Flow Devices and Systems, Inc. v. Pivotal Systems Corporation
Plaintiff: Flow Devices and Systems, Inc.
Defendant: Pivotal Systems Corporation
Case Number: 4:2022cv02453
Filed: April 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Susan van Keulen
Referring Judge: Jon S Tigar
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 16, 2022 Filing 36 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support [F.R.C.P. 12(b)(6) filed by Pivotal Systems Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 9/1/2022 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 6/30/2022. Replies due by 7/7/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew Ganas, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Proposed Order)(Mulloy, Richard) (Filed on 6/16/2022)
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #34 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Matthew Ganas.(bns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2022)
June 2, 2022 Filing 34 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17229907.) filed by Pivotal Systems Corporation. (Ganas, Matthew) (Filed on 6/2/2022)
May 25, 2022 Filing 33 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Document attached. Parties should still follow the guidance in ECF. 32 , regarding registration and participation in the Zoom hearing. (mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2022)
May 25, 2022 Filing 32 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.). Case Management Statement due by 8/16/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/23/2022 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jst Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. One list of names of all counsel appearing for all parties must be sent in one email to the CRD at JSTCRD@cand.uscourts.gov no later than August 22, 2022 by 2:00 p.m.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Case Management Statement due by 8/16/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/23/2022 02:00 PM in Oakland , - Videoconference Only. (mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2022)
May 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen no longer assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 5/25/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2022)
May 25, 2022 Filing 30 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (jhf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2022)
May 25, 2022 Filing 29 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Flow Devices and Systems, Inc... (Lobbin, Stephen) (Filed on 5/25/2022)
May 19, 2022 Filing 28 2ND CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff(s) shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 6/2/2022. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jhf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2022)
May 4, 2022 Filing 27 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff(s) shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 5/18/2022. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jhf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2022)
May 3, 2022 Filing 26 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Pivotal Systems Corporation.. (Mulloy, Richard) (Filed on 5/3/2022)
April 21, 2022 Filing 25 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/12/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/19/2022 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2022)
April 21, 2022 Filing 24 Case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 8:21-cv-02089. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF ARTICLE III STANDING AND GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE TRANSFER VENUE TO THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA [Dkt. #15 ] by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Case electronically sent. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (twdb)
April 11, 2022 Filing 22 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Motion to Dismiss Complaint [F.R.C.P. 12(b)(1), 12(b)(3), 12 (b)(6)] #15 filed by Defendant Pivotal Systems Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew Ganas, #2 Exhibit A)(Mulloy, Richard)
April 4, 2022 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Motion to Dismiss Complaint [F.R.C.P. 12(b)(1), 12(b)(3), 12 (b)(6)] #15 filed by Plaintiff Flow Devices and Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Lobbin, Stephen)
March 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Cormac J. Carney: granting #19 Non-Resident Attorney Matthew Ganas APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Pivotal Systems Corporation, designating Nandan Padmanabhan as local counsel. (lmh)
March 31, 2022 Filing 19 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Matthew Ganas to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Pivotal Systems Corporation (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 3/24/2022, Receipt No. 33001361) filed by Defendant Pivotal Systems Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Padmanabhan, Nandan)
March 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Matthew Ganas to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Pivotal Systems Corporation (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-33001361) #14 , for the following reasons: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d), Certificate of Good Standing not attached for every state court listed to which the applicant has been admitted. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
March 25, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Matthew Ganas to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Pivotal Systems Corporation (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-33001361) #14 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Certificate of Good Standing not attached for every state court listed to which the applicant has been admitted. Other error(s) with document(s): Certificates of Good Standing have been required since 9/08. See LR 83-2.1.3.3. See Instructions for Applicants (1) (G-64). (lt)
March 25, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE OF INTENT by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Scheduling order to be issued on May 26, 2022. (rrp)
March 25, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Motion to Dismiss Complaint [F.R.C.P. 12(b)(1), 12(b)(3), 12 (b)(6)] filed by Defendant Pivotal Systems Corporation. Motion set for hearing on 4/25/2022 at 01:30 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration of Joseph Monkowski, #3 Proposed Order) (Mulloy, Richard)
March 24, 2022 Filing 14 [STRICKEN PURSUANT TO #18] APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Matthew Ganas to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Pivotal Systems Corporation (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-33001361) filed by Defendant Pivotal Systems Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Padmanabhan, Nandan) Modified on 3/31/2022 (twdb).
March 9, 2022 Filing 13 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint filed by Defendant Pivotal Systems Corporation.(Padmanabhan, Nandan)
March 9, 2022 Filing 12 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Nandan R. Padmanabhan counsel for Defendant Pivotal Systems Corporation. Adding Richard Mulloy as counsel of record for Pivotal Systems Corporation for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Pivotal Systems Corporation. (Padmanabhan, Nandan)
March 9, 2022 Filing 11 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Nandan R. Padmanabhan counsel for Defendant Pivotal Systems Corporation. Adding Nandan Padmanabhan as counsel of record for Pivotal Systems Corporation for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Pivotal Systems Corporation. (Attorney Nandan R. Padmanabhan added to party Pivotal Systems Corporation(pty:dft))(Padmanabhan, Nandan)
February 25, 2022 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Flow Devices and Systems, Inc., upon Defendant Pivotal Systems Corporation served on 2/18/2022, answer due 3/11/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon John Doe in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Lobbin, Stephen)
December 21, 2021 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Pivotal Systems Corporation. (lh)
December 21, 2021 Filing 8 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh)
December 21, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
December 21, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (lh)
December 18, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Flow Devices and Systems, Inc., (Lobbin, Stephen)
December 18, 2021 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Flow Devices and Systems, Inc.. (Lobbin, Stephen)
December 18, 2021 Filing 3 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Flow Devices and Systems, Inc.. (Lobbin, Stephen)
December 18, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Flow Devices and Systems, Inc.. (Lobbin, Stephen)
December 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32504055 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Flow Devices and Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Attorney Stephen M Lobbin added to party Flow Devices and Systems, Inc.(pty:pla))(Lobbin, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Flow Devices and Systems, Inc. v. Pivotal Systems Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Flow Devices and Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua Osborn
Represented By: Stephen M Lobbin
Represented By: Stephen Michael Lobbin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pivotal Systems Corporation
Represented By: Richard T Mulloy
Represented By: Matthew Ganas
Represented By: Nandan R Padmanabhan
Represented By: Richard Thomas Mulloy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?