Valjakka v. Netflix, Inc.
Plaintiff: Lauri Valjakka
Defendant: Netflix Inc
Case Number: 4:2022cv01490
Filed: March 9, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Virginia K DeMarchi
Referring Judge: Jon S Tigar
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 SCHEDULING ORDER. Amended Pleadings due by 5/13/2022. Close of Fact Discovery due by 9/29/2022. Opening Reports due by 10/14/2022. Responses due by 10/28/2022. Replies due by 11/4/2022. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 3, 2022. (mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2022)
May 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jon S. Tigar: Initial Case Management Conference held on 5/3/2022. Hearing held via Zoom videoconference. Written scheduling order to issue. Further case management conference set. Case Management Statement due by 10/11/2022. Further Case Management Conference set for 10/18/2022 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. Claims Construction Hearing set for 12/12/2022 02:00 PM. Tutorial Hearing set for 11/14/2022 02:00 PM in Oakland, - To be determined. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www. cand.uscourts.gov/jst Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. One list of names of all counsel appearing for all parties must be sent in one email to the CRD at JSTCRD@cand.uscourts.gov no later than October 17, 2022 by 2:00 p.m.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Case Management Statement due by 10/11/2022. Further Case Management Conference set for 10/18/2022 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. Claims Construction Hear ing set for 12/12/2022 02:00 PM. Tutorial Hearing set for 11/14/2022 02:00 PM in Oakland, - To be determined.Total Time in Court: 10 minutes. Court Reporter: N/A. Plaintiff Attorney: Susan Kalra. Defendant Attorney: Sarah Piepmeir. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mll, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/3/2022)
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 CERTIFICATION OF INTERESTED ENTITIES OR PERSONS (Civ. L.R. 3-15; Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1) filed by Lauri Valjakka (Kalra, Susan) (Filed on 4/27/2022)
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT - Joint Case Management Statement and [Proposed] Order filed by Lauri Valjakka. (Kalra, Susan) (Filed on 4/26/2022)
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 7.1 AND CERTIFICATION OF INTERESTED ENTITIES OR PERSONS PURSUANT TO CIV. L.R. 3-15 filed by Netflix Inc. (Piepmeier, Sarah) (Filed on 4/26/2022)
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.),. Case Management Statement due by 4/26/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/3/2022 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jst Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argumen t at the hearing. One list of names of all counsel appearing for all parties must be sent in one email to the CRD at JSTCRD@cand.uscourts.gov no later than May 2, 2022 by 2:00 p.m.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Case Management Statement due by 4/26/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/3/2022 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. (mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2022)
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #29 Motion to Continue Time of the Case Management Conference and Statement.(mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2022)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Susan S.Q. Kalra (Kalra, Susan) (Filed on 4/8/2022)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #29 MOTION to Continue Time of the Case Management Conference and Statement ) filed byLauri Valjakka. (Kalra, Susan) (Filed on 4/8/2022)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Continue Time of the Case Management Conference and Statement filed by Netflix Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Piepmeier, Sarah) (Filed on 4/4/2022)
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.),. Case Management Statement due by 4/12/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/19/2022 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jst Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argume nt at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at JSTCRD@cand.uscourts.gov no later than April 18, 2022 by 2:00 p.m.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Case Management Statement due by 4/12/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/19/2022 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. (mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3 0/2022)
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 NOTICE OF EX PARTE CONTACT; SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 30, 2022. (mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2022)
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE,. Case Management Statement due by 6/21/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/28/2022 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jst Court Appearances: Adva nced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. One list of names of all counsel appearing for all parties must be sent in one email to the CRD at JSTCRD@cand.uscourts.gov no later than June 27, 2022 by 2:00 p.m.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/z oom/. Case Management Statement due by 6/21/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/28/2022 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. (mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2022)
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Clerk on 03/24/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(jlg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2022)
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2022)
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Netflix Inc.. (Piepmeier, Sarah) (Filed on 3/23/2022)
March 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE BY ZOOM. This case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. For a copy of Magistrate Judge Kim's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/6/2022 01:30 PM in San Francisco - Videoconference Only. Case Management Statement due by 5/31/2022. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/sk General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telepho ne or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2022)
March 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim for all further proceedings re #20 Order of Recusal. Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi no longer assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 3/10/2022,. Signed by Judge Clerk on 3/10/2022. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2022)
March 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 3/10/2022. (vkdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2022)
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/31/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/7/2022 at 1:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2022)
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Case Transferred in from United States District Court for the Western District of Texas; Waco Division; Case Number 6:21-cv-00947-ADA. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING #16 Motion to Transfer Case. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (jc5)
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Case transferred to District of Northern California. (jc5)
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Joint MOTION to Transfer Case to the Northern District of California and to Vacate All Pending Deadlines by Netflix, Inc.. (Piepmeier, Sarah)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE of Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Netflix, Inc. re #14 Amended Complaint (Piepmeier, Sarah)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Reset Deadlines: Netflix, Inc. answer due 3/4/2022. (jc5)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Netflix, Inc. amending, filed by Lauri Valjakka. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Ramey, William)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue, or in the Alternative, Transfer to the Northern District of California by Netflix, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Charlotte Bowers, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Declaration of Janice L. Ta, #5 Exhibit 1, #6 Proposed Order)(Piepmeier, Sarah)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Reset Deadlines: Netflix, Inc. answer due 12/13/2021. (jc5)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Second Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Netflix, Inc. re #1 Complaint (Piepmeier, Sarah)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William P. Ramey, III on behalf of Lauri Valjakka. Attorney William P. Ramey, III added to party Lauri Valjakka(pty:pla) (Ramey, William)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Netflix, Inc.. (Piepmeier, Sarah)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Reset Deadlines: Netflix, Inc. answer due 11/29/2021. (jc5)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Netflix, Inc. re #1 Complaint (Piepmeier, Sarah)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Janice L. Ta on behalf of Netflix, Inc.. Attorney Janice L. Ta added to party Netflix, Inc.(pty:dft) (Ta, Janice)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sarah E. Piepmeier on behalf of Netflix, Inc.. Attorney Sarah E. Piepmeier added to party Netflix, Inc.(pty:dft) (Piepmeier, Sarah)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Standing Order Regarding Order Governing Proceedings Patent Cases. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright.
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lauri Valjakka. Netflix, Inc. served on 9/24/2021, answer due 10/15/2021. (Robinson, Erick)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Netflix, Inc. (jc5)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Lauri Valjakka. (Robinson, Erick)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Robinson, Erick)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT AND JURY TRIAL DEMANDED (Filing Fee: $402.00, receipt number 0542-15212433). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Lauri Valjakka. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Robinson, Erick)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order All parties shall comply with the Standing Orders located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/. (lad)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Valjakka v. Netflix, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lauri Valjakka
Represented By: William P. Ramey, III
Represented By: Erick Scott Robinson
Represented By: Susan S.Q. Kalra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Netflix Inc
Represented By: Sarah E. Piepmeier
Represented By: Janice L. Ta
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Piepmeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?