Center for Community Action and Environmental Justice v. U.S. Environmental Protection Agency et al
Plaintiff: Center for Community Action and Environmental Justice
Defendant: U.S. Environmental Protection Agency, Michael Regan and Martha Guzman
Case Number: 4:2023cv03571
Filed: July 19, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Referring Judge: Kandis A Westmore
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 7604 Clear Air Act (Emission Standards)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2023 Filing 15 RE-NOTICE OF PREVIOUSLY FILED STIPULATION PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULES 6-1(b), 6-2, AND 7-12 TO HOLD DEADLINES IN ABEYANCE, AND TO VACATE THE ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ADR DEADLINES, [ECF NO. 10] AND [PROPOSED] ORDER filed by Martha Guzman, Michael Regan, U.S. Environmental Protection Agency. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Re; Re-Notice of Stipulation ECF No. 10)(Rigau, Mark) (Filed on 9/14/2023) Modified on 9/15/2023 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
September 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by The Clerk on 9/11/2023. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bar, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2023)
September 11, 2023 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (wft, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2023)
September 9, 2023 Filing 12 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Martha Guzman, Michael Regan, U.S. Environmental Protection Agency.. (Rigau, Mark) (Filed on 9/9/2023)
September 8, 2023 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: #http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 9/15/2023. (wft, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2023)
September 8, 2023 Filing 10 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Pursuant to Civ. L.R. 6-1(b), 6-2, and 7-12 to Hold Deadlines in Abeyance, and to Vacate the Order Setting Initial Case Management Conference and ADR Deadlines re #6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines filed by Martha Guzman, Michael Regan, U.S. Environmental Protection Agency and Center for Community Action and Environmental Justice. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rigau, Mark) (Filed on 9/8/2023) Modified on 9/8/2023 (jml, COURT STAFF).
August 1, 2023 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Center for Community Action and Environmental Justice.. (Newell, Brent) (Filed on 8/1/2023)
July 24, 2023 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Center for Community Action and Environmental Justice (Newell, Brent) (Filed on 7/24/2023)
July 24, 2023 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Center for Community Action and Environmental Justice. Martha Guzman served on 7/21/2023, answer due 9/19/2023; Michael Regan served on 7/21/2023, answer due 9/19/2023; U.S. Environmental Protection Agency served on 7/21/2023, answer due 9/19/2023. (Newell, Brent) (Filed on 7/24/2023)
July 20, 2023 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/10/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/17/2023 01:30 PM in Oakland, - To be determined. (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2023)
July 20, 2023 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Martha Guzman, Michael Regan, U.S. Environmental Protection Agency, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2023)
July 19, 2023 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Entities by Center for Community Action and Environmental Justice (Newell, Brent) (Filed on 7/19/2023)
July 19, 2023 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/2/2023. (bar, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2023)
July 19, 2023 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Newell, Brent) (Filed on 7/19/2023)
July 19, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Injunctive and Declaratory Relief against Martha Guzman, Michael Regan, U.S. Environmental Protection Agency ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-18462080.). Filed byCenter for Community Action and Environmental Justice. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1)(Newell, Brent) (Filed on 7/19/2023)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Center for Community Action and Environmental Justice v. U.S. Environmental Protection Agency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center for Community Action and Environmental Justice
Represented By: Brent Joseph Newell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Environmental Protection Agency
Represented By: Mark Albert Rigau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Regan
Represented By: Mark Albert Rigau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martha Guzman
Represented By: Mark Albert Rigau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?