Valley Investments-Redwood LLC v. City of Alameda
Plaintiff: Valley Investments-Redwood LLC a California limited liability company doing business as Barnhill Marina & Boatyard
Defendant: City of Alameda
Case Number: 4:2022cv06509
Filed: October 25, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Valley Investments-Redwood LLC re #18 Request for Judicial Notice,,, #17 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #19 Declaration in Support, (Michael, Gregory) (Filed on 12/23/2022)
December 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Declaration of AMARPAL NARANG in Support of #17 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byValley Investments-Redwood LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 15, #2 Exhibit 16, #3 Exhibit 17, #4 Exhibit 18, #5 Exhibit 19, #6 Exhibit 20, #7 Exhibit 21, #8 Exhibit 22, #9 Exhibit 23, #10 Exhibit 24, #11 Exhibit 25, #12 Exhibit 26, #13 Exhibit 27)(Related document(s) #17 ) (Yamamoto, Dorothy) (Filed on 12/23/2022)
December 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Request for Judicial Notice re #17 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byValley Investments-Redwood LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Gregory R. Michael ISO Plaintiff's Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Exhibit 6 to Declaration of Gregory R. Michael, #3 Exhibit 7 to Declaration of Gregory R. Michael, #4 Exhibit 8 to Declaration of Gregory R. Michael, #5 Exhibit 9 to Declaration of Gregory R. Michael, #6 Exhibit 10 to Declaration of Gregory R. Michael, #7 Exhibit 11 to Declaration of Gregory R. Michael, #8 Exhibit 12 to Declaration of Gregory R. Michael, #9 Exhibit 13 to Declaration of Gregory R. Michael, #10 Exhibit 14 to Declaration of Gregory R. Michael)(Related document(s) #17 ) (Michael, Gregory) (Filed on 12/22/2022)
December 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Valley Investments-Redwood LLC. Motion Hearing set for 1/26/2023 01:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Responses due by 1/5/2023. Replies due by 1/12/2023. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction)(Michael, Gregory) (Filed on 12/22/2022)
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 REPLY (re #10 MOTION to Dismiss ) filed byCity of Alameda. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Proof of Service)(Mackenzie, Elizabeth) (Filed on 12/12/2022)
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #10 MOTION to Dismiss ) filed byValley Investments-Redwood LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Denying Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Michael, Gregory) (Filed on 12/5/2022)
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Request for Judicial Notice ISO Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed byValley Investments-Redwood LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dorothy C. Yamamoto ISO Plaintiff's Request for Judicial Notice ISO Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Dorothy C. Yamamoto, #3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Dorothy C. Yamamoto, #4 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Dorothy C. Yamamoto, #5 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Dorothy C. Yamamoto, #6 Exhibit 5 to Declaration of Dorothy C. Yamamoto, #7 Exhibit 6 to Declaration of Dorothy C. Yamamoto)(Michael, Gregory) (Filed on 12/5/2022)
December 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by City of Alameda.. (Mackenzie, Elizabeth) (Filed on 12/1/2022)
December 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SECOND CLERK'S NOTICE TO DEFENDANT Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: #http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 12/8/2022. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2022)
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE TO DEFENDANT Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: #http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 11/29/2022. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2022)
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order #Electronic filing error. Attorney Elizabeth Anne Mackenzie needs to update the profile as soon as possible as the docket shows that she is with the law firm of Combs and Dunl ap LLP in Napa, California. Attorney John Dung Le has also been entered on the docket but it shows that he is with the law firm of Barg Coffin Lewis Trapp, LLP in San Francisco. Attorneys are reminded to update the ECF account if there's a change of firm name or address. Re: #10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by City of Alameda. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2022)
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by City of Alameda. Motion Hearing set for 1/12/2023 01:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Responses due by 12/5/2022. Replies due by 12/12/2022. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss, #3 Declaration Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction, #4 Declaration Notice of CEQA Settlement Meeting, #5 Certificate/Proof of Service Proof of Service)(Mackenzie, Elizabeth) (Filed on 11/21/2022)
November 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Valley Investments-Redwood LLC.. (Michael, Gregory) (Filed on 11/8/2022)
November 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Valley Investments-Redwood LLC. City of Alameda served on 10/31/2022, answer due 11/21/2022. (Michael, Gregory) (Filed on 11/2/2022)
October 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Summons Issued as to City of Alameda. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2022)
October 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/25/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/1/2023 01:30 PM. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2022)
October 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/9/2022. (mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2022)
October 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE by Valley Investments-Redwood LLC re #1 Complaint, Requesting Preparation of the Administrative Record of Proceedings (Michael, Gregory) (Filed on 10/25/2022)
October 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Valley Investments-Redwood LLC identifying Other Affiliate Amarpal Narang for Valley Investments-Redwood LLC. (Michael, Gregory) (Filed on 10/25/2022)
October 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Michael, Gregory) (Filed on 10/25/2022)
October 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT (VERIFIED) against City of Alameda ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-17664924.). Filed byValley Investments-Redwood LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Michael, Gregory) (Filed on 10/25/2022)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Valley Investments-Redwood LLC v. City of Alameda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valley Investments-Redwood LLC a California limited liability company doing business as Barnhill Marina & Boatyard
Represented By: Gregory Richard Michael
Represented By: Dorothy Chen Yamamoto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Alameda
Represented By: Elizabeth Anne Mackenzie
Represented By: John Dung Le
Represented By: Robert Tyson Sohagi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?