Tesla Motors, Inc. et al v. Balan
Petitioner: Tesla Motors, Inc. and Elon Musk
Respondent: Christina Balan and Cristina Balan
Case Number: 4:2021cv09325
Filed: December 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09 U.S.C. ยง 1
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2022 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Tesla Motors, Inc., Elon Musk. Service waived by Cristina Balan waiver sent on 1/25/2022, answer due 3/28/2022. (Weil, Michael) (Filed on 1/25/2022)
January 25, 2022 Filing 19 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Cristina Balan on January 25, 2022 by Elon Musk, Tesla Motors, Inc.. Waiver of Service due by 2/24/2022. (Weil, Michael) (Filed on 1/25/2022)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. SETTING Dkt. No. #17 Respondent Cristina Balan's motion to quash for a hearing on April 7, 2022, at 2:00 p.m. The briefing schedule remains in place. Given the ongoing COVID-19 pandemic, the parties will be advised closer to the hearing whether it will take place telephonically or in person. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hsglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2022)
January 25, 2022 Set Hearing as to #17 MOTION to Quash, See Docket No. 18 : Motion Hearing set for 4/7/2022 02:00 PM in Oakland, - To be determined before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam Jr. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2022)
January 24, 2022 Filing 17 Proposed MOTION to Quash filed by Cristina Balan. Responses due by 2/7/2022. Replies due by 2/14/2022. (Balan, Cristina) (Filed on 1/24/2022)
January 14, 2022 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tesla Motors, Inc., Elon Musk. Cristina Balan served on 1/4/2022, answer due 1/25/2022. (Weil, Michael) (Filed on 1/14/2022)
January 5, 2022 Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE.Notice is hereby given that a Case Management Conference has been set for March 8, 2022, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m., in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA. Case Management Statement due by March 1st. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. All future filings should reflect the case number as 4:21-cv-09325-HSG.. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2022)
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to case,. Signed by Clerk on 1/5/22. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2022)
January 5, 2022 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2022)
January 3, 2022 Filing 12 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Elon Musk, Tesla Motors, Inc... (Weil, Michael) (Filed on 1/3/2022)
January 3, 2022 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Cristina Balan. (ark, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2022)
December 22, 2021 Filing 10 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Tesla Motors, Inc., Elon Musk as to Cristina Balan. (Weil, Michael) (Filed on 12/22/2021)
December 21, 2021 #Electronic filing error. A summons has already been issued for this defendant. Please file the summons returned executed/unexecuted for a new summons to be issued. This filing wil l not be processed by the clerks office. Re: #8 Proposed Summons filed by Tesla Motors, Inc., Elon Musk (ark, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2021)
December 20, 2021 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 1/3/2022. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2021)
December 20, 2021 Filing 8 Proposed Summons. (Weil, Michael) (Filed on 12/20/2021)
December 20, 2021 Filing 7 PETITION to Confirm Arbitration Award against Christina Balan (). Filed byTesla Motors, Inc., Elon Musk. (Weil, Michael) (Filed on 12/20/2021)
December 20, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE by Elon Musk, Tesla Motors, Inc. re #4 Summons Issued, #1 Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award (Weil, Michael) (Filed on 12/20/2021)
December 3, 2021 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/25/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/4/2022 02:00 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (ark, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2021)
December 3, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Christina Balan. (ark, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2021)
December 3, 2021 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/17/2021. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2021)
December 2, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Weil, Michael) (Filed on 12/2/2021)
December 2, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION to Confirm Arbitration Award against Christina Balan (Filing fee $402 receipt number ACANDC-16683488). Filed byTesla Motors, Inc., Elon Musk. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Weil, Michael) (Filed on 12/2/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tesla Motors, Inc. et al v. Balan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Tesla Motors, Inc.
Represented By: Michael David Weil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Elon Musk
Represented By: Michael David Weil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Christina Balan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Cristina Balan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?