Antetokounmpo v. Zellner et al
Plaintiff: GIANNIS ANTETOKOUNMPO
Defendant: Sarah Zellner, Shalicia E Hurns, Brittney Snider, Mario Zucca, Eric Preuss, Demareas J Jackson, Can Arda, Richard A Ray and Playbook Inc.
Case Number: 4:2022cv03412
Filed: June 9, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1051 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers Granting #51 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (amg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2022)
July 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ***DISREGARD. ERROR IN FILING. FILED IN THE WRONG CASE.*** ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers Granting #51 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (amg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2022) Modified on 7/27/2022 (amg, COURT STAFF).
July 20, 2022 #Electronic filing error. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: THOMAS D. GEORGIANNA. The docket shows a different address from what is appearing on the document (dkt. #: 49 Notice of Appeara nce filed by GIANNIS ANTETOKOUNMPO). Please update your personal profile on ECF. (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2022)
July 20, 2022 Filing 51 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 074852.) Filing fee previously paid on Jul 20, 2022 filed by GIANNIS ANTETOKOUNMPO. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Melekou, Eleni) (Filed on 7/20/2022)
July 20, 2022 Filing 50 First MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17366962.) filed by GIANNIS ANTETOKOUNMPO. (Georgianna, Thomas) (Filed on 7/20/2022)
July 20, 2022 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas David Georgianna (Georgianna, Thomas) (Filed on 7/20/2022)
June 15, 2022 Filing 48 Certificate of Interested Entities by Playbook Inc. (Perkowski, Peter) (Filed on 6/15/2022)
June 15, 2022 Filing 47 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Playbook Inc.. (Perkowski, Peter) (Filed on 6/15/2022) Modified on 6/16/2022 (anj, COURT STAFF).
June 9, 2022 Filing 46 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Case Management Statement due by 9/5/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/12/2022 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2022)
June 9, 2022 Filing 45 Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:22-cv-01866. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
June 2, 2022 PARTY TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY pertaining to Playbook Inc. only, from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - Northern District of California. *severing the claims against Playbook Inc. and transferring them to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California for improper venue and/or for other relief (Dkt 36) is granted to the extent that the claims against Playbook Inc. are severed from the remainder of the case and transferred to the Northern District of California, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1406, for improper venue. (ama) Modified on 6/9/2022 (ama).
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER: granting #36 Motion to Dismiss; granting #36 Motion to Sever; granting #36 Motion to Transfer Case. The motion of defendant Playbook Inc. for an order severing the claims against it and transferring them to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California for improper venue and/or for other relief (Dkt 36) is granted to the extent that the claims against Playbook Inc. are severed from the remainder of the case and transferred to the Northern District of California, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1406, for improper venue and otherwise denied as moot. None of the parties resides in this district, Plaintiff has failed to allege or otherwise establish that any substantial part of the events or omissions giving rise to the claim occurred in this District. As defendant Playbook Inc. is a California corporation with its principal place of business in the Northern District of California, this action could have been brought there. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 6/02/2022) (ama) Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing.
