Tangle Inc. v. Aritzia, Inc.
Plaintiff: Tangle Inc.
Defendant: Aritzia, Inc., Aritzia LP and United States of Aritzia, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2023cv01196
Filed: March 16, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S White
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting #20 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Anna Iskikian. (kkp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2023)
April 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Renewed ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18089288.) Filing fee previously paid on 3/20/2023 filed by Tangle Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Iskikian, Anna) (Filed on 4/10/2023)
April 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER DENYING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE by Judge Jeffrey S. White denying #11 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (kkp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2023)
April 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Tangle Inc.. Service waived by United States of Aritzia, Inc. waiver sent on 3/29/2023, answer due 5/30/2023. (van Loben Sels, John) (Filed on 4/4/2023)
April 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Tangle Inc.. Service waived by Aritzia LP waiver sent on 3/29/2023, answer due 6/27/2023; Aritzia, Inc. waiver sent on 3/29/2023, answer due 6/27/2023. (van Loben Sels, John) (Filed on 4/4/2023)
March 28, 2023 Opinion or Order #Electronic filing error. ONLY ONE SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED PER CASE, USE AN ATTACHMENT TO SUMMONS IF NEEDED TO LIST ADDITIONAL DEFENDANTS INFORMATION. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Re: #16 Proposed Summons filed by Tangle Inc., #5 Summons Issued filed by Tangle Inc., #15 Proposed Summons filed by Tangle Inc. (kmg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2023)
March 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Proposed Summons. (van Loben Sels, John) (Filed on 3/24/2023)
March 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Proposed Summons. (van Loben Sels, John) (Filed on 3/24/2023)
March 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Copyright form emailed to Copyright registrar (lsk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2023)
March 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Aritzia, Inc., Aritzia LP, United States of Aritzia, Inc.. Filed byTangle Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(van Loben Sels, John) (Filed on 3/23/2023)
March 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 3/23/2023. Joint Case Management Statement due by 6/16/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/23/2023 11:00 AM - Videoconference Only. (kkp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2023)
March 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a Copyright (cc: form mailed to register). (van Loben Sels, John) (Filed on 3/22/2023)
March 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18089288.) filed by Tangle Inc.. (Iskikian, Anna) (Filed on 3/20/2023)
March 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Tangle Inc. (van Loben Sels, John) (Filed on 3/20/2023)
March 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jeffrey S. White for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen no longer assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by clerk on 3/20/2023. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2023)
March 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (jhf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2023)
March 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Tangle Inc... (van Loben Sels, John) (Filed on 3/20/2023)
March 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING THE FILING OF AN ACTION REGARDING A COPYRIGHT. The provisions of17 U.S. C. 508 require the submission of a report to the Register of Copyrights. Please e-file a proposed "Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright" form AO 121 using the event Civil Events -Other Filings - Notices - Notice (Other), within five daysof this notice.. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2023)
March 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Aritzia, Inc.. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2023)
March 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/13/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/20/2023 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (lsk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2023)
March 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/31/2023. (mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2023)
March 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (van Loben Sels, John) (Filed on 3/16/2023)
March 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR: 1. Copyright Infringement (17 U.S.C. 501(a)); DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against Aritzia, Inc., (Filing Fee: $402.00, receipt number ACANDC-18080696). Filed by Tangle Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(van Loben Sels, John) (Filed on 3/16/2023)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tangle Inc. v. Aritzia, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tangle Inc.
Represented By: John David van Loben Sels
Represented By: Anna Iskikian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aritzia, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aritzia LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of Aritzia, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?