Spence et al v. Meta Platforms, Inc., f/k/a Facebook, Inc.
Plaintiff: Alexis Spence, Kathleen Spence and Jeffrey Spence
Defendant: Meta Platforms, Inc., f/k/a Facebook, Inc., Meta Platforms, Inc., Instagram LLC, Facebook Payments, Inc., Siculus, Inc. and Facebook Operations, LLC
Case Number: 4:2022cv03294
Filed: June 6, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Maxine M Chesney
Referring Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
2 Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 19, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2023 Filing 34 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Rosemarie Theresa Ring NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANTS META PLATFORMS, INC., F/K/A FACEBOOK, INC.; FACEBOOK OPERATIONS, LLC; FACEBOOK PAYMENTS, INC.; INSTAGRAM LLC; SICULUS, INC. (Ring, Rosemarie) (Filed on 4/19/2023)
April 11, 2023 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Ashley Margaret Simonsen (Simonsen, Ashley) (Filed on 4/11/2023)
March 30, 2023 Filing 32 COMPLAINT Master Short Form Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial against All Defendants. Filed byAlexis Spence, Jeffrey Spence, Kathleen Spence. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Garrett, Laura) (Filed on 3/30/2023)
November 17, 2022 Filing 31 Transcript of Proceedings held on 11/09/2022, before Judge Gonzalez Rogers. Court Reporter Irene L. Rodriguez, email address Irene_Rodriguez@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing., TRANSCRIPT COPY DELIVERED Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/15/2023. (Rodriguez, Irene) (Filed on 11/17/2022)
October 11, 2022 Case Reassigned to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr no longer assigned to the case. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2022)
October 6, 2022 Filing 30 TRANSFER ORDER from Judicial Panel on Multi District Litigation, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407, that the action is transferred to the Northern District of California creating MDL No. 3047 (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2022)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER GRANTINNG #28 STIPULATION to Stay Proceedings Pending JPML Ruling. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 8/19/2022. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2022)
August 18, 2022 Filing 28 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Stay Proceedings Pending JPML Ruling filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Ring, Rosemarie) (Filed on 8/18/2022)
August 3, 2022 Filing 27 NOTICE of Motion for Transfer of Actions to the Northern District of Illinois or the Western District of Missouri Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407 for Coordinated or Consolidated Pretrial Proceedings. These documents are submitted to this court pursuant to JPML Rule 6.2 for informational purposes. The JPML will review the Motion for Transfer to determine whether to consolidate or coordinate the case. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2022)
June 30, 2022 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristin A. Linsley for Meta Platforms, Inc. (Linsley, Kristin) (Filed on 6/30/2022)
June 30, 2022 Filing 25 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, to Extend Defendant's Deadline to Respond filed by Meta Platforms, Inc., f/k/a Facebook, Inc.. (Ring, Rosemarie) (Filed on 6/30/2022)
June 30, 2022 Filing 24 Certificate of Interested Entities by Meta Platforms, Inc., f/k/a Facebook, Inc. (Ring, Rosemarie) (Filed on 6/30/2022)
June 30, 2022 Filing 23 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Meta Platforms, Inc., f/k/a Facebook, Inc. (Ring, Rosemarie) (Filed on 6/30/2022)
June 30, 2022 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Rosemarie Theresa Ring for Meta Platforms, Inc. (Ring, Rosemarie) (Filed on 6/30/2022)
June 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #18 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Bergman, Matthew. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2022)
June 27, 2022 Filing 20 CLERK'S NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE DOCKET NO. #18 . All future filings should reflect the case number as 4:22-cv-03294-HSG. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2022)
June 27, 2022 *** #3 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Matthew Bergman Terminated, Re-filed as Docket No. #18 . *** (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2022)
June 25, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE of Change of Address by Laura R. Garrett (Garrett, Laura) (Filed on 6/25/2022)
June 25, 2022 Filing 18 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17240576.) Filing fee previously paid on 6/6/2022 filed by Alexis Spence, Jeffrey Spence, Kathleen Spence. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing)(Bergman, Matthew) (Filed on 6/25/2022)
June 23, 2022 Filing 17 CLERK'S NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE DOCKET NO. #3 . Pursuant to Local Rule 11-3 (a)(3). Your local co-counsel must be an attorney, identified by name and office address, who is a member of the bar of this Court in good standing and who maintains an office within the State of California. A new written application must be re-filed in its entirety along the required attachments. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2022)
June 20, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE by Alexis Spence, Jeffrey Spence, Kathleen Spence Notice of Association of Counsel (Garrett, Laura) (Filed on 6/20/2022)
June 14, 2022 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alexis Spence, Jeffrey Spence, Kathleen Spence. Meta Platforms, Inc., f/k/a Facebook, Inc. served on 6/10/2022, answer due 7/1/2022. (Garrett, Laura) (Filed on 6/14/2022)
June 14, 2022 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]Please re-file in its entirety as Summons Returned Executed. Re: #14 Affidavit of Service, filed by Kathleen Spenc e, Jeffrey Spence, Alexis Spence (sfb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2022)