May 31, 2022 Filing 43 RESPONSE in Support of Motion re: #36 MOTION to Dismiss . MOTION to Sever . MOTION to Transfer Case . Evidentiary Objections to Declaration of Anastasi Pardalis (ECF 40). Document filed by Playbook Inc...(Perkowski, Peter)
May 31, 2022 Filing 42 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #36 MOTION to Dismiss . MOTION to Sever . MOTION to Transfer Case . . Document filed by Playbook Inc...(Perkowski, Peter)
May 23, 2022 Filing 41 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #36 MOTION to Dismiss . MOTION to Sever . MOTION to Transfer Case . . Document filed by Giannis Antetokounmpo..(Pardalis, Anastasi)
May 23, 2022 Filing 40 DECLARATION of Anastasi Pardalis in Opposition re: #36 MOTION to Dismiss . MOTION to Sever . MOTION to Transfer Case .. Document filed by Giannis Antetokounmpo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D).(Pardalis, Anastasi)
May 10, 2022 Filing 39 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Playbook Inc...(Perkowski, Peter)
May 9, 2022 Filing 38 DECLARATION of Austin Lockwood in Support re: #36 MOTION to Dismiss . MOTION to Sever . MOTION to Transfer Case .. Document filed by Playbook Inc...(Perkowski, Peter)
May 9, 2022 Filing 37 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #36 MOTION to Dismiss . MOTION to Sever . MOTION to Transfer Case . . Document filed by Playbook Inc...(Perkowski, Peter)
May 9, 2022 Filing 36 MOTION to Dismiss ., MOTION to Sever ., MOTION to Transfer Case . Document filed by Playbook Inc...(Perkowski, Peter)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 STIPULATION OF PARTIAL DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE... IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned Counsel for Plaintiff and Defendant, acting pro se, acting in the above-entitled action be, and the same hereby is discontinued, with prejudice, as to Defendant ERIC PREUSS only, with each side bearing their own fees and costs. SO ORDERED., (Eric Preuss terminated.) (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 4/25/22) (yv)
April 18, 2022 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. #33 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal, was reviewed and referred to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan for approval for the following reason(s): the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal and it did not dismiss all of the parties or the action in its entirety. (tp)
April 15, 2022 Filing 34 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Peter E. Perkowski on behalf of Playbook Inc...(Perkowski, Peter)
April 15, 2022 Filing 33 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, against the defendant(s) Eric Preuss. Document filed by Giannis Antetokounmpo. Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff...(Pardalis, Anastasi)
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STIPULATION OF PARTIAL DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE... IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned Counsel for Plaintiff and Defendant acting pro se, acting in the above-entitled action he, and the same hereby is discontinued, with prejudice, as to Defendant CAN ARDA only, with each side bearing their own fees and costs. IT IS FURTHER STIPULATED AND AGREED, that this stipulation may contain counterparts or facsimile signatures, which shall be deemed as originals. SO ORDERED., ( Can Arda terminated.) (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 4/5/22) (yv)
April 4, 2022 Filing 31 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, against the defendant(s) Can Arda. Document filed by Giannis Antetokounmpo. Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff...(Pardalis, Anastasi)
April 4, 2022 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. #30 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal, was reviewed and referred to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan for approval for the following reason(s): the stipulation of dismissal is not pursuant to F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii); the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal and it did not dismiss all of the parties or the action in its entirety; the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal in a Pro Se case;. (nd)
April 1, 2022 Filing 30 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, against the defendant(s) Eric Preuss. Document filed by Giannis Antetokounmpo. Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff...(Pardalis, Anastasi)
April 1, 2022 Filing 29 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Can Arda served on 3/10/2022, answer due 3/31/2022. Service was accepted by CAN ARDA. Document filed by Giannis Antetokounmpo..(Pardalis, Anastasi)
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned Counsel for Plaintiff and Defendant, acting in the above-entitled action be, and the same hereby is discontinued, with prejudice, as to Defendant MARIO ZUCCA only, with each side bearing their own fees and costs. IT IS FURTHER STIPULATED AND AGREED, that this stipulation may contain counterparts or facsimile signatures, which shall be deemed as originals. ORDERED. Mario Zucca terminated. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 3/30/2022) (vfr)
March 30, 2022 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. #27 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal, was reviewed and referred to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan for approval for the following reason(s): the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal and it did not dismiss all of the parties or the action in its entirety. (tp)
March 29, 2022 Filing 27 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, against the defendant(s) Mario Zucca. Document filed by Giannis Antetokounmpo. Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff...(Pardalis, Anastasi)
March 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER RE SCHEDULING AND INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: This action having been assigned to me for all purposes, it is hereby, ORDERED as follows: Counsel receiving this order shall promptly mail copies hereof to all other counsel ofrecord or, in the case of parties for which no appearance has been made, to such parties. Counsel for all parties are directed to confer regarding an agreed scheduling order. If counsel are able to agree on a schedule and the agreed schedule calls for filing of the pretrial order not more than six (6) months from the date of this order, counsel shall sign and file by 5/3/2022 a consent order in the form annexed for consideration by the Court. If such a consent order is not filed within the time provided, a video-conference invite will be emailed to counsel setting a video-conference on 5/17/2022 at 3:00 p.m. Any party desiring a conference with the Court for purposes of discussing settlement, narrowing of issues, or other pertinent pretrial matters may request a conference by letter. And as set forth herein. SO ORDERED.(Video-Conference) Initial Conference set for 5/17/2022 at 03:00 PM before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 3/29/2022) (ama)
March 29, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. Notice to Attorney Anastasi Paradalis. RE-FILE Document No. #25 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the stipulation of dismissal is not pursuant to F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). Re-file the document using the event type Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer/filers - select the correct party/parties the voluntary dismissal is against - and attach the correct signed (scanned signature image) PDF. (tp)
March 28, 2022 Filing 25 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Mario Zucca pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Giannis Antetokounmpo. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Pardalis, Anastasi) Modified on 3/29/2022 (tp).
