C. et al v. City of Arcata et al
Plaintiff: A. C., C. C., D. C. and T. C.
Defendant: CITY OF ARCATA, City of Arcata Police Department, BRIAN AHEARN, BRIAN HOFFMAN, MOISES CORNEJO MERCADO, JOSEPH RODES, MICHAEL GRIFFIN and Evan Beechel
Case Number: 4:2022cv04804
Filed: August 22, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Referring Judge: Robert M Illman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 8, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER by Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DIRECTING Defendants TO SHOW CAUSE why Dkt. No. #17 the motion to dismiss should not be terminated as moot in light of Dkt. No. #21 Plaintiffs' amended complaint. Defendants shall file a statement of two pages or less by October 24, 2022. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hsglc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2022)
October 14, 2022 Filing 21 AMENDED COMPLAINT A.C., C.C., D.C., T.C. against All Defendants. Filed byD. C., C. C., A. C., T. C.. (Wells, Heidi) (Filed on 10/14/2022)
October 11, 2022 Filing 20 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #17 MOTION to Dismiss State Defendants Motion to Dismiss ) filed byA. C., C. C., D. C., T. C.. (Wells, Heidi) (Filed on 10/11/2022)
October 5, 2022 Filing 19 CLERK'S NOTICE. Notice is hereby given that the hearing on the #17 motion to dismiss, previously set for November 10, 2022, is continued to January 26, 2023, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m., in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA to be held along with the initial case management conference. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2022)
September 27, 2022 Filing 18 CLERK'S NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE DOCKET NO. #17 . In the future, counsel is advised to not notice a motion for one of the limited available dates without confirming availability with the CRD first as instructed by the Judge's scheduling notes. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2022)
September 27, 2022 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss State Defendants Motion to Dismiss filed by MOISES CORNEJO MERCADO, MICHAEL GRIFFIN. Motion Hearing set for 11/10/2022 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr.. Responses due by 10/11/2022. Replies due by 10/18/2022. (Speer, Kymberly) (Filed on 9/27/2022)
September 14, 2022 Filing 16 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE.Notice is hereby given that a Case Management Conference has been set for January 26, 2023, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m. Case Management Statement due by January 19th. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. All future filings should reflect the case number as 4:22-cv-04804-HSG. This proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The parties are advised that in the event of an audio problem, counsel should be prepared to attend the hearing via Zoom conference at the Courts direction. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone.For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: 888-808-6929Access Code: 6064255The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines. The parties are further advised to ensure that the Court can hear and understand them clearly before speaking at length.PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2022)
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Judge Jon S. Tigar no longer assigned to case, Signed by The Clerk on 09/13/2022. (jrs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2022)
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 RELATED CASE ORDER. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 9/13/2022. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2022)
August 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #3 Motion to Appoint Guardian ad Litem. (mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2022)
August 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #2 Motion to Appoint Guardian ad Litem. (mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2022)
August 24, 2022 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 11/22/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/29/2022 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jst Court Appearances: Adv anced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. One list of names of all counsel appearing for all parties must be sent in one email to the CRD at JSTCRD@cand.uscourts.gov no later than November 28, 2022 by 2:00 p.m.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts .gov/zoom/. Case Management Statement due by 11/22/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/29/2022 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. (mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2022)
August 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Clerk on 08/23/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2022)
August 23, 2022 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2022)
August 22, 2022 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to BRIAN AHEARN, Evan Beechel, CITY OF ARCATA, MOISES CORNEJO MERCADO, City of Arcata Police Department, MICHAEL GRIFFIN, BRIAN HOFFMAN, JOSEPH RODES. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2022)
August 22, 2022 Filing 7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/15/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/22/2022 02:00 PM in Federal Court Building, 3140 Boeing Avenue, McKinleyville, CA 95519 (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2022)
August 22, 2022 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by A. C., C. C., D. C., T. C... (Wells, Heidi) (Filed on 8/22/2022)
August 22, 2022 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. (Wells, Heidi) (Filed on 8/22/2022)
August 22, 2022 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/6/2022. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2022)
August 22, 2022 Filing 3 First MOTION to Appoint GUARDIAN ad Litem JENNIFER MURRELL filed by C. C., D. C., T. C.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wells, Heidi) (Filed on 8/22/2022)
August 22, 2022 Filing 2 First MOTION to Appoint AD LITEM ad Litem JACQUELYNN SNYDER filed by A. C.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wells, Heidi) (Filed on 8/22/2022)
August 22, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT A.C., C.C., D.C., T.C. against BRIAN AHEARN, CITY OF ARCATA, MOISES CORNEJO MERCADO, City of Arcata Police Department, MICHAEL GRIFFIN, BRIAN HOFFMAN, JOSEPH RODES ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-17464118.). Filed byD. C., C. C., A. C., T. C.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wells, Heidi) (Filed on 8/22/2022) Modified on 8/22/2022 (dhm, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: C. et al v. City of Arcata et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. C.
Represented By: Heidi Holmquist Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C. C.
Represented By: Heidi Holmquist Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D. C.
Represented By: Heidi Holmquist Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T. C.
Represented By: Heidi Holmquist Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF ARCATA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Arcata Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRIAN AHEARN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRIAN HOFFMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MOISES CORNEJO MERCADO
Represented By: Kymberly Elizabeth Speer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSEPH RODES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL GRIFFIN
Represented By: Kymberly Elizabeth Speer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evan Beechel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?