Estate of David Pelaez Chavez et al v. County of Sonoma et al
Plaintiff: Estate of David Pelaez Chavez, by and through successor in interest, Rosa Lopez Cruz, Rosa Lopez Cruz, D.D.P.L., S.S.P.L. Estella Chavez Cruz, Estate of David Pelaez Chavez, Estella Chavez Cruz, D.D.P.L. and S.S.P.L.
Defendant: County of Sonoma and Michael Dietrick
Case Number: 4:2022cv06715
Filed: October 31, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER (AS MODIFIED) granting #14 Stipulation to Continue Initial Case Management Conference: Joint Case Management Statement due by 2/8/2023. Initial Case Management Conference is continued to 2/15/2023 01:30 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. All parties may access the webinar information (public hearings) at https://cand.uscourts.gov/judges/ryu-donna-m-dmr/. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 12/1/2022. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2022)
December 1, 2022 Filing 14 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Case Management Conference filed by County of Sonoma. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order to Continue Case Management Conference)(Praet, Bruce) (Filed on 12/1/2022)
November 30, 2022 Filing 13 Defendants' Notification of Conflict with Case Management Conference Date, Request for Brief Continuance by County of Sonoma, Michael Dietrick (Praet, Bruce) (Filed on 11/30/2022)
November 28, 2022 Filing 12 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by County of Sonoma, Michael Dietrick.. (Praet, Bruce) (Filed on 11/28/2022)
November 18, 2022 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE TO DEFENDANTS Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: #http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 12/2/2022. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2022)
November 17, 2022 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by County of Sonoma, Michael Dietrick. (Praet, Bruce) (Filed on 11/17/2022) Modified on 11/18/2022 (kmg, COURT STAFF).
November 14, 2022 Filing 9 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Schwaiger, Izaak) (Filed on 11/14/2022)
November 7, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Estate of David Pelaez Chavez, Estella Chavez Cruz, Rosa Lopez Cruz. Michael Dietrick served on 11/7/2022, answer due 11/28/2022. (Scott, John) (Filed on 11/7/2022)
November 7, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Estate of David Pelaez Chavez, Estella Chavez Cruz, Rosa Lopez Cruz. County of Sonoma served on 11/7/2022, answer due 11/28/2022. (Scott, John) (Filed on 11/7/2022)
November 4, 2022 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Estella Chavez Cruz, Estate of David Pelaez Chavez, Rosa Lopez Cruz.. (Scott, John) (Filed on 11/4/2022)
November 2, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to County of Sonoma, Michael Dietrick. (jlg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2022)
November 1, 2022 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. (Scott, John) (Filed on 11/1/2022)
November 1, 2022 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/25/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/1/2023 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (kmg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/01/2022)
November 1, 2022 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/15/2022. (mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2022)
October 31, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages Jury Trial Demanded against All Defendants (Filing fee $402, receipt number ACANDC-17683619). Filed by Estate of David Pelaez Chavez, by and through successor in interest, Rosa Lopez Cruz, Estella Chavez Cruz, Rosa Lopez Cruz. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Scott, John) (Filed on 10/31/2022)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Estate of David Pelaez Chavez et al v. County of Sonoma et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of David Pelaez Chavez, by and through successor in interest, Rosa Lopez Cruz
Represented By: John Houston Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosa Lopez Cruz
Represented By: John Houston Scott
Represented By: Izaak David Schwaiger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D.D.P.L., S.S.P.L. Estella Chavez Cruz
Represented By: John Houston Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of David Pelaez Chavez
Represented By: John Houston Scott
Represented By: Izaak David Schwaiger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estella Chavez Cruz
Represented By: John Houston Scott
Represented By: Izaak David Schwaiger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D.D.P.L.
Represented By: John Houston Scott
Represented By: Izaak David Schwaiger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S.S.P.L.
Represented By: John Houston Scott
Represented By: Izaak David Schwaiger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Sonoma
Represented By: Bruce Daniel Praet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Dietrick
Represented By: Bruce Daniel Praet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?