The People Of The State Of California, Ex Rel. Rob Bonta, Attorney General Of California v. 3M Company et al
Plaintiff: The People Of The State Of California, Ex Rel. Rob Bonta, Attorney General Of California
Defendant: 3M Company, AGC Chemicals Americas, Inc., Archroma U.S., Inc., Arkema, Inc., Buckeye Fire Equipment Company, Carrier Global Corporation, Chemgurard, Inc., The Chemours Company, The Chemours Company FC, LLC, Clariant Corporation, Corteva, Inc., DuPont de Nemours, Inc., Dynax Corporation, E.I. DuPont De Nemours And Company, Kidde-Fenwal, Inc., National Foam, Inc., Tyco Fire Products, L.P. and UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2022cv09001
Filed: December 20, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2023 Filing 32 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #22 MOTION to Remand ) filed by3M Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel Queen in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21)(Queen, Daniel) (Filed on 2/3/2023)
January 26, 2023 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Elizabeth Morrison (Morrison, Sarah) (Filed on 1/26/2023)
January 19, 2023 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas C. Schumann CORRECTION OF DOCKET #29 (Schumann, Thomas) (Filed on 1/19/2023)
January 18, 2023 #Electronic filing error. REMINDER TO COUNSEL: Counsel is instructed that all future filings shall bear the initials HSG immediately after the case number. Re: #29 Notice of Appearance filed by The People Of The State Of California, Ex Rel. Rob Bonta, Attorney General Of California (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2023)
January 18, 2023 Filing 29 ***DISREGARD. ERROR IN FILING PER FILER. SEE DOCKET #30 FOR CORRECTED FILING.*** NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas C. Schumann (Schumann, Thomas) (Filed on 1/18/2023) Modified on 1/19/2023 (jml, COURT STAFF).
January 11, 2023 #Electronic filing error. Attorney Sarah Morrison Must Update ECF profile with Current Contact Information. [err102] Re: #28 Notice of Appearance filed by The People Of The State Of California, Ex Rel. Rob Bonta, Attorney General Of California. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2023)
January 10, 2023 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Elizabeth Morrison (Morrison, Sarah) (Filed on 1/10/2023)
January 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER GRANTING #26 STIPULATION for Enlargement of Time re #22 Plaintiff's Motion for Remand. Reset Deadlines as to #22 MOTION to Remand : Responses due by 2/3/2023 and. Replies due by 2/24/2023. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 1/10/2023. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2023)
January 9, 2023 Filing 26 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Enlargement of Time re #22 Plaintiff's Motion for Remand filed by 3M Company, Tyco Fire Products LP and Chemguard, Inc., The People of the State of California, ex rel. Rob Bonta, Attorney General of California. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel Queen, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Queen, Daniel) (Filed on 1/9/2023) Modified on 1/9/2023 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
January 3, 2023 Filing 25 CLERK'S NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE DOCKET NO. #24 . In the future when e-filing a proposed order, the correct event to use is Proposed Order located under Other Documents under the Other Filings category. Also, all future filings should reflect Oakland as the division not San Francisco. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2023)
January 3, 2023 Filing 24 Corrected [PROPOSED] Order Granting the State's Motion for Remand to State Court filed by The People Of The State Of California, Ex Rel. Rob Bonta, Attorney General Of California. (Lai, Stephanie) (Filed on 1/3/2023) Modified on 1/3/2023 to correct docket text (ndr, COURT STAFF).
