Doe (K.B.) v. Backpage.com, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Doe (K.B.) and Jane Doe (K.B.)
Defendant: Backpage.com, LLC, Facebook Inc. and Meta Platforms Inc.
Case Number: 4:2023cv02387
Filed: May 16, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
Presiding Judge: Jon S Tigar
Referring Judge: Kandis A Westmore
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Cox, Collin) (Filed on 8/15/2023)
August 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 78 Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #77 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to David E. Harris.(mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2023)
July 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 77 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18425585.) filed by Jane Doe (K.B.). (Harris, David) (Filed on 7/6/2023)
June 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 76 Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #75 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Annie McAdams.(mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2023)
June 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 75 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Corrected Re: ECF 74) ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number BCANDC-18395919.) Filing fee previously paid on 06/27/2023 filed by Jane Doe (K.B.). (McAdams, Annie) (Filed on 6/27/2023)
June 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 74 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number BCANDC-18395919.) filed by Jane Doe (K.B.). (McAdams, Annie) (Filed on 6/27/2023)
June 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 73 Certificate of Interested Entities by Jane Doe (K.B.) (Parmet, Matthew) (Filed on 6/22/2023)
June 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 72 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Scott Parmet (Parmet, Matthew) (Filed on 6/22/2023)
June 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 71 Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #67 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Benjamin Betner.(mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2023)
June 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 70 Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #66 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Johanna E. Smith.(mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2023)
June 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 69 Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #65 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Collin J. Cox.(mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2023)
June 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 68 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Case Management Statement due by 8/29/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/5/2023 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jst Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. One list of names of all counsel appearing for all parties must be sent in one email to the CRD at JSTCRD@cand.uscourts.gov no later than September 1, 2023 by Noon.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Case Management Statement due by 8/29/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/5/2023 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. (mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2023)
May 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 67 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Benjamin Betner ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18314094.) Filing fee previously paid on 5/31/2023 filed by Facebook Inc., Meta Platforms Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Betner, Benjamin) (Filed on 5/31/2023)
May 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 66 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Johanna E. Smith ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18314054.) Filing fee previously paid on 5/31/2023 filed by Facebook Inc., Meta Platforms Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Smith, Johanna) (Filed on 5/31/2023)
May 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 65 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Collin J. Cox ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18314008.) Filing fee previously paid on 5/31/2023 filed by Facebook Inc., Meta Platforms Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Cox, Collin) (Filed on 5/31/2023)
May 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Clerk on 05/31/2023. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bar, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2023)
May 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 63 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Benjamin Betner ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18314094.) filed by Facebook Inc., Meta Platforms Inc.. (Betner, Benjamin) (Filed on 5/31/2023)
May 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 62 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Johanna E. Smith ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18314054.) filed by Facebook Inc., Meta Platforms Inc.. (Smith, Johanna) (Filed on 5/31/2023)
May 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Collin J. Cox ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18314008.) filed by Facebook Inc., Meta Platforms Inc.. (Cox, Collin) (Filed on 5/31/2023)
May 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 60 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (wft, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2023)
May 31, 2023 Opinion or Order #Electronic filing error. Re: Electronic Filing Error. Erroneous entry please disregard, corrected Motions for pro hac vice were efiled. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2023)
May 31, 2023 Opinion or Order #Electronic filing error. Re: #62 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Johanna E. Smith (Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18314054.) filed by Meta Platforms Inc., Facebook Inc., #61 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Collin J. Cox (Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18314008.) filed by Meta Platforms Inc., Facebook Inc., #63 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Benjamin Betner (Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18314094.) filed by Meta Platforms Inc., Facebook Inc. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office.Please re-file in their entirety with the certificate of good standing. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2023)
May 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 59 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Facebook Inc., Meta Platforms Inc... (Linsley, Kristin) (Filed on 5/30/2023)
May 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 58 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristin A. Linsley (Linsley, Kristin) (Filed on 5/30/2023)
May 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 56 Case transferred in from District of Texas Southern; Case Number 4:22-cv-00226. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
