Center for Community Action and Environmental Justice v. U.S. Environmental Protection Agency et al
Plaintiff: Center for Community Action and Environmental Justice
Defendant: U.S. Environmental Protection Agency, Michael Regan and Martha Guzman
Case Number: 4:2022cv04191
Filed: July 19, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Hixson
Referring Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 7604 Clear Air Act (Emission Standards)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 16, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers Granting #16 JOINT STIPULATION HOLDING DEADLINES IN ABEYANCE AND VACATING THE INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Compliance due by 12/8/2022 09:01 AM. (amg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2022)
September 8, 2022 Filing 16 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Holding Deadlines in Abeyance for 90 Days and Vacate CMC in Light of Tentative Settlement re #15 Clerk's Notice, Util - Teleconference Zoom, filed by Martha Guzman, Michael Regan, U.S. Environmental Protection Agency and Center for Community Action and Environmental Justice. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hill, Leslie) (Filed on 9/8/2022) Modified on 9/8/2022 (jml, COURT STAFF).
August 16, 2022 Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/17/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/24/2022 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/ygr General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/17/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/24/2 022 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order) (amg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2022)
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 08/16/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2022)
August 16, 2022 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (rmm2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2022)
August 16, 2022 Filing 12 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Martha Guzman, Michael Regan, U.S. Environmental Protection Agency.. (Hill, Leslie) (Filed on 8/16/2022)
August 2, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Leslie M. Hill (Hill, Leslie) (Filed on 8/2/2022)
July 27, 2022 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Center for Community Action and Environmental Justice.. (Newell, Brent) (Filed on 7/27/2022)
July 20, 2022 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Center for Community Action and Environmental Justice. Martha Guzman served on 7/20/2022, answer due 8/10/2022; Michael Regan served on 7/20/2022, answer due 8/10/2022; U.S. Environmental Protection Agency served on 7/20/2022, answer due 8/10/2022. (Newell, Brent) (Filed on 7/20/2022)
July 20, 2022 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Center for Community Action and Environmental Justice (Newell, Brent) (Filed on 7/20/2022)
July 20, 2022 Filing 7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/13/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/20/2022 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2022)
July 20, 2022 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Martha Guzman, Michael Regan, U.S. Environmental Protection Agency, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2022)
July 19, 2022 Filing 5 Certificate of Interested Entities by Center for Community Action and Environmental Justice (Newell, Brent) (Filed on 7/19/2022)
July 19, 2022 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/2/2022. (jrs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2022)
July 19, 2022 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Newell, Brent) (Filed on 7/19/2022)
July 19, 2022 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet by Center for Community Action and Environmental Justice . (Newell, Brent) (Filed on 7/19/2022)
July 19, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Martha Guzman, Michael Regan, U.S. Environmental Protection Agency ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-17362921.). Filed byCenter for Community Action and Environmental Justice. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Newell, Brent) (Filed on 7/19/2022)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Center for Community Action and Environmental Justice v. U.S. Environmental Protection Agency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center for Community Action and Environmental Justice
Represented By: Brent Joseph Newell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Environmental Protection Agency
Represented By: Leslie M. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Regan
Represented By: Leslie M. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martha Guzman
Represented By: Leslie M. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?