Semiconductor Design Technologies, LLC v. Cadence Design Systems, Inc.
Plaintiff: Semiconductor Design Technologies, LLC
Defendant: Cadence Design Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2023cv01001
Filed: March 6, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Virginia K DeMarchi
Referring Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 11, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER GRANTING #21 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Barabas, James. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 4/11/2023. **DISREGARD DOCKET NO. #23 ** (eac, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2023)
April 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING #20 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Mattson, Robert. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 4/11/2023. **DISREGARD DOCKET NO. #22 .** (eac, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2023)
April 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 **DISREGARD. SEE DOCKET NO. #25 FOR CORRECT ORDER.**ORDER GRANTING MOTION #21 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. (eac, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2023) Modified on 4/11/2023 (eac, COURT STAFF).
April 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 **DISREGARD. SEE DOCKET NO. #24 FOR CORRECT ORDER.** ORDER GRANTING MOTION #20 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. (eac, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2023) Modified on 4/11/2023 (eac, COURT STAFF).
April 10, 2023 Filing 21 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18154398.) filed by Semiconductor Design Technologies, LLC. (Barabas, James) (Filed on 4/10/2023)
April 10, 2023 Filing 20 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18154361.) filed by Semiconductor Design Technologies, LLC. (Mattson, Robert) (Filed on 4/10/2023)
March 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Order by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #14 Stipulation To Extend Time for Defendant Cadence Design Systems, Inc., to File Its Response to the Complaint. Responses due by 5/12/2023.(mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2023)
March 23, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by James Young Hurt For Defendant Cadence Design Systems, Inc. (Hurt, James) (Filed on 3/23/2023)
March 23, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Liang For Defendant Cadence Design Systems, Inc. (Liang, Jeffrey) (Filed on 3/23/2023)
March 22, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Ericka J Schulz For Defendant Cadence Design Systems, Inc. (Schulz, Ericka) (Filed on 3/22/2023)
March 22, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Scott Ponder For Defendant Cadence Design Systems, Inc. (Ponder, Christopher) (Filed on 3/22/2023)
March 22, 2023 Filing 14 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Extend Time for Defendant Cadence Design Systems, Inc., to File Its Response to the Complaint filed by Cadence Design Systems, Inc. and Semiconductor Design Technologies, LLC. (Batts, Harper) (Filed on 3/22/2023) Modified on 3/23/2023 (jrs, COURT STAFF).
March 22, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Harper Siems Batts For Defendant Cadence Design Systems, Inc. (Batts, Harper) (Filed on 3/22/2023)
March 20, 2023 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 6/5/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/12/2023 02:00 PM. The 6/12/2023 proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/ygr General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2023)
March 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. J Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi no longer assigned to case.. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 3/17/2023. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2023)
March 16, 2023 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge> (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2023)
March 16, 2023 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Semiconductor Design Technologies, LLC.. (Kramer, Robert) (Filed on 3/16/2023)
March 8, 2023 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Semiconductor Design Technologies, LLC. Cadence Design Systems, Inc. served on 3/7/2023, answer due 3/28/2023. (Kramer, Robert) (Filed on 3/8/2023)
March 7, 2023 Filing 7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/30/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/6/2023 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2023)
March 7, 2023 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Cadence Design Systems, Inc. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2023)
March 6, 2023 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/20/2023. (jrs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2023)
March 6, 2023 Filing 4 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding Patents (cc: form mailed to register). (Kramer, Robert) (Filed on 3/6/2023)
March 6, 2023 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities and and 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Semiconductor Design Technologies, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Burford Capital Ltd. for Semiconductor Design Technologies, LLC. (Kramer, Robert) (Filed on 3/6/2023) Modified on 3/7/2023 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
March 6, 2023 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Kramer, Robert) (Filed on 3/6/2023)
March 6, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement (with jury demand) against Cadence Design Systems, Inc. (Filing fee $402, receipt number ACANDC-18044361). Filed by Semiconductor Design Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kramer, Robert) (Filed on 3/6/2023) Modified on 3/7/2023 (cjl, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Semiconductor Design Technologies, LLC v. Cadence Design Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Semiconductor Design Technologies, LLC
Represented By: Robert F. Kramer
Represented By: Robert Y. Xie
Represented By: Russell Steven Tonkovich
Represented By: David L. Alberti
Represented By: Sal Lim
Represented By: Hong Lin
Represented By: James P. Barabas
Represented By: Robert C Mattson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cadence Design Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Liang
Represented By: Christopher Scott Ponder
Represented By: Ericka J Schulz
Represented By: James Young Hurt
Represented By: Harper Siems Batts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?