June 13, 2022 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint; Summons; Civil Info Sheet; Initial Case Management Scheduling Order; Order Reassigning Case served on Meta Platforms, Inc. on 06/10/2022, filed by Alexis Spence, Jeffrey Spence, Kathleen Spence. (Garrett, Laura) (Filed on 6/13/2022)
June 9, 2022 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE DOCKET NO. #3 . Your local co-counsel has a WA address. Local Rule 11-3(a)(3) says that an attorney, identified by name and office address, who is a member of the bar of this Court in good standing and who maintains an office within the State of California, is designated as co-counsel. Please re-file your application and update the docket with a local CA co-counsel. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2022)
June 8, 2022 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE.Notice is hereby given that a Case Management Conference has been set for September 13, 2022, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m. Case Management Statement due by September 6th. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. All future filings should reflect the case number as 4:22-cv-03294-HSG. The September 13th proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The parties are advised that in the event of an audio problem, counsel should be prepared to attend the hearing via Zoom conference at the Courts direction. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone.For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: 888-808-6929Access Code: 6064255The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines. The parties are further advised to ensure that the Court can hear and understand them clearly before speaking at length.PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2022)
June 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Judge Maxine M. Chesney no longer assigned to case. Signed by Clerk on 06/08/2022. (jlg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2022)
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 7, 2022. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2022)
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Maxine M. Chesney for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Clerk on 06/07/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2022)
June 7, 2022 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Meta Platforms, Inc., f/k/a Facebook, Inc. (sfb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2022)
June 7, 2022 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (rmm2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2022)
June 7, 2022 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/1/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/8/2022 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (sfb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2022)
June 7, 2022 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Alexis Spence, Jeffrey Spence, Kathleen Spence.. (Garrett, Laura) (Filed on 6/7/2022)
June 6, 2022 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/20/2022. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2022)
June 6, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Matthew Bergman ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17240576.) filed by Alexis Spence, Jeffrey Spence, Kathleen Spence. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cert of Good Standing)(Bergman, Matthew) (Filed on 6/6/2022)
June 6, 2022 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Garrett, Laura) (Filed on 6/6/2022)
June 6, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Meta Platforms, Inc., f/k/a Facebook, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-17240486.). Filed byAlexis Spence, Jeffrey Spence, Kathleen Spence. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Garrett, Laura) (Filed on 6/6/2022)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spence et al v. Meta Platforms, Inc., f/k/a Facebook, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexis Spence
Represented By: Matthew P Bergman
Represented By: Laura R. Garrett
Represented By: Christopher L Ayers
Represented By: Christopher A. Seeger
Represented By: Robert H. Klonoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Spence
Represented By: Matthew P Bergman
Represented By: Laura R. Garrett
Represented By: Christopher L Ayers
Represented By: Christopher A. Seeger
Represented By: Robert H. Klonoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Spence
Represented By: Matthew P Bergman
Represented By: Laura R. Garrett
Represented By: Christopher L Ayers
Represented By: Christopher A. Seeger
Represented By: Robert H. Klonoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meta Platforms, Inc., f/k/a Facebook, Inc.
Represented By: Kristin A. Linsley
Represented By: Rosemarie Theresa Ring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meta Platforms, Inc.
Represented By: Kristin A. Linsley
Represented By: Rosemarie Theresa Ring
Represented By: Paul William Schmidt
Represented By: Ashley Margaret Simonsen
Represented By: Emily Johnson Henn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Instagram LLC
Represented By: Ashley Margaret Simonsen
Represented By: Emily Johnson Henn
Represented By: Paul William Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook Payments, Inc.
Represented By: Paul William Schmidt
Represented By: Emily Johnson Henn
Represented By: Ashley Margaret Simonsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Siculus, Inc.
Represented By: Emily Johnson Henn
Represented By: Paul William Schmidt
Represented By: Ashley Margaret Simonsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook Operations, LLC
Represented By: Emily Johnson Henn
Represented By: Ashley Margaret Simonsen
Represented By: Paul William Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?