Moller et al v. Ford Motor Company
Plaintiff: Justin Moller and Luofei Liang
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Case Number: 4:2022cv05489
Filed: September 27, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Referring Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
2 Judge: Kandis A Westmore
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 45 Order by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting #42 Stipulation for Stipulated Protective Order for Standard Litigation. (wft, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2023)
November 1, 2023 Filing 44 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER FOR STANDARD LITIGATION filed by Luofei Liang, Justin Moller. (LaRocque, Elizabeth) (Filed on 11/1/2023)
November 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER requiring refiling of exhibit in support of #42 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER filed by Justin Moller, Luofei Liang. Specifically, the purported red-line version of the stipulated protective order does not identify the changes made to the model order. The filing party shall refile this exhibit by 11/2/2023. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 11/1/2023. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2023)
October 31, 2023 Filing 42 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Luofei Liang, Justin Moller. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER FOR STANDARD LITIGATION, #2 DECLARATION OF ELIZABETH A. LAROCQUE RE CHANGES TO NORTHERN DISTRICT FORM STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER, #3 Stipulated Protective Order for Standard Litigation (Redlined))(LaRocque, Elizabeth) (Filed on 10/31/2023) Modified on 11/1/2023 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
October 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 41 Order as Modified by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting #39 Stipulation to Continue Trial And Related Dates. ADR to be Completed by 11/23/2023. Close of Fact Discovery due by 2/2/2024. Designation of Experts due by 2/2/2024. Designation of Rebuttal Experts due by 2/21/2024. Close of Expert Discovery due by 3/15/2024. Dispositive Motion to be Heard by 6/6/2024. Meet and Confer by 9/13/2024. Joint Pretrial Conference Statement and Motions in Limine due by 9/24/2024. Opposition to Motions in Limine and Objections to Evidence due by 10/4/2024. Replies due by 10/11/2023. Pretrial Conference set for 10/23/2024 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Jury Selection and Jury Trial set for 11/4/2024 09:00 AM in Oakland, - To be determined before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Jury Trial set for 11/5/2024, 11/6/2024, 11/7/2024, and 11/8/2024 09:00 AM in Oakland, - To be determined before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Joint Case Management Statement due by 1/16/2024. Further Case Management Conference set for 1/23/2024 01:30 PM in Oakland, this proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/kaw General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom guidance and setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/(wft, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2023)
October 10, 2023 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher James Campbell (Campbell, Christopher) (Filed on 10/10/2023)
October 10, 2023 Filing 39 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Continue Trial And Related Dates filed by Luofei Liang, Justin Moller. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration)(LaRocque, Elizabeth) (Filed on 10/10/2023)
October 3, 2023 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Mani Arabi (Arabi, Mani) (Filed on 10/3/2023)
August 10, 2023 Filing 37 NOTICE by Luofei Liang, Justin Moller of Withdrawal of Counsel (Dolin, Tionna) (Filed on 8/10/2023)
August 8, 2023 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Ann LaRocque (LaRocque, Elizabeth) (Filed on 8/8/2023)
March 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 35 CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER FOR JURY TRIAL, Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 3/23/2023. Amended Pleadings due by 5/31/2023. ADR Completion 9/29/2023. Close of Fact Discovery and Designation of Experts due by 11/3/2023. Rebuttal Expert Disclosure and Reports Provided due by 11/22/2023. Close of Expert Discovery due by 12/15/2023. Dispositive Motion to be Heard by 2/15/2024. Meet and Confer by 3/22/2024. Joint Pretrial Statement; Motions in Limine due by 4/2/2024. Objections; Oppositions to Motions in Limine due by 4/12/2024. Pretrial Conference set for 5/1/2024 02:00 PM in Oakland, - To be determined before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Jury Selection and Jury Trial set for 5/13/2024 09:00 AM in Oakland, - To be determined before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Jury Trial set for 5/14/2024, 5/15/2024, 5/16/2024, and 5/17/2024 09:00 AM in Oakland, - To be determined before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. (wft, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2023)
March 21, 2023 Filing 34 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore: Further Case Management Conference held via Zoom on 3/21/2023. Updated Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/17/2023. Further Case Management Conference set for 10/24/2023 01:30 PM in Oakland, this proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/kaw General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom guidance and setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/Total Time in Court: 37 minutes. Recorded via Zoom: 1:58pm - 2:35pm. (wft, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/21/2023)
March 21, 2023 CASE REFERRED to Private ADR. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2023)
March 17, 2023 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Caitlin J Scott on behalf of Plaintiffs Justin Moller and Luofei Liang (Scott, Caitlin) (Filed on 3/17/2023)
March 17, 2023 #Electronic filing error. Attorney Caitlin J Scott needs to update the profile as the docket shows that the attorney is with the Law Offices of Loyst P. Fletcher. Attorney is reminded to update the ECF account if there's a change of firm name or address. Re: #33 Notice of Appearance filed by Justin Moller, Luofei Liang. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2023)
March 14, 2023 Filing 32 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Updated filed by Luofei Liang, Justin Moller. (Dolin, Tionna) (Filed on 3/14/2023)
February 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 2/14/2023. Joint Case Management Statement due by 3/14/2023. Further Case Management Conference set for 3/21/2023 01:30 PM in Oakland, this proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/kaw General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom guidance and setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/ (wft, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2023)
February 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore for all further proceedings. Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers no longer assigned to case. Signed by The Clerk on 02/14/2023. (jrs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2023)
February 13, 2023 Filing 29 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers: Further Case Management Conference held on 2/13/2023.Recorded via Zoom: 3:12 - 3:14. (amg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/13/2023)
February 13, 2023 Filing 28 STIPULATION to Consent to Magistrate Jurisdiction filed by Luofei Liang, Justin Moller. (Harman-Holmes, Ariel) (Filed on 2/13/2023)
