League of Women Voters of Cupertino-Sunnyvale v. City of Cupertino et al
Plaintiff: League of Women Voters of Cupertino-Sunnyvale
Defendant: City of Cupertino, Darcy Paul, Diane Thompson, Kirsten Squarcia, Chris Jensen, Liang Chao, Kitty Moore, Hung Wei and Jon Willey
Case Number: 4:2022cv04189
Filed: July 19, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Referring Judge: Jeffrey S White
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 1, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MOTION to Dismiss filed by City of Cupertino, Darcy Paul, Diane Thompson, Kirsten Squarcia, Chris Jensen, Liang Chao, Kitty Moore, Hung Wei, and John Willey. Motion Hearing set for 11/18/2022 09:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor before Judge Jeffrey S. White. Responses due by 9/23/2022. Replies due by 9/30/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of City Clerk Kirsten Squarcia in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Supplement Request for Judicial Notice In Support of Motion to Dismiss, #3 Proposed Order in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(von Loewenfeldt, Michael) (Filed on 9/9/2022) Modified on 9/9/2022 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
September 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Refund Status re #29 Application for Refund Approved. (kep, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2022)
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Application for Refund, Receipt Number ACANDC-17361943 (Corrected) by League of Women Voters of Cupertino-Sunnyvale. (Lucia, Jamie) (Filed on 8/31/2022)
August 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by League of Women Voters of Cupertino-Sunnyvale re #24 Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice, #22 Case Assigned/Reassigned, #27 Stipulation, #23 Order,,,,,, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,,,,, Util - Teleconference Zoom,,,,, and standing orders of Judge Jeffrey S. White (Lucia, Jamie) (Filed on 8/12/2022)
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT filed by League of Women Voters of Cupertino-Sunnyvale. (Lucia, Jamie) (Filed on 8/8/2022)
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Refund Status re #25 Application for Refund Declined. (rgh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2022)
August 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Application for Refund, Receipt Number ACANDC-17362016 (Amended) by League of Women Voters of Cupertino-Sunnyvale. (Lucia, Jamie) (Filed on 8/3/2022)
August 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White Granting #16 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Michael Dockterman. (dts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2022)
August 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on August 3, 2022. Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/14/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/21/2022 11:00 AM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jsw Court Appearances:Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argu ment at the hearing. One list of names of all counsel appearing for all parties must be sent in one email to the CRD at jswcrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than October 20, 2022 at 12:00 PM PST.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (dts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2022)
August 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Case reassigned to Judge Jeffrey S. White. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins no longer assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 8/3/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording) (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2022)
August 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 This case will be randomly reassigned to a District Judge outside the San Jose Division pursuant to the Caseload Rebalancing Pilot Program approved by the Court effective March 1, 2018. For information, visit our web page at #http://cand.uscourts.gov/news/225. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2022)
August 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2022)
August 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Refund Status re #15 Application for Refund Declined. (rgh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2022)
August 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by League of Women Voters of Cupertino-Sunnyvale (Lucia, Jamie) (Filed on 8/2/2022)
August 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by League of Women Voters of Cupertino-Sunnyvale.. (Lucia, Jamie) (Filed on 8/2/2022)
July 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17393470.) filed by League of Women Voters of Cupertino-Sunnyvale. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Good Standing)(Dockterman, Michael) (Filed on 7/28/2022)
July 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Application for Refund re #1 Complaint,, Receipt Number ACANDC-17361943 for duplicate payment of initial filing fee by League of Women Voters of Cupertino-Sunnyvale. (Lucia, Jamie) (Filed on 7/27/2022)