May 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 55 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER - For the reasons set forth, Defendant Meta Platforms, Inc.'s #47 MOTION to Transfer Venue under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) is GRANTED, and this action is TRANSFERRED to the Case to United States District Court for the Northern District of California...*** STAYED flag cleared. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4)
May 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Interdistrict transfer to Northern District of California. Case transferred electronically. Case terminated on 5/16/23, filed. (sanderson, 4)
April 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting #53 Motion to Stay. Within 30 days of the entry of an order on the Motion to Transfer Venue the parties shall file a joint motion to enter an amended scheduling order..(Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4)
April 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 53 Joint MOTION to Stay Pretrial Deadlines and Discovery by Jane Doe (K.B.), filed. Motion Docket Date 4/26/2023. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Joint Motion to Stay Pretrial Deadlines and Disc)(Gallagher, Michael)
March 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 52 REPLY in Support of #47 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Northern District of California, filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix of Unpublished Authorities)(Cox, Collin)
March 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 51 RESPONSE to #47 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Northern District of California filed by Jane Doe (K.B.). (Gallagher, Michael)
March 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER - Granting #49 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Response to Def Mtn to Transfer ; Pltf's Response due by 3/23/2023 re: #47 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Northern District of California. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4)
March 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 49 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Response to Def Mtn to Transfer by Jane Doe (K.B.), filed. Motion Docket Date 4/6/2023. (Gallagher, Michael)
February 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Northern District of California by Facebook, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 3/16/2023. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 REDACTED Declaration of Collin J. Cox, #3 REDACTED Declaration of Michel Duffey, #4 Appendix of Unpublished Authorities)(Cox, Collin)
February 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 46 SEALED MOTION Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Motion to Transfer Venue Under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) by Facebook, Inc., filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Motion to Transfer Venue Under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a), #3 SEALED Declaration of Collin J. Cox, #4 SEALED Declaration of Michael Duffey, #5 Appendix of Unpublished Authorities) (Cox, Collin)
November 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 45 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel by Jane Doe (K.B.), filed. (Sico, Craig)
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER Approving #43 Protective Order (Signed by Magistrate Judge Christina A Bryan) Parties notified.(MelissaMorgan, 4)
November 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 43 PROPOSED ORDER Protective Order re: #36 Order on Motion for Entry of Order, filed.(Cox, Collin)
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to #41 Transcript. Party notified, filed. (RachelWillborg, 4)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 41 TRANSCRIPT re: Motion for Relief of Sharing Protective Order held on November 9, 2022 before Magistrate Judge Christina A Bryan. Court Reporter/Transcriber Judicial Transcribers of Texas, LLC. Ordering Party Ben Betner Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/13/2023., filed. (mahenry, )
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel Jeffrey H. Richter by Jane Doe (K.B.), filed. (Sico, Craig)
November 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Johanna E. Smith on behalf of Facebook, Inc., filed. (Smith, Johanna)
November 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Craig M. Sico for Transcript of Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Sharing Protective Order hearing on November 9, 2022 before Judge Christina A. Bryan. Daily (24 hours) turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Judicial Transcribers of Texas, filed. (Sico, Craig) Electronic Copy Request Received and Forwarded to Judicial Transcribers of Texas on 11/10/2022. Estimated Date of Completion: 11/11/2022. Modified on 11/10/2022 (AntonioBanda, 4).
November 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Facebook, Inc. n/k/a Meta Platforms, Inc./Ben Betner for Transcript of Motion Hearing on 11/9/22 before Judge Bryan. Daily (24 hours) turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Judicial Transcribers of Texas, filed. (Betner, Benjamin) Electronic Transcript Request Received and Forwarded to Judicial Transcribers of Texas on 11/10/2022. Estimated Date of Completion: 11/11/2022. Modified on 11/10/2022 (AntonioBanda, 4).
November 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #25 Motion for Entry of Sharing Protective Order. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Christina A Bryan) Parties notified.(MelissaMorgan, 4)
November 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Christina A Bryan. MOTION HEARING held on 11/9/2022. The Court heard argument on Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Sharing Protective Order. Order to be entered. Appearances: Annie McAdams, Craig Matthew Sico, Kelly Spragins Sandill, Ashley Morgan Kahn, Collin Joe Cox.(ERO:Yes), filed.(MelissaMorgan, 4)
November 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 BRIEF In Support re: #25 MOTION for Entry of Order re: Sharing Protective Order by Jane Doe (K.B.), filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Sico, Craig)
November 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 PROPOSED ORDER -Protective Order re: #25 MOTION for Entry of Order re: Sharing Protective Order, filed.(Sico, Craig)
October 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 REPLY to #27 Reply to Response to Motion for Entry of Meta's Protective Order, filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Cox, Collin)
October 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER re: Motion for Protective Order. It is ORDERED that the Court will conduct a hearing on the record on Plaintiffs Motion on November 9, 2022 at 10:00 a.m. It is further ORDERED that parties are to confer prior to the hearing and to submit 3 days prior to the hearing a single proposed Protective Order containing the terms on which the parties agree and highlighting or including additional terms on which the parties disagree. Motion Hearing set for 11/9/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 701 before Magistrate Judge Christina A Bryan (Signed by Magistrate Judge Christina A Bryan) Parties notified.(MelissaMorgan, 4)
