United States of America v. Saydam
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Tuncay Saydam
Case Number: 4:2022cv07371
Filed: November 22, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 31 U.S.C. ยง 3545 Action to Recovery Money
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 19, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 19, 2023 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Tuncay Saydam.. (Greenberg, Douglas) (Filed on 1/19/2023)
January 9, 2023 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE TO DEFENDANT Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: #http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 1/23/2023. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2023)
January 6, 2023 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byTuncay Saydam. (Greenberg, Douglas) (Filed on 1/6/2023)
December 16, 2022 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by United States of America. Service waived by Tuncay Saydam waiver sent on 12/2/2022, answer due 1/31/2023. (De Palma, Lolita) (Filed on 12/16/2022)
December 2, 2022 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by United States of America.. (De Palma, Lolita) (Filed on 12/2/2022)
November 22, 2022 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/22/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/29/2023 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2022)
November 22, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Tuncay Saydam. (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2022)
November 22, 2022 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/6/2022. (jrs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2022)
November 22, 2022 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (De Palma, Lolita) (Filed on 11/22/2022)
November 22, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT to Reduce Civil Penalty Assessments to Judgment against Tuncay Saydam. Filed byUnited States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(De Palma, Lolita) (Filed on 11/22/2022)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Saydam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Amy Talburt Matchison
Represented By: Lolita De Palma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tuncay Saydam
Represented By: Douglas Alan Greenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?