February 13, 2023 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Reshma Amarlal Bajaj (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Bajaj, Reshma) (Filed on 2/13/2023)
February 13, 2023 Filing 26 * ERRONEOUS ENTRY. SEE #27 * NOTICE of Appearance by Reshma Amarlal Bajaj (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Bajaj, Reshma) (Filed on 2/13/2023) Modified on 2/13/2023 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
February 13, 2023 #Electronic filing error. As stated in the document, attorney Reshma Amarlal Bajaj represents FCA US, LLC but there's no such party on the docket. Re: #26 Notice of Appearance filed by Ford Motor Company. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2023)
February 6, 2023 Filing 25 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers: Initial Case Management Conference held on 2/6/2023. Further Case Management Conference set for 2/13/2023 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only.Total Time in Court: 2 minutes. Court Reporter: Summer Fisher. (amg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/6/2023)
January 30, 2023 Filing 24 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Luofei Liang, Justin Moller. (Harman-Holmes, Ariel) (Filed on 1/30/2023)
January 24, 2023 Filing 23 Certificate of Interested Entities by Ford Motor Company identifying Corporate Parent The Vanguard Group, Corporate Parent Black Rock, Inc., Corporate Parent State Street Corporation (parent of State Street Bank and Trust Company, which is the trustee of the Ford defined contribution plans), Other Affiliate Evercore Trust Company, N.A. (fiduciary of the Ford defined contribution plan) for Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Clayton, Trina) (Filed on 1/24/2023) Modified on 1/24/2023 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
January 10, 2023 Filing 22 NOTICE by Luofei Liang, Justin Moller NOTICE OF DISASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF (Dolin, Tionna) (Filed on 1/10/2023)
January 9, 2023 Filing 21 ANSWER to Complaint byFord Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Clayton, Trina) (Filed on 1/9/2023)
January 9, 2023 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Spencer Peter Hugret (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hugret, Spencer) (Filed on 1/9/2023)
January 9, 2023 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Trina Marie Clayton (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Clayton, Trina) (Filed on 1/9/2023)
January 9, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Pollard Vilchez (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Vilchez, Katherine) (Filed on 1/9/2023)
December 12, 2022 Filing 17 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Notice is hereby given that the case management conference previously set for 1/30/2023 is continued to 2/6/2023 at 2:00 p.m. A joint case management statement is due by 1/30/2023. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/ygr General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that p hotographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (amg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2022)
November 23, 2022 Filing 16 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 1/23/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/30/2023 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/ygr General Order 58. P ersons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Joint Case Management Statement due by 1/23/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/30/2023 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order) (amg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2022)
November 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 11/23/22. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2022)
November 23, 2022 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ejk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2022)
November 22, 2022 Filing 13 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Luofei Liang, Justin Moller.. (Whang, Steven) (Filed on 11/22/2022)
November 22, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Whang (Whang, Steven) (Filed on 11/22/2022)
November 22, 2022 Filing 11 CLERK'S THIRD NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: #http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 12/6/2022. (ejk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2022)
November 7, 2022 Filing 10 CLERK'S SECOND NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: #http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 11/21/2022. (ejk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2022)
November 7, 2022 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Initial Case Management Conference previously set for 12/29/2022 is reset to 2/2/2023 at 9:30 AM in San Francisco - Videoconference Only. Case Management Statement due by 1/26/2023. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscour ts.gov/lb General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (ejk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2022)
October 12, 2022 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: #http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 10/26/2022. (ejk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2022)
October 4, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Justin Moller, Luofei Liang. Ford Motor Company served on 10/4/2022, answer due 10/25/2022. (Dolin, Tionna) (Filed on 10/4/2022)
September 28, 2022 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING: Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/29/2022 at 9:30 AM in San Francisco - Videoconference Only. Case Management Statement due by 12/22/2022. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/lb General Order 58.< /b< Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (ejk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2022)
September 27, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Ford Motor Company. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2022)
September 27, 2022 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/22/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/29/2022 11:00 AM. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2022)
September 27, 2022 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/11/2022. (ark, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2022)
September 27, 2022 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Dolin, Tionna) (Filed on 9/27/2022)
September 27, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR VIOLATION OF STATUTORY OBLIGATIONS against Ford Motor Company ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-17571513.). Filed byJustin Moller, Luofei Liang. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dolin, Tionna) (Filed on 9/27/2022)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moller et al v. Ford Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Moller
Represented By: Tionna Grace Dolin
Represented By: Steven Whang
Represented By: Ariel S. Harman-Holmes
Represented By: Caitlin J Scott
Represented By: Elizabeth Ann LaRocque
Represented By: Mani Arabi
Represented By: Christopher James Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luofei Liang
Represented By: Tionna Grace Dolin
Represented By: Steven Whang
Represented By: Ariel S. Harman-Holmes
Represented By: Caitlin J Scott
Represented By: Mani Arabi
Represented By: Christopher James Campbell
Represented By: Elizabeth Ann LaRocque
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Katherine Pollard Vilchez
Represented By: Spencer Peter Hugret
Represented By: Trina Marie Clayton
Represented By: Reshma Amarlal Bajaj
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?