October 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 (Amended) DOCKET CONTROL ORDER - Granting #29 Unopposed MOTION to Amend #22 Scheduling Order: Pltf Expert Witness List/Reports due by 4/18/2023, Deft Expert Witness List/Reports due by 6/13/2023, Discovery due by 9/15/2023, Pretrial Motions/Motions in Limine due by 10/6/2023, Joint Pretrial Order due by 12/1/2023...*** Docket Call RESET for 12/8/2023 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 9B before Judge Sim Lake. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4)
October 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin D. Betner on behalf of Facebook, Inc., filed. (Betner, Benjamin)
October 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Unopposed MOTION to Amend #22 Scheduling Order, by Facebook, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 11/14/2022. (Cox, Collin)
October 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MOTIONS REFERRED to Judge Christina A. Bryan: #25 MOTION for Entry of Order re: Sharing Protective Order (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
October 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 REPLY to Response to #25 MOTION for Entry of Order re: Sharing Protective Order, filed by Jane Doe (K.B.). (Sico, Craig)
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 RESPONSE in Opposition to #25 MOTION for Entry of Order re: Sharing Protective Order, filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Protective Order)(Cox, Collin)
September 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MOTION for Entry of Order re: Sharing Protective Order by Jane Doe (K.B.), filed. Motion Docket Date 10/11/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Protective Order)(Sico, Craig)
September 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE of Designation of Lead Counsel by Jane Doe (K.B.), filed. (Sico, Craig)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 NOTICE of Initial Disclosures by Jane Doe (K.B.), filed. (Sico, Craig)
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 DOCKET CONTROL ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 10/14/2022. Joinder of Parties due by 10/14/2022. Pltf Expert Witness List/Reports due by 2/17/2023. Deft Expert Witness List/Reports due by 4/14/2023. Discovery due by 9/15/2023. Pretrial Motions/Motions in Limine due by 10/6/2023. Joint Pretrial Order due by 12/1/2023...*** Docket Call set for 12/8/2023 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 9B before Judge Sim Lake. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4)
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 CLERKS NOTICE OF CANCELLATION - Initial Conference set for 5/20/2022 at 02:00 PM before Judge Sim Lake is CANCELED. Parties notified, filed. (sanderson, 4)
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Jane Doe (K.B.), filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-[Plaintiff's Proposed] Protective Order)(Harris, David)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ANSWER to #13 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. by Facebook, Inc., filed.(Cox, Collin)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey H. Richter on behalf of Jane Doe (K.B.), filed. (Harris, David)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Craig M. Sico on behalf of Jane Doe (K.B.), filed. (Harris, David)
March 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER - Granting #15 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint ; Answer due for Facebook, Inc. 4/13/2022. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4)
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint by Facebook, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 4/15/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cox, Collin)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER - Pursuant to the filing of the Plaintiffs' #13 Second Amended Complaint Defendant's #12 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED as moot. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Jane Doe (K.B.).(Harris, David)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss by Facebook, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 3/15/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Duffey Declaration, #5 Duffey Declaration Exhibit 1, #6 Proposed Order)(Cox, Collin) *** DENIED as moot pursuant to #14 Order ***
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Ashley Kahn on behalf of Facebook, Inc., filed. (Kahn, Ashley)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathryn E. Boatman on behalf of Facebook, Inc., filed. (Boatman, Kathryn)
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Jane Doe (K.B.), filed.(Harris, David)
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly Sandill on behalf of Facebook, Inc., filed. (Sandill, Kelly)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE IN A REMOVED ACTION by Facebook, Inc., filed.(Cox, Collin)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Facebook, Inc., filed.(Cox, Collin)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 5/20/2022 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9B before Judge Sim Lake.(Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Reassignment. Parties notified, filed. (olindor, 4)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Charles Eskridge recused. Case reassigned to Judge Sim Lake for all further proceedings.(Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(jengonzalez, 4)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE Certificate of State Court Notice of Removal by Facebook, Inc. n/k/a Meta Platforms, Inc., filed. (Cox, Collin)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 234th District Court of Harris County, case number 2022-02660 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-27636716) filed by Facebook, Inc. n/k/a Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Declaration of Collin J. Cox, #7 Cox Decl. Exhibit 1, #8 Cox Decl. Exhibit 2, #9 Cox Decl. Exhibit 3, #10 Cox Decl. Exhibit 4, #11 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cox, Collin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe (K.B.) v. Backpage.com, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doe (K.B.)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe (K.B.)
Represented By: Annie McAdams
Represented By: Matthew Scott Parmet
Represented By: Craig Matthew Sico
Represented By: David Echols Harris
Represented By: Jeffrey Holmes Richter
Represented By: Michael T. Gallagher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Backpage.com, LLC
Represented By: Mark A Castillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook Inc.
Represented By: Kelly Spragins Sandill
Represented By: Collin Joe Cox
Represented By: Benjamin David Betner
Represented By: Ashley Morgan Kahn
Represented By: Johanna Esther Smith
Represented By: Kathryn Elizabeth Boatman
Represented By: Kristin A. Linsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meta Platforms Inc.
Represented By: Collin Joe Cox
Represented By: Johanna Esther Smith
Represented By: Ashley Morgan Kahn
Represented By: Kathryn Elizabeth Boatman
Represented By: Benjamin David Betner
Represented By: Kelly Spragins Sandill
Represented By: Kristin A. Linsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?