January 3, 2023 *** #24 Corrected [PROPOSED] Order Granting the State's Motion for Remand to State Court, Misfiled a a Motion. *** (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2023)
December 30, 2022 Filing 23 CLERK'S NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE DOCKET NO. #22 . The Judge's first name is Haywood not Hayward. In the future, the signature line of all proposed orders submitted should reflect his name as Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2022)
December 30, 2022 Filing 22 MOTION to Remand filed by The People Of The State Of California, Ex Rel. Rob Bonta, Attorney General Of California. Motion Hearing set for 5/4/2023 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr.. Responses due by 1/13/2023. Replies due by 1/20/2023. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lai, Stephanie) (Filed on 12/30/2022)
December 29, 2022 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by 3M Company (Queen, Daniel) (Filed on 12/29/2022)
December 29, 2022 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie Lai (Lai, Stephanie) (Filed on 12/29/2022)
December 29, 2022 #Electronic filing error. REMINDER TO COUNSEL: Counsel is instructed that all future filings shall bear the initials HSG immediately after the case number. Re: #21 Certificate of Service filed by 3M Company (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2022)
December 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #14 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Levick, Rachel. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2022)
December 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #12 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Fletcher, Stacie. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2022)
December 28, 2022 Filing 17 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE.Notice is hereby given that a Case Management Conference has been set for April 4, 2023, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m. Case Management Statement due by March 28th. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. All future filings should reflect the case number as 4:22-cv-09001-HSG. The April 4th proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The parties are advised that in the event of an audio problem, counsel should be prepared to attend the hearing via Zoom conference at the Courts direction. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone.For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: 888-808-6929Access Code: 6064255The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines. The parties are further advised to ensure that the Court can hear and understand them clearly before speaking at length.PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2022)
December 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Judge William H. Orrick no longer assigned to case. Signed by Clerk on 12/28/2022. (mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2022)
December 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 12/27/2022. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2022)
December 23, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17850569.) filed by 3M Company. (Levick, Rachel) (Filed on 12/23/2022)
December 22, 2022 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by 3M Company (Queen, Daniel) (Filed on 12/22/2022)
December 22, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17849367.) filed by 3M Company. (Fletcher, Stacie) (Filed on 12/22/2022)
December 22, 2022 Filing 11 STIPULATION to Stay Deadlines for Defendants to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Complaint and for the Parties to Provide Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Pending Final JPML Transfer Decision filed by 3M Company and Plaintiff The People of the State of California, ex rel. Rob Bonta, Attorney General of California. (Queen, Daniel) (Filed on 12/22/2022) Modified on 12/22/2022 (kkp, COURT STAFF).
December 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge William H. Orrick for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.Signed by The Clerk on 12/22/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(jrs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2022)
December 22, 2022 Filing 9 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/22/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/29/2023 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2022)
December 21, 2022 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2022)
December 21, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Tatiana Koleva Gaur for the People of the State of California (Gaur, Tatiana) (Filed on 12/21/2022)
December 21, 2022 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by The People Of The State Of California, Ex Rel. Rob Bonta, Attorney General Of California.. (Campins, Nicholas) (Filed on 12/21/2022)
December 21, 2022 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/4/2023. (jrs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2022)
December 20, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas George Campins on behalf of the People of the State of California (Campins, Nicholas) (Filed on 12/20/2022)
December 20, 2022 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Chemgurard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products, L.P. identifying Corporate Parent Johnson Control International plc for Chemgurard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products, L.P.. (Cosgrove, Ryan) (Filed on 12/20/2022)
December 20, 2022 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by 3M Company identifying Corporate Parent 3M Company for 3M Company. (And Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1) (Queen, Daniel) (Filed on 12/20/2022)
December 20, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Alameda County Superior Court with jury demand. Their case number is 22CV021745. (Filing fee $402 receipt number ACANDC-17839586). Filed by 3M Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 State Court Record, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Queen, Daniel) (Filed on 12/20/2022) Modified on 12/21/2022 (jml, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The People Of The State Of California, Ex Rel. Rob Bonta, Attorney General Of California v. 3M Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The People Of The State Of California, Ex Rel. Rob Bonta, Attorney General Of California
Represented By: Nicholas George Campins
Represented By: Stephanie Lai
Represented By: Tatiana Koleva Gaur
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Morrison
Represented By: Thomas C. Schumann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company
Represented By: Daniel D Queen
Represented By: Debra Wong Yang
Represented By: Joel Tom Boer
Represented By: John Nadolenco
Represented By: Mark Tomaier
Represented By: Rachel Levick
Represented By: Stacie B Fletcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AGC Chemicals Americas, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Archroma U.S., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkema, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrier Global Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chemgurard, Inc.
Represented By: Ryan Edward Cosgrove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Chemours Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Chemours Company FC, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clariant Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corteva, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DuPont de Nemours, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dynax Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E.I. DuPont De Nemours And Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kidde-Fenwal, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Foam, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyco Fire Products, L.P.
Represented By: Ryan Edward Cosgrove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?