July 25, 2022 Opinion or Order #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. The correct event is SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED located under the Initial Pleadings and Service/Service of Process category. [err101]Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #7 Certificate of Service filed by League of Women Voters of Cupertino-Sunnyvale, #10 Certificate of Service filed by League of Women Voters of Cupertino-Sunnyvale, #9 Certificate of Service filed by League of Women Voters of Cupertino-Sunnyvale, #13 Certificate of Service filed by League of Women Voters of Cupertino-Sunnyvale, #12 Certificate of Service filed by League of Women Voters of Cupertino-Sunnyvale, #14 Certificate of Service filed by League of Women Voters of Cupertino-Sunnyvale, #8 Certificate of Service filed by League of Women Voters of Cupertino-Sunnyvale, #11 Certificate of Service filed by League of Women Voters of Cupertino-Sunnyvale, #6 Certificate of Service filed by League of Women Voters of Cupertino-Sunnyvale (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2022)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by League of Women Voters of Cupertino-Sunnyvale. Defendant Jon Willey served on 7/22/22, answer due 8/12/22. (Lucia, Jamie) (Filed on 7/22/2022) Modified on 7/25/2022 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by League of Women Voters of Cupertino-Sunnyvale. Defendant Hung Wei served on 7/22/22, answer due 8/12/22. (Lucia, Jamie) (Filed on 7/22/2022) Modified on 7/25/2022 (mcl, COURT022 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by League of Women Voters of Cupertino-Sunnyvale. Defendant Diane Thompson served on 7/22/22, answer due 8/12/22. (Lucia, Jamie) (Filed on 7/22/2022) Modified on 7/25/2022 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by League of Women Voters of Cupertino-Sunnyvale. Defendant Kirsten Squarcia served on 7/22/22, answer due 8/12/22. (Lucia, Jamie) (Filed on 7/22/2022) Modified on 7/25/2022 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by League of Women Voters of Cupertino-Sunnyvale. Defendant Darcy Paul served on 7/22/22, answer due 8/12/22. (Lucia, Jamie) (Filed on 7/22/2022) Modified on 7/25/2022 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by League of Women Voters of Cupertino-Sunnyvale. Defendant Kitty Moore served on 7/22/22, answer due 8/12/22. (Lucia, Jamie) (Filed on 7/22/2022) Modified on 7/25/2022 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by League of Women Voters of Cupertino-Sunnyvale. Defendant Chris Jensen served on 7/22/22, answer due 8/12/22. (Lucia, Jamie) (Filed on 7/22/2022) Modified on 7/25/2022 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by League of Women Voters of Cupertino-Sunnyvale. Defendant Liang Chao served on 7/22/22, answer due 8/12/22. (Lucia, Jamie) (Filed on 7/22/2022) Modified on 7/25/2022 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by League of Women Voters of Cupertino-Sunnyvale. Defendant City of Cupertino served on 7/22/22, answer due 8/12/22. (Lucia, Jamie) (Filed on 7/22/2022) Modified on 7/25/2022 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Liang Chao, City of Cupertino, Chris Jensen, Kitty Moore, Darcy Paul, Kirsten Squarcia, Diane Thompson, Hung Wei, Jon Willey. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2022)
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/12/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/19/2022 10:00 AM. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2022)
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/2/2022. (mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2022)
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Lucia, Jamie) (Filed on 7/19/2022)
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Verified) for Declaratory Relief and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-17362016.). Filed byLeague of Women Voters of Cupertino-Sunnyvale. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lucia, Jamie) (Filed on 7/19/2022)
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order # Summons have been issued but in future filings, filer can submit just ONE summons listing out all the defendants in an attachment page. Re: #2 Proposed Summons filed by League of Women Voters of Cupertino-Sunnyvale. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2022)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: League of Women Voters of Cupertino-Sunnyvale v. City of Cupertino et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: League of Women Voters of Cupertino-Sunnyvale
Represented By: Jamie L. Lucia
Represented By: Amanda Carolyne Schwartz
Represented By: Michael Dockterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Cupertino
Represented By: Michael John von Loewenfeldt
Represented By: James M. Wagstaffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darcy Paul
Represented By: Michael John von Loewenfeldt
Represented By: James M. Wagstaffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diane Thompson
Represented By: Michael John von Loewenfeldt
Represented By: James M. Wagstaffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirsten Squarcia
Represented By: Michael John von Loewenfeldt
Represented By: James M. Wagstaffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Jensen
Represented By: Michael John von Loewenfeldt
Represented By: James M. Wagstaffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liang Chao
Represented By: Michael John von Loewenfeldt
Represented By: James M. Wagstaffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kitty Moore
Represented By: Michael John von Loewenfeldt
Represented By: James M. Wagstaffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hung Wei
Represented By: Michael John von Loewenfeldt
Represented By: James M. Wagstaffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon Willey
Represented By: Michael John von Loewenfeldt
Represented By: James M. Wagstaffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?