Tapia v. The Coca-Cola Company
Plaintiff: Kyla Tapia
Defendant: The Coca-Cola Company
Case Number: 4:2022cv01362
Filed: March 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Referring Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #11 Stipulation. Amended Pleadings due by 5/26/2022; Answer/Motions due by 7/11/2022; Responses due by 8/24/2022; and Replies due by 9/14/2022. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2022)
April 26, 2022 Filing 11 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by The Coca-Cola Company, Kyla Tapia. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Gary Lafayette)(Lafayette, Gary) (Filed on 4/26/2022) Modified on 4/27/2022 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
March 25, 2022 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE. Notice is hereby given that the Case Management Conference, previously set for June 7, 2022, is continued to June 21, 2022, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m. Case Management Statement due by June 14th. The June 21st proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The parties are advised that in the event of an audio problem, counsel should be prepared to attend the hearing via Zoom conference at the Courts direction. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone.For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: 888-808-6929Access Code: 6064255The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines. The parties are further advised to ensure that the Court can hear and understand them clearly before speaking at length.PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2022)
March 23, 2022 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Kyla Tapia. Service waived by The Coca-Cola Company waiver sent on 3/11/2022, answer due 5/10/2022. (Shub, Jonathan) (Filed on 3/23/2022)
March 4, 2022 Filing 8 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/31/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/7/2022 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor. (anj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2022)
March 4, 2022 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to The Coca-Cola Company. (anj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2022)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to case. Signed by Clerk on 03/04/2022. (jlg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2022)
March 4, 2022 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ejk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2022)
March 4, 2022 Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Kyla Tapia.. (Shub, Jonathan) (Filed on 3/4/2022)
March 3, 2022 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/17/2022. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2022)
March 3, 2022 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Shub, Jonathan) (Filed on 3/3/2022)
March 3, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against The Coca-Cola Company ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-16957863.). Filed by Kyla Tapia. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Shub, Jonathan) (Filed on 3/3/2022) Modified on 3/4/2022 (anj, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tapia v. The Coca-Cola Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyla Tapia
Represented By: Jonathan Shub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Coca-Cola Company
Represented By: Gary T. Lafayette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?