Apple Inc. v. Alivecor, Inc.
Plaintiff: Apple Inc.
Defendant: Alivecor, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2022cv07608
Filed: December 2, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1338 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17942807.) filed by Alivecor, Inc.. (Stevens, Matthew) (Filed on 1/30/2023)
January 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine G. Rubschlager (Rubschlager, Katherine) (Filed on 1/30/2023)
January 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Philip C. Ducker (Ducker, Philip) (Filed on 1/30/2023)
January 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Alivecor, Inc. (Ducker, Philip) (Filed on 1/30/2023)
January 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss AliveCor, Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Partial Motion to Dismiss Apple's Complaint for Indirect Infringement pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(6); Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Alivecor, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 5/18/2023 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr.. Responses due by 2/13/2023. Replies due by 2/21/2023. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ducker, Philip) (Filed on 1/30/2023)
January 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Remark Received two USB drives- one USB drive for filing and one USB drive requested and received for Chambers copy re: #6 NOTICE Manual Filing re Exhibit 32 to the Complaint. (anj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2023)
December 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANT ALIVECOR, INC TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULE 6-1(A) filed by Alivecor, Inc.. (Ducker, Philip) (Filed on 12/23/2022)
December 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE.Notice is hereby given that a Case Management Conference has been set for March 7, 2023, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m. Case Management Statement due by February 28th. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. All future filings should reflect the case number as 4:22-cv-07608-HSG. The March 7th proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The parties are advised that in the event of an audio problem, counsel should be prepared to attend the hearing via Zoom conference at the Courts direction. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone.For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: 888-808-6929Access Code: 6064255The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines. The parties are further advised to ensure that the Court can hear and understand them clearly before speaking at length.PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2022)
December 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi no longer assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 12/16/2022. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2022)
December 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (amk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2022)
December 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Apple Inc... (Alper, Adam) (Filed on 12/16/2022)
December 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ***DISREGARD THIS FILING - DOCKETED IN ERROR*** SEE DOCKET #18 FOR SIGNED CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Apple Inc. (Alper, Adam) (Filed on 12/16/2022) Modified text on 12/16/2022 (amk, COURT STAFF).
December 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Granting #13 Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice for Kat Li, Counsel for Apple Inc. Signed by Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 12/6/2022. (amk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2022)
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Summons Issued as to Alivecor, Inc. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2022)
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/28/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/7/2023 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2022)
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Amended MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Kat Li ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17780671.) Filing fee previously paid on 12/2/2022 filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Li, Kat) (Filed on 12/5/2022)
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi denying without prejudice #8 Pro Hac Vice Application re Kat Li. (vkdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2022)
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Granting #7 Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice for Leslie M. Schmidt, Counsel for Apple, Inc. Signed by Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 12/5/2022. (amk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2022)
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/19/2022. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2022)
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Received one USB drive re: #6 NOTICE Manual Filing re Exhibit 32 to the Complaint. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2022)
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Civil Cover Sheet by Apple Inc. (Amended). (Alper, Adam) (Filed on 12/2/2022)
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Kat Li ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17780671.) filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing for Kat Li)(Alper, Adam) (Filed on 12/2/2022)
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Leslie M. Schmidt ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17780632.) filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Alper, Adam) (Filed on 12/2/2022)
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE by Apple Inc. re #1 Complaint,,, Manual Filing re Exhibit 32 to the Complaint (Alper, Adam) (Filed on 12/2/2022)
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent or trademark (cc: form mailed to register). (Alper, Adam) (Filed on 12/2/2022)
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Entities by Apple Inc. (Alper, Adam) (Filed on 12/2/2022)
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Apple Inc. identifying Corporate Parent for Apple Inc.. (Alper, Adam) (Filed on 12/2/2022)
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Alper, Adam) (Filed on 12/2/2022)
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Alivecor, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-17780254.). Filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Civil Cover Sheet)(Alper, Adam) (Filed on 12/2/2022)
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order #Electronic filing error. Civil Cover Sheet has not been signed.This filing will not be processed by the clerks office.Please sign and re-file in its entirety. Re: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, filed by Apple Inc. (ark, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2022)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Apple Inc. v. Alivecor, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Apple Inc.
Represented By: Adam R. Alper
Represented By: Kat Li
Represented By: Leslie M Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alivecor, Inc.
Represented By: Katherine G. Rubschlager
Represented By: Philip C. Ducker
Represented By: Matthew Scott Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?