Sevier et al v. Real Time Resolutions, Inc. a Texas Corporation
Plaintiff: Nicole Sevier and Robert Thurman
Defendant: Real Time Resolutions, Inc. a Texas Corporation
Case Number: 4:2022cv06693
Filed: October 31, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S White
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Renotice motion hearing re #4 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed byReal Time Resolutions, Inc. a Texas Corporation. (Related document(s) #4 ) (Lucey, Nathaniel) (Filed on 12/20/2022)
December 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines as to #4 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint. Motion Hearing set for 1/20/2023 09:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor before Judge Jeffrey S. White. (kkp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2022)
December 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE DIRECTING COUNSEL TO RENOTICE HEARING DATE. YOU ARE HEREBY NOTIFIED that counsel must re-notice not re- file the #4 Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint. Re-noticed date of 12/16/2022 is an unavailable date for the Court. The briefing schedule remains in effect. Counsel is directed to check the Judge's webpage on the Court's website regarding scheduling before re-noticing the motion for a new hearing date. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2022)
December 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 REPLY (re #4 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint ) filed byReal Time Resolutions, Inc. a Texas Corporation. (Lucey, Nathaniel) (Filed on 12/8/2022)
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #4 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint ) filed byNicole Sevier, Robert Thurman. (Cara, Anthony) (Filed on 11/21/2022)
November 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING MOTION HEARING. Notice is hereby given that counsel must re-notice not re-file #4 Real Time Resolutions, Inc.s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint Under F.R.C.P. 12(B)(6). Hearing date of December 12, 2022 is vacated. The briefing schedule remains in effect. Counsel is directed to check Judge White's Scheduling Notes before re-noticing the motion for a new hearing date. Judge White's civil law and motion calendar is called on Friday at 9:00 AM. December 12, 2022 at 9:30 AM is not an available date or time for a civil motion hearing. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (dts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2022)
November 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Renotice motion hearing re #4 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed byReal Time Resolutions, Inc. a Texas Corporation. (Related document(s) #4 ) (Lucey, Nathaniel) (Filed on 11/9/2022)
November 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on November 8, 2022. Joint Case Management Statement due by 1/27/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/3/2023 11:00 AM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jsw Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or w ill be participating in the argu ment at the hearing. One list of names of all counsel appearing for all parties must be sent in one email to the CRD at jswcrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than February 2, 2023 at 12:00 PM PST.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (dts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2022)
November 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jeffrey S. White for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Clerk on 11/08/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2022)
November 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2022)
November 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Real Time Resolutions, Inc. a Texas Corporation.. (Lucey, Nathaniel) (Filed on 11/8/2022)
November 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Declaration of Nathaniel R. Lucey in Support of #1 Notice of Removal, filed byReal Time Resolutions, Inc. a Texas Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit G)(Related document(s) #1 ) (Lucey, Nathaniel) (Filed on 11/8/2022)
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendant shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 11/14/2022. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: #http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 11/14/2022. (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1 1/7/2022)
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Real Time Resolutions, Inc. a Texas Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 12/12/2022 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Responses due by 11/21/2022. Replies due by 11/28/2022. (Attachments: #1 Supplement memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Supplement Request for Judicial Notice)(Lucey, Nathaniel) (Filed on 11/7/2022)
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/23/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/30/2023 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2022)
October 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/14/2022. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2022)
October 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Contra Costa. Their case number is C-22-02173. (Filing fee $402 receipt number ACANDC-17681369). Filed byReal Time Resolutions, Inc. a Texas Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of N. Lucey, #2 Exhibit A-E, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lucey, Nathaniel) (Filed on 10/31/2022)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sevier et al v. Real Time Resolutions, Inc. a Texas Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Sevier
Represented By: Anthony Paul Cara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Thurman
Represented By: Anthony Paul Cara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Time Resolutions, Inc. a Texas Corporation
Represented By: Nathaniel R. Lucey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?