San Miguel Erice et al v. Hemming et al
Plaintiff: Oscar San Miguel Erice, Franco Fasoli, Norberto Gonzalez and PF Urban Agency SL
Counter Claimant: Paul J. Hemming, Mirus Gallery, LLC and Zen Compound, LLC
Case Number: 4:2021cv08315
Filed: October 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Referring Judge: Kandis A Westmore
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 27, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2021 Filing 20 ANSWER to Amended Complaint and FIRST AMENDED, COUNTERCLAIM against PF Urban Agency SL, Oscar San Miguel Erice byZen Compound, LLC, Mirus Gallery, LLC, Paul J. Hemming. (Camarena, Ignascio) (Filed on 12/22/2021)
December 17, 2021 Filing 19 ANSWER to Amended Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs byMirus Gallery, LLC. (Camarena, Ignascio) (Filed on 12/17/2021)
December 3, 2021 Filing 18 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Franco Fasoli, Norberto Gonzalez, PF Urban Agency SL, Oscar San Miguel Erice. Amendment to #17 Amended Complaint CORRECTION OF DOCKET #17 . (Tsai, Jeffrey) (Filed on 12/3/2021)
December 3, 2021 Filing 17 **FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE SEE #18 ** AMENDED COMPLAINT (First) against Paul J. Hemming, Mirus Gallery, LLC, Zen Compound, LLC. Filed byNorberto Gonzalez, Oscar San Miguel Erice, PF Urban Agency SL, Franco Fasoli. (Tsai, Jeffrey) (Filed on 12/3/2021) Modified on 12/6/2021 (ark, COURT STAFF).
November 24, 2021 Filing 16 CLERK'S NOTICE RE DOCKET NO. 15 . Notice is hereby given that the case management conference previously set for January 25, 2022 will be held telephonically. This proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The parties are advised that in the event of an audio problem, counsel should be prepared to attend the hearing via Zoom conference at the Courts direction. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone.For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: 888-808-6929Access Code: 6064255The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines. The parties are further advised to ensure that the Court can hear and understand them clearly before speaking at length.PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2021)
November 12, 2021 Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE.Notice is hereby given that a Case Management Conference has been set for January 25, 2022, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m., in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA. Case Management Statement due by January 18th. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. All future filings should reflect the case number as 4:21-cv-08315-HSG. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2021)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case, Signed by the Clerk on 11/12/2021. (anj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2021)
November 12, 2021 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint byPaul J. Hemming, Mirus Gallery, LLC, Zen Compound, LLC. (Camarena, Ignascio) (Filed on 11/12/2021)
November 10, 2021 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2021)
November 9, 2021 Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Paul J. Hemming, Mirus Gallery, LLC, Zen Compound, LLC.. (Camarena, Ignascio) (Filed on 11/9/2021)
November 9, 2021 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT re #1 Notice of Removal, filing in State Court by Paul J. Hemming, Mirus Gallery, LLC, Zen Compound, LLC. (Camarena, Ignascio) (Filed on 11/9/2021)
November 9, 2021 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Franco Fasoli, Norberto Gonzalez, PF Urban Agency SL, Oscar San Miguel Erice.. (Tsai, Jeffrey) (Filed on 11/9/2021)
November 9, 2021 Filing 8 Certificate of Interested Entities by Franco Fasoli, Norberto Gonzalez, PF Urban Agency SL, Oscar San Miguel Erice (Tsai, Jeffrey) (Filed on 11/9/2021)
October 27, 2021 Filing 7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/18/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/25/2022 01:30 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. (ark, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2021)
October 26, 2021 Filing 6 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/9/2021. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2021)
October 26, 2021 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Zen Compound, LLC (Camarena, Ignascio) (Filed on 10/26/2021)
October 26, 2021 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mirus Gallery, LLC (Camarena, Ignascio) (Filed on 10/26/2021)
October 26, 2021 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Paul J. Hemming, Mirus Gallery, LLC, Zen Compound, LLC (Camarena, Ignascio) (Filed on 10/26/2021)
October 26, 2021 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet by Paul J. Hemming, Mirus Gallery, LLC, Zen Compound, LLC . (Camarena, Ignascio) (Filed on 10/26/2021)
October 26, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Francisco Superio Court. Their case number is CGC-21-595065. (Filing fee $402 receipt number BCANDC-16547949). Filed byPaul J. Hemming, Zen Compound, LLC, Mirus Gallery, LLC. (Camarena, Ignascio) (Filed on 10/26/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: San Miguel Erice et al v. Hemming et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oscar San Miguel Erice
Represented By: Jeffrey Eewu Tsai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Franco Fasoli
Represented By: Jeffrey Eewu Tsai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norberto Gonzalez
Represented By: Jeffrey Eewu Tsai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PF Urban Agency SL
Represented By: Jeffrey Eewu Tsai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Paul J. Hemming
Represented By: Ignascio Gallegos Camarena, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Mirus Gallery, LLC
Represented By: Ignascio Gallegos Camarena, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Zen Compound, LLC
Represented By: Ignascio Gallegos Camarena, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?