East Yard Communities for Environmental Justice et al v. United States Environmental Protection Agency et al
Plaintiff: East Yard Communities for Environmental Justice, People's Collective for Environmental Justice, Sierra Club and Communities for a Better Environment
Defendant: United States Environmental Protection Agency, Michael Regan, in his official capacity as Administrator of the United States Environmental Protection Agency, Martha Guzman, in her official capacity as Regional Administrator for Region 9 of the United States Environmental Protection Agency, Michael Regan and Martha Guzman
Case Number: 4:2023cv04448
Filed: August 29, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Referring Judge: Alex G Tse
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 7604 Clear Air Act (Emission Standards)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 20, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for all further proceedings. Judge Vince Chhabria no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by The Clerk on 10/20/2023. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bar, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2023)
October 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER RELATING CASE. 3:23-cv-04448-AGT is related to 4:23-cv-03571-YGR. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 10/19/2023. (eac, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2023)
October 19, 2023 Filing 15 REASSIGNED CASE - NOTICE OF NEW HEARING DATE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Vince Chhabria upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Chhabria's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. Joint Case Management Statement due by 11/24/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/1/2023 at 10:00 AM by Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/vc Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. One list of names of all counsel appearing for all parties must be sent in one email to the CRD at vccrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than Friday, November 24, 2023, by no later than 10:00AM.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(bxs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2023)
October 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Vince Chhabria for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Clerk on 10/19/2023. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2023)
October 18, 2023 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (shy, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2023)
October 18, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE by Martha Guzman, Michael Regan, United States Environmental Protection Agency re #9 Notice (Other) Notice of Filing in case CCAEJ v. EPA, Case No. 4:23-cv-03571-YGR (Attachments: #1 Exhibit As Filed in CCAEJ ECF No. 17 Stipulation and Joint Motions, #2 Exhibit As Filed in CCAEJ ECF No. 17-1 Notice of Related Case filed in this action, #3 Exhibit As filed in CCAEJ ECF No. 17-2 Proposed Order)(Rigau, Mark) (Filed on 10/18/2023)
October 18, 2023 Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Martha Guzman, Michael Regan, United States Environmental Protection Agency.. (Rigau, Mark) (Filed on 10/18/2023)
October 5, 2023 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by East Yard Communities for Environmental Justice, Communities for a Better Environment, Sierra Club, People's Collective for Environmental Justice. All Defendants. (Hsu, Regina) (Filed on 10/5/2023)
October 5, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE by Communities for a Better Environment, East Yard Communities for Environmental Justice, People's Collective for Environmental Justice, Sierra Club (Hsu, Regina) (Filed on 10/5/2023)
August 31, 2023 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Martha Guzman, Michael Regan, United States Environmental Protection Agency, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2023)
August 30, 2023 Filing 7 Proposed Summons. (Hsu, Regina) (Filed on 8/30/2023)
August 30, 2023 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/24/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/1/2023 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom A, 15th Floor. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2023)
August 30, 2023 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect PDF attached. [err201]. Submit one summons for all defendants. Attach additional sheets if necessary.This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #4 Proposed Summons filed by Communities for a Better Environment, East Yard Communities for Environmental Justice, Sierra Club, People's Collective for Environmental Justice (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2023)
August 29, 2023 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/12/2023. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2023)
August 29, 2023 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. (Hsu, Regina) (Filed on 8/29/2023)
August 29, 2023 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Communities for a Better Environment, East Yard Communities for Environmental Justice, People's Collective for Environmental Justice, Sierra Club (Hsu, Regina) (Filed on 8/29/2023)
August 29, 2023 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet by Communities for a Better Environment, East Yard Communities for Environmental Justice, People's Collective for Environmental Justice, Sierra Club . (Hsu, Regina) (Filed on 8/29/2023)
August 29, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against Martha Guzman, in her official capacity as Regional Administrator for Region 9 of the United States Environmental Protection Agency, Michael Regan, in his official capacity as Administrator of the United States Environmental Protection Agency, United States Environmental Protection Agency ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-18596931.). Filed byEast Yard Communities for Environmental Justice, Communities for a Better Environment, Sierra Club, People's Collective for Environmental Justice. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hsu, Regina) (Filed on 8/29/2023)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: East Yard Communities for Environmental Justice et al v. United States Environmental Protection Agency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: East Yard Communities for Environmental Justice
Represented By: Adriano Lucas Martinez
Represented By: Regina Jessica Hsu
Represented By: Candice Youngblood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: People's Collective for Environmental Justice
Represented By: Adriano Lucas Martinez
Represented By: Candice Youngblood
Represented By: Regina Jessica Hsu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sierra Club
Represented By: Adriano Lucas Martinez
Represented By: Regina Jessica Hsu
Represented By: Candice Youngblood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Communities for a Better Environment
Represented By: Regina Jessica Hsu
Represented By: Tyler Earl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Environmental Protection Agency
Represented By: Mark Albert Rigau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Regan, in his official capacity as Administrator of the United States Environmental Protection Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martha Guzman, in her official capacity as Regional Administrator for Region 9 of the United States Environmental Protection Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Regan
Represented By: Mark Albert Rigau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martha Guzman
Represented By: Mark Albert Rigau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?