Duarte v. Planet Fitness, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Elidia Duarte
Defendant: Planet Fitness, Inc., Planet Fitness Assetco LLC, Planet Fitness Franchising LLC and Woodrock Gateway Center, LLC
Case Number: 4:2021cv08005
Filed: October 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: American with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2021 Filing 16 STIPULATION to Extend Defendants' Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Planet Fitness Assetco LLC, Planet Fitness Franchising LLC, Planet Fitness, Inc.. (Sullivan, Kevin) (Filed on 11/30/2021)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to case,. Signed by Clerk on 11/16/21. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2021)
November 15, 2021 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2021)
November 15, 2021 Filing 13 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Planet Fitness Assetco LLC, Planet Fitness Franchising LLC, Planet Fitness, Inc... (Sullivan, Kevin) (Filed on 11/15/2021)
November 2, 2021 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants Planet Fitness Assetco LLC, Planet Fitness Franchising LLC, and Planet Fitness, Inc. shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by November 16, 2021. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2021) Modified on 11/2/2021 (ahm, COURT STAFF).
November 1, 2021 Filing 11 STIPULATION to Extend Defendants' Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Planet Fitness Assetco LLC, Planet Fitness Franchising LLC, Planet Fitness, Inc.. (Sullivan, Kevin) (Filed on 11/1/2021)
November 1, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Dennis Sullivan on behalf of Defendants Planet Fitness, Inc., Planet Fitness Assetco LLC, and Planet Fitness Franchising LLC (Sullivan, Kevin) (Filed on 11/1/2021)
October 19, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Elidia Duarte. Planet Fitness, Inc. served on 10/18/2021, answer due 11/8/2021. (Karbelashvili, Irakli) (Filed on 10/19/2021)
October 18, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Elidia Duarte. Planet Fitness Franchising LLC served on 10/15/2021, answer due 11/5/2021. (Karbelashvili, Irakli) (Filed on 10/18/2021)
October 18, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Elidia Duarte. Planet Fitness Assetco LLC served on 10/15/2021, answer due 11/5/2021. (Karbelashvili, Irakli) (Filed on 10/18/2021)
October 13, 2021 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Elidia Duarte.. (Karbelashvili, Irene) (Filed on 10/13/2021)
October 13, 2021 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order for Cases Asserting Denial of Right of Access under Americans with Disabilities Act. (arkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2021)
October 13, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Planet Fitness Assetco LLC, Planet Fitness Franchising LLC, Planet Fitness, Inc., Woodrock Gateway Center, LLC. (arkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2021)
October 13, 2021 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/27/2021. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2021)
October 12, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Karbelashvili, Irakli) (Filed on 10/12/2021)
October 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Planet Fitness Assetco LLC, Planet Fitness Franchising LLC, Planet Fitness, Inc., Woodrock Gateway Center, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-16490590.). Filed byElidia Duarte. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Karbelashvili, Irakli) (Filed on 10/12/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Duarte v. Planet Fitness, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elidia Duarte
Represented By: Irakli Karbelashvili
Represented By: Irene Karbelashvili
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Planet Fitness, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin Dennis Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Planet Fitness Assetco LLC
Represented By: Kevin Dennis Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Planet Fitness Franchising LLC
Represented By: Kevin Dennis Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Woodrock Gateway Center, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?