Emerson Equity, LLC v. Forge Underwriting Limited et al
Plaintiff: Emerson Equity, LLC
Defendant: Forge Underwriting Limited, Volante International Limited and Certain Underwriters at Llyod's London Subscribing to Securities Broker/Dealer Professional Liability Insurance Policy No. B074021F3121
Case Number: 4:2022cv06037
Filed: October 13, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Referring Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 Breach of Contract- Insurance
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2022 Filing 26 Declaration of Brandon S. Reif in Support of #25 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byEmerson Equity, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Related document(s) #25 ) (Dardashti, Rachel) (Filed on 12/7/2022)
December 7, 2022 Filing 25 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #5 MOTION to Dismiss ) filed byEmerson Equity, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dominic Baldini In Support Of Plaintiff Emerson Equity, LLC's Opposition To Defendants' Motion To Dismiss Pursuant To Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6))(Dardashti, Rachel) (Filed on 12/7/2022)
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING #23 STIPULATION Re: Briefing Schedule For Defendants' Motion To Dismiss (FRCP 12(b)(6)). Reset Motion Deadlines: Responses due by 12/7/2022 and Replies due by 1/6/2023. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 12/5/2022. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2022)
December 2, 2022 Filing 23 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings re: Briefing Schedule For Defendants' Motion To Dismiss (FRCP 12(b)(6)) filed by Emerson Equity, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Stipulation For Briefing Schedule For Defendants' Motion To Dismiss (FRCP 12(b)(6)))(Dardashti, Rachel) (Filed on 12/2/2022)
November 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING #20 STIPULATION re #5 MOTION to Dismiss. Reset Deadlines as to : #5 MOTION to Dismiss. Responses due by 12/2/2022 and Replies due by 12/23/2022. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 11/3/2022. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2022)
November 3, 2022 Filing 21 CLERK'S NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE DOCKET NO. #20 . The Judge's name is Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. In the future, the signature line of all proposed orders submitted should include Jr. All future filings should reflect the case number as 4:22-cv-06037-HSG as previously advised by docket no. 11 . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2022)
November 2, 2022 Filing 20 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Certain Underwriters at Llyod's London Subscribing to Securities Broker/Dealer Professional Liability Insurance Policy No. B074021F3121, Forge Underwriting Limited, Volante International Limited. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Castoria, Louis) (Filed on 11/2/2022)
November 1, 2022 Set Hearing as to #5 MOTION to Dismiss, See Docket No. #19 : Motion Hearing set for 2/23/2023 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam Jr. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2022)
November 1, 2022 Filing 19 Renotice motion hearing re #5 MOTION to Dismiss filed byCertain Underwriters at Llyod's London Subscribing to Securities Broker/Dealer Professional Liability Insurance Policy No. B074021F3121, Forge Underwriting Limited, Volante International Limited. (Related document(s) #5 ) (Castoria, Louis) (Filed on 11/1/2022)
November 1, 2022 Filing 18 Renotice motion hearing Amended Re-notice of Motion to Dismiss Hearing filed byCertain Underwriters at Llyod's London Subscribing to Securities Broker/Dealer Professional Liability Insurance Policy No. B074021F3121, Forge Underwriting Limited, Volante International Limited. (Castoria, Louis) (Filed on 11/1/2022)
November 1, 2022 Filing 17 Renotice motion hearing re #5 MOTION to Dismiss filed byCertain Underwriters at Llyod's London Subscribing to Securities Broker/Dealer Professional Liability Insurance Policy No. B074021F3121, Forge Underwriting Limited, Volante International Limited. (Related document(s) #5 ) (Castoria, Louis) (Filed on 11/1/2022)
October 26, 2022 Filing 16 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Emerson Equity, LLC.. (Dardashti, Rachel) (Filed on 10/26/2022)
October 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #13 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Stefan Dandelles. Docket No. #8 Terminated, Re-filed as Docket No. #13 .(ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2022)
October 21, 2022 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE DOCKET NO. #13 . All future filings should reflect the case number as 4:22-cv-06037-HSG as advised in docket no. 11 . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2022)
October 21, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 6071593.) Filing fee previously paid on 10/20/2022 filed by Certain Underwriters at Llyod's London Subscribing to Securities Broker/Dealer Professional Liability Insurance Policy No. B074021F3121, Forge Underwriting Limited, Volante International Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Dandelles, Stefan) (Filed on 10/21/2022)
