Iravani v. Unum Life Insurance Company of America
Plaintiff: Sharareh Iravani
Defendant: Unum Life Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 4:2021cv09895
Filed: December 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 2, 2022 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Sharareh Iravani. Service waived by Unum Life Insurance Company of America waiver sent on 2/1/2022, answer due 4/4/2022. (Keenley, James) (Filed on 2/2/2022)
January 19, 2022 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE. Notice is hereby given that a Case Management Conference has been set for March 29, 2022, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m., in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA. Case Management Statement due by March 22, 2022. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. All future filings should reflect the case number as 4:21-cv-09895-HSG. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2022)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson no longer assigned to case. Signed by Clerk on 01/19/2022. (mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2022)
January 19, 2022 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (rmm2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2022)
January 18, 2022 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Sharareh Iravani.. (Keenley, James) (Filed on 1/18/2022)
December 23, 2021 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/17/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/24/2022 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (kmg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2021)
December 22, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Unum Life Insurance Company of America. (kmg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2021)
December 22, 2021 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/5/2022. (jlg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2021)
December 21, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Keenley, James) (Filed on 12/21/2021)
December 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Unum Life Insurance Company of America ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-16742750.). Filed bySharareh Iravani. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Keenley, James) (Filed on 12/21/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Iravani v. Unum Life Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharareh Iravani
Represented By: James Pieper Keenley
Represented By: Brian Henry Kim
Represented By: Emily A. Bolt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unum Life Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?