Nguyen et al v. Bloomingdale's, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Ha Nguyen, Alex Bhagatram, Alicia Taylor, Soraya Lodin, Teyani Cisneros and Michael Webster
Defendant: Bloomingdale's, LLC and Macy's Inc.
Case Number: 4:2023cv00768
Filed: February 21, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2023 Filing 19 STIPULATION re #12 Stipulation, #1 Complaint, #9 Summons Returned Executed, #10 Summons Returned Executed Extend Time to File Response to Class and Collective Action Complaint filed by Bloomingdale's, LLC, Macy's Inc.. (Barbara, Erika) (Filed on 4/5/2023)
March 22, 2023 Filing 18 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Case Management Statement due by 6/19/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/26/2023 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/ygr General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Case Management Statement due by 6/19/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/26/2023 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. (mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2023)
March 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by The Clerk on March 21, 2023. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2023)
March 20, 2023 Filing 16 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2023)
March 17, 2023 Filing 15 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Bloomingdale's, LLC, Macy's Inc... (Barbara, Erika) (Filed on 3/17/2023)
March 17, 2023 Filing 14 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Bloomingdale's, LLC, Macy's Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Macy's, Inc. for Bloomingdale's, LLC. (Barbara, Erika) (Filed on 3/17/2023)
March 17, 2023 Filing 13 Certificate of Interested Entities by Bloomingdale's, LLC, Macy's Inc. (Barbara, Erika) (Filed on 3/17/2023)
March 17, 2023 Filing 12 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, #9 Summons Returned Executed, #10 Summons Returned Executed to Extend Time to File Response to Class and Collective Action Complaint filed by Bloomingdale's, LLC, Macy's Inc.. (Barbara, Erika) (Filed on 3/17/2023)
March 8, 2023 Filing 11 ERRATA re #7 Notice (Other) Notice of Filing Consent to Join Collective Action by Michael Webster. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Michael Webster Amended FLSA Opt-In Form)(Edelstein, Ori) (Filed on 3/8/2023)
March 8, 2023 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Webster, Alicia Taylor, Alex Bhagatram, Soraya Lodin, Ha Nguyen, Teyani Cisneros. Macy's Inc. served on 2/27/2023, answer due 3/20/2023. (Edelstein, Ori) (Filed on 3/8/2023)
March 6, 2023 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Webster, Alicia Taylor, Alex Bhagatram, Soraya Lodin, Ha Nguyen, Teyani Cisneros. Bloomingdale's, LLC served on 2/27/2023, answer due 3/20/2023. (Edelstein, Ori) (Filed on 3/6/2023)
March 6, 2023 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Alex Bhagatram, Teyani Cisneros, Soraya Lodin, Ha Nguyen, Alicia Taylor, Michael Webster.. (Cottrell, Carolyn) (Filed on 3/6/2023)
March 1, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE by Michael Webster re #1 Complaint, Filing Consent to Join Collective Action (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - FLSA Opt-In Form)(Edelstein, Ori) (Filed on 3/1/2023)
February 23, 2023 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Bloomingdale's, LLC, Macy's Inc. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2023)
February 23, 2023 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 5/24/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/31/2023 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2023)
February 22, 2023 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/8/2023. (ark, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2023)
February 21, 2023 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Edelstein, Ori) (Filed on 2/21/2023)
February 21, 2023 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Edelstein, Ori) (Filed on 2/21/2023)
February 21, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - Class and Collective Action against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-18007992.). Filed byMichael Webster, Alicia Taylor, Alex Bhagatram, Soraya Lodin, Ha Nguyen, Teyani Cisneros. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiffs' Opt-In Consents, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Edelstein, Ori) (Filed on 2/21/2023)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nguyen et al v. Bloomingdale's, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ha Nguyen
Represented By: Ori Edelstein
Represented By: Carolyn Hunt Cottrell
Represented By: Eugene Zinovyev
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alex Bhagatram
Represented By: Ori Edelstein
Represented By: Eugene Zinovyev
Represented By: Carolyn Hunt Cottrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alicia Taylor
Represented By: Ori Edelstein
Represented By: Carolyn Hunt Cottrell
Represented By: Eugene Zinovyev
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Soraya Lodin
Represented By: Ori Edelstein
Represented By: Eugene Zinovyev
Represented By: Carolyn Hunt Cottrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teyani Cisneros
Represented By: Ori Edelstein
Represented By: Carolyn Hunt Cottrell
Represented By: Eugene Zinovyev
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Webster
Represented By: Ori Edelstein
Represented By: Carolyn Hunt Cottrell
Represented By: Eugene Zinovyev
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bloomingdale's, LLC
Represented By: Erika M. Barbara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Macy's Inc.
Represented By: Erika M. Barbara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?