October 21, 2022 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE DOCKET NO. #8 . The written application must be re-filed in its entirety along with a true and correct copy of a certificate of good standing or other similar official document issued by the appropriate authority governing attorney admissions for the relevant bar pursuant to Local Rule 11-3. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2022)
October 21, 2022 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE.Notice is hereby given that a Case Management Conference has been set for January 24, 2023, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m. Case Management Statement due by January 17th. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. All future filings should reflect the case number as 4:22-cv-06037-HSG. The January 24th proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The parties are advised that in the event of an audio problem, counsel should be prepared to attend the hearing via Zoom conference at the Courts direction. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone.For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: 888-808-6929Access Code: 6064255The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines. The parties are further advised to ensure that the Court can hear and understand them clearly before speaking at length.PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2022)
October 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case. Signed by the Clerk on October 21, 2022. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2022)
October 20, 2022 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2022)
October 20, 2022 Filing 8 ***DISREGARD, Re-filed as Docket No. 13 .*** MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17646177.) filed by Certain Underwriters at Llyod's London Subscribing to Securities Broker/Dealer Professional Liability Insurance Policy No. B074021F3121, Forge Underwriting Limited, Volante International Limited. (Dandelles, Stefan) (Filed on 10/20/2022) Modified on 10/21/2022 (ndr, COURT STAFF).
October 20, 2022 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Certain Underwriters at Llyod's London Subscribing to Securities Broker/Dealer Professional Liability Insurance Policy No. B074021F3121, Forge Underwriting Limited, Volante International Limited.. (Castoria, Louis) (Filed on 10/20/2022)
October 19, 2022 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANTS Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff and Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: #http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 10/26/2022. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed o n 10/19/2022)
October 19, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Certain Underwriters at Llyod's London Subscribing to Securities Broker/Dealer Professional Liability Insurance Policy No. B074021F3121, Forge Underwriting Limited, Volante International Limited. Motion Hearing set for 12/8/2022 01:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Responses due by 11/2/2022. Replies due by 11/9/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration Declaration of Stefan R. Dandelles, #3 Memorandum of Points and Authorities) (Castoria, Louis) (Filed on 10/19/2022) Modified on 10/20/2022 (gba, COURT STAFF).
October 18, 2022 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/11/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/18/2023 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2022)
October 13, 2022 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/27/2022. (ark, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2022)
October 13, 2022 Filing 2 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Certain Underwriters at Llyod's London Subscribing to Securities Broker/Dealer Professional Liability Insurance Policy No. B074021F3121, Forge Underwriting Limited, Volante International Limited identifying Corporate Parent Acrisure, LLC for Volante International Limited; Corporate Parent Qatar Insurance Company Q.S.P.C. for Certain Underwriters at Llyod's London Subscribing to Securities Broker/Dealer Professional Liability Insurance Policy No. B074021F3121. (Castoria, Louis) (Filed on 10/13/2022)
October 13, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court for the County of San Mateo. Their case number is 22-CIV-03732. (Filing fee $402.00, receipt number ACANDC-17622128). Filed by Certain Underwriters at Llyod's London Subscribing to Securities Broker/Dealer Professional Liability Insurance Policy No. B074021F3121, Volante International Limited, Forge Underwriting Limited. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Castoria, Louis) (Filed on 10/13/2022)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Emerson Equity, LLC v. Forge Underwriting Limited et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emerson Equity, LLC
Represented By: Rachel D. Dardashti
Represented By: Brandon Scott Reif
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forge Underwriting Limited
Represented By: Louis Harrison Castoria
Represented By: Stefan Dandelles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Volante International Limited
Represented By: Louis Harrison Castoria
Represented By: Stefan Dandelles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certain Underwriters at Llyod's London Subscribing to Securities Broker/Dealer Professional Liability Insurance Policy No. B074021F3121
Represented By: Louis Harrison Castoria
Represented By: Stefan Dandelles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?