future filings should reflect the case number as 4:21-cv-07778-HSG. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2021)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case, Signed by the Clerk on 10/21/2021. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2021)
October 20, 2021 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2021)
October 20, 2021 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Kendrick Fobb.. (Higgins, Sean) (Filed on 10/20/2021)
October 20, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean Thomas Higgins for Plaintiff Kendrick Fobb (Higgins, Sean) (Filed on 10/20/2021)
October 18, 2021 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Rasier, LLC, Rasier-CA, LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc... (Schleier, Samuel) (Filed on 10/18/2021)
October 8, 2021 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Rasier, LLC, Rasier-CA, LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc. re #4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, (Schleier, Samuel) (Filed on 10/8/2021)
October 6, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Rasier, LLC, Rasier-CA, LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc. re #2 Certificate of Interested Entities, #1 Notice of Removal, 3 Case Assigned by Intake,,, (Schleier, Samuel) (Filed on 10/6/2021)
October 6, 2021 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/29/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/5/2022 at 1:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2021)
October 5, 2021 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/19/2021. (asS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2021)
October 5, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Rasier, LLC, Rasier-CA, LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc. and Certificate of Interested Entities or Persons (Schleier, Samuel) (Filed on 10/5/2021)
October 5, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Francisco Superior Court. Their case number is CGC-21-595038. (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0971-16465682). Filed byRasier-CA, LLC, Rasier, LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Schleier, Samuel) (Filed on 10/5/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fobb v. Uber Technologies, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fobb Kendrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kendrick Fobb
Represented By: Michael Wayne Carney,
Represented By: Jaime M Farrell
Represented By: Ryan Andre Camastra
Represented By: Sean Thomas Higgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uber Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Samuel Q Schleier
Represented By: Paul Augusto Alarcon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rasier, LLC
Represented By: Samuel Q Schleier
Represented By: Paul Augusto Alarcon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rasier-CA, LLC
Represented By: Samuel Q Schleier
Represented By: Paul Augusto Alarcon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?