Apple Inc. v. Li
Counter Defendant: Apple Inc.
Counter Claimant: Chian Chiu Li
Case Number: 4:2022cv02956
Filed: May 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Referring Judge: Joseph C Spero
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1126 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 6, 2022 Filing 23 ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM #17 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES and, COUNTERCLAIM against Chian Chiu Li byApple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Schafer, Mark) (Filed on 7/6/2022)
June 29, 2022 Filing 22 Refund Status re #18 Application for Refund Declined. (rgh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2022)
June 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #16 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Mark Schafer. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
June 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #15 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of B. Trent Webb. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
June 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #14 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Ryan Schletzbaum. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
June 16, 2022 Filing 18 Application for Refund, Receipt Number ACANDC-17189086 by Apple Inc.. (Richardson, Jason) (Filed on 6/16/2022)
June 15, 2022 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Apple Inc. byChian Chiu Li. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Answer to Apples Complaint (Attachments: Exhibits A-E). Filed by Chian Chiu Li (Filed on 6/15/2022))(Li, Chian Chiu) (Filed on 6/15/2022)
June 14, 2022 Filing 16 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Mark Schafer ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17263356.) filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Schafer, Mark) (Filed on 6/14/2022)
June 14, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of B. Trent Webb ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17263336.) filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Webb, B.) (Filed on 6/14/2022)
June 14, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Ryan Schletzbaum ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17263258.) Filing fee previously paid on 6/14/2022 filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Schletzbaum, Ryan) (Filed on 6/14/2022)
June 14, 2022 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Apple Inc.. Chian Chiu Li served on 5/27/2022, answer due 6/17/2022. (Richardson, Jason) (Filed on 6/14/2022)
May 23, 2022 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE. Notice is hereby given that a Case Management Conference has been set for August 23, 2022, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m. Case Management Statement due by August 16, 2022. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. All future filings should reflect the case number as 4:22-cv-02956-HSG. The August 23, 2022 proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The parties are advised that in the event of an audio problem, counsel should be prepared to attend the hearing via Zoom conference at the Courts direction. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone.For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: 888-808-6929Access Code: 6064255The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines.PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.),.(wft, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2022)
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Clerk on 05/20/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2022)
May 20, 2022 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2022)
May 19, 2022 Filing 9 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent (cc: form mailed to register). (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2022)
May 19, 2022 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Chian Chiu Li. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2022)
May 19, 2022 Filing 7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/12/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/19/2022 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2022)
May 19, 2022 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Apple Inc... (Richardson, Jason) (Filed on 5/19/2022)
May 19, 2022 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. (Richardson, Jason) (Filed on 5/19/2022)
May 19, 2022 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/2/2022. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2022)
May 18, 2022 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Apple Inc. (Richardson, Jason) (Filed on 5/18/2022)
May 18, 2022 Filing 2 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding Patent (cc: form mailed to register). (Richardson, Jason) (Filed on 5/18/2022)
May 18, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT OF NONINFRINGEMENT against Chian Chiu Li. Filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Richardson, Jason) (Filed on 5/18/2022)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Apple Inc. v. Li
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Apple Inc.
Represented By: Jason Matthew Richardson
Represented By: B. Trent Webb
Represented By: Mark Douglas Schafer
Represented By: Ryan Justin Schletzbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Chian Chiu Li
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?