March 18, 2022 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. #24 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal, was reviewed and referred to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan for approval for the following reason(s): the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal and it did not dismiss all of the parties or the action in its entirety. (tp)
March 17, 2022 Filing 24 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Eric Preuss pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Giannis Antetokounmpo. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Pardalis, Anastasi)
March 9, 2022 Filing 23 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Playbook Inc. waiver sent on 3/8/2022, answer due 5/9/2022. Document filed by Giannis Antetokounmpo..(Pardalis, Anastasi)
March 7, 2022 Filing 22 AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 15 U.S.C. 1116, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following trademark(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (vf)
March 7, 2022 Filing 21 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Playbook Inc.. (vf)
March 7, 2022 Filing 20 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Richard A Ray. (vf)
March 7, 2022 Filing 19 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Can Arda. (vf)
March 7, 2022 Filing 18 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Demareas J Jackson. (vf)
March 7, 2022 Filing 17 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Eric Preuss. (vf)
March 7, 2022 Filing 16 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Mario Zucca. (vf)
March 7, 2022 Filing 15 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Brittney Snider. (vf)
March 7, 2022 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Shalicia E Hurns. (vf)
March 7, 2022 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Sarah Zellner. (vf)
March 7, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Anastasi Pardalis. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Jury Demand code n (None). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Jury Demand code has been modified to p (Plaintiff). (vf)
March 7, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
March 7, 2022 Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
March 7, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
March 4, 2022 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to PLAYBOOK INC., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Giannis Antetokounmpo..(Pardalis, Anastasi)
March 4, 2022 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to RICHARD A. RAY, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Giannis Antetokounmpo..(Pardalis, Anastasi)
March 4, 2022 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to CAN ARDA, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Giannis Antetokounmpo..(Pardalis, Anastasi)
March 4, 2022 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to DEMAREAS J. JACKSON, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Giannis Antetokounmpo..(Pardalis, Anastasi)
March 4, 2022 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ERIC PREUSS, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Giannis Antetokounmpo..(Pardalis, Anastasi)
March 4, 2022 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MARIO ZUCCA, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Giannis Antetokounmpo..(Pardalis, Anastasi)
March 4, 2022 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to BRITTNEY SNIDER, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Giannis Antetokounmpo..(Pardalis, Anastasi)
March 4, 2022 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to SHALICIA E. HURNS, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Giannis Antetokounmpo..(Pardalis, Anastasi)
March 4, 2022 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to SARAH ZELLNER, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Giannis Antetokounmpo..(Pardalis, Anastasi)
March 4, 2022 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Pardalis, Anastasi)
March 4, 2022 Filing 2 AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review..(Pardalis, Anastasi)
March 4, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Can Arda, Shalicia E Hurns, Demareas J Jackson, Playbook Inc., Eric Preuss, Richard A Ray, Brittney Snider, Sarah Zellner, Mario Zucca. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25815948)Document filed by Giannis Antetokounmpo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B).(Pardalis, Anastasi)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Antetokounmpo v. Zellner et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GIANNIS ANTETOKOUNMPO
Represented By: Anastasi Pardalis
Represented By: Eleni Melekou
Represented By: Thomas David Georgianna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah Zellner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shalicia E Hurns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brittney Snider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mario Zucca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Preuss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Demareas J Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Can Arda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard A Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Playbook Inc.
Represented By: Peter E. Perkowski
Represented By: Peter Edward Perkowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?