Cupp v. County of Sonoma et al
Plaintiff: Ronald Cupp and Ronald Vernon Cupp
Defendant: County of Sonoma, Tennis Wick, Tyra Harrington, Mark Franceschi, Todd Hoffman, Jesse Cablk and Andrew Smith
Case Number: 4:2023cv01007
Filed: March 6, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Joseph C Spero
Referring Judge: Jon S Tigar
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Ronald Cupp. Service waived by Todd Hoffman waiver sent on 3/15/2023, answer due 5/15/2023. (Young, Eric) (Filed on 5/2/2023)
May 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Ronald Cupp. Service waived by Andrew Smith waiver sent on 3/15/2023, answer due 5/15/2023. (Young, Eric) (Filed on 5/2/2023)
May 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Ronald Cupp. Service waived by Mark Franceschi waiver sent on 3/15/2023, answer due 5/15/2023. (Young, Eric) (Filed on 5/2/2023)
May 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Ronald Cupp. Service waived by Jesse Cablk waiver sent on 3/15/2023, answer due 5/15/2023. (Young, Eric) (Filed on 5/2/2023)
May 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Ronald Cupp. Service waived by Tyra Harrington waiver sent on 3/15/2023, answer due 5/15/2023. (Young, Eric) (Filed on 5/2/2023)
May 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Ronald Cupp. Service waived by Tennis Wick waiver sent on 3/15/2023, answer due 5/15/2023. (Young, Eric) (Filed on 5/2/2023)
April 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ronald Cupp (Young, Eric) (Filed on 4/27/2023)
April 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Further Request to Judicial Notice re #18 Reply to Opposition/Response filed by County of Sonoma. (Related document(s) #18 ) (King, Michael) (Filed on 4/27/2023) Modified on 5/1/2023 (gba, COURT STAFF).
April 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 REPLY (re #12 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint ) filed byCounty of Sonoma. (King, Michael) (Filed on 4/27/2023)
April 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Declaration of Eric G. Young in Opposition to Defendant County of Sonoma's Motion to Dismiss filed byRonald Cupp. (Young, Eric) (Filed on 4/20/2023)
April 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #12 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint ) filed byRonald Cupp. (Young, Eric) (Filed on 4/20/2023)
April 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER TO EXTEND TIME FOR FILLING OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT AND REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #14 Stipulation.Responses due by 4/20/2023. Replies due by 4/27/2023. (mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2023)
April 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Ronald Cupp. (Young, Eric) (Filed on 4/19/2023)
April 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Request for Judicial Notice re #12 MOTION to Dismiss filed byCounty of Sonoma. (Related document(s) #12 ) (King, Michael) (Filed on 4/5/2023)
April 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by County of Sonoma. Motion Hearing set for 6/29/2023 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 4/19/2023. Replies due by 4/26/2023. (King, Michael) (Filed on 4/5/2023) Modified on 4/7/2023 (gba, COURT STAFF).
March 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER RE RELATED CASE REFERRAL re #10 Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases. Case C-23-1007-JST is not related to C-20-3456-PJH. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 3/27/2023. (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2023)
March 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 23-cv-01007-JST. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 21, 2023. (mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2023)
March 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 6/20/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/27/2023 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jst Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. One list of names of all counsel appearing for all parties must be sent in one email to the CRD at JSTCRD@cand.uscourts.gov no later than June 26, 2023 by 2:00 p.m.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Case Management Statement due by 6/20/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/27/2023 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. (mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2023)
March 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Clerk on 03/17/2023. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2023)
March 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2023)
March 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Ronald Cupp.. (Young, Eric) (Filed on 3/16/2023)
March 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Jesse Cablk, County of Sonoma, Mark Franceschi, Tyra Harrington, Todd Hoffman, Andrew Smith, Tennis Wick. (kmg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2023)
March 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/2/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/9/2023 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (kmg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2023)
March 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/20/2023. (ark, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2023)
March 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Young, Eric) (Filed on 3/6/2023)
March 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory relief, Injunctive Relief and Damages; Jury Trial Demanded against Jesse Cablk, County of Sonoma, Mark Franceschi, Tyra Harrington, Todd Hoffman, Andrew Smith, Tennis Wick (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-18046907.). Filed by Ronald Cupp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-O Bookmarked, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Young, Eric) (Filed on 3/6/2023) Modified on 3/7/2023 (gba, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cupp v. County of Sonoma et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Cupp
Represented By: Eric Gene Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Vernon Cupp
Represented By: Eric Gene Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Sonoma
Represented By: Michael Alcock King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tennis Wick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyra Harrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Franceschi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jesse Cablk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?