Tritt et al v. 3 Commas Technologies OU
Plaintiff: Lorne Tritt, Bruce Johnson and Joseph Fishman
Defendant: 3Commas Technologies OU
Case Number: 4:2023cv04893
Filed: September 25, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Donna M Ryu
Referring Judge: Jon S Tigar
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Property
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #17 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Candace N. Smith.(mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2023)
November 14, 2023 Filing 17 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18832407.) filed by Joseph Fishman, Bruce Johnson, Lorne Tritt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Smith, Candace) (Filed on 11/14/2023)
October 23, 2023 Filing 16 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Case Management Statement due by 1/30/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/6/2024 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jst Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A combined list of names of counsel appearing for all parties must be sent in one email to the CRD at JSTCRD@cand.uscourts.gov no later than February 5, 2024 by 2:00 p.m.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Case Management Statement due by 1/30/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/6/2024 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. (mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2023)
October 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by The Clerk on 10/23/2023. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bar, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2023)
October 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER RELATING CASE 23-cv-04893-JSC to 4:23-cv-00101-JST., Motions terminated: (22 in 4:23-cv-00101-JST) MOTION to Relate Case filed by Fishman Joseph, Bruce Johnson, Lorne Tritt. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 23, 2023. (mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2023)
October 16, 2023 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE RESCHEDULING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Initial Case Management Conference is reset for 1/4/2024 at 1:30 p.m. before Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by a Zoom webinar. Case Management Statement is due by 12/28/2023. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jsc Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names must be sent to the CRD at JSCcrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than noon on 1/3/2024.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2023)
October 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley for all further proceedings. Chief Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by The Clerk on 10/11/2023. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bar, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2023)
October 10, 2023 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2023)
October 10, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE by Joseph Fishman, Bruce Johnson, Lorne Tritt Notice of Filing Administrative Motion to Relate (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Mehdi, Azra) (Filed on 10/10/2023)
October 10, 2023 #Electronic filing error. Duplicate entry. [err103]Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #9 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge, filed by Bruce Johnson, Joseph Fishman, Lorne Tritt, #8 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge, filed by Bruce Johnson, Joseph Fishman, Lorne Tritt (krp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2023)
October 9, 2023 Filing 9 ***FILING ERROR. DISREGARD. DUPLICATE. SEE DKT #7 .***.CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Joseph Fishman, Bruce Johnson, Lorne Tritt.. (Mehdi, Azra) (Filed on 10/9/2023) Modified Text on 10/10/2023 (krp, COURT STAFF).
October 9, 2023 Filing 8 ***FILING ERROR. DISREGARD. DUPLICATE. SEE DKT #7 .***. CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Joseph Fishman, Bruce Johnson, Lorne Tritt.. (Mehdi, Azra) (Filed on 10/9/2023) Modified Text on 10/10/2023 (krp, COURT STAFF).
October 6, 2023 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Joseph Fishman, Bruce Johnson, Lorne Tritt.. (Mehdi, Azra) (Filed on 10/6/2023)
October 6, 2023 #Electronic filing error. Judge name or initials are incorrect/missing. Counsel need not re-file the document, but should reference the correct judge name/initials on future filings. Re: #7 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge filed by Bruce Johnson, Joseph Fishman, Lorne Tritt (krp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2023)
October 4, 2023 Filing 6 Certificate of Interested Entities by Joseph Fishman, Bruce Johnson, Lorne Tritt (Mehdi, Azra) (Filed on 10/4/2023)
September 25, 2023 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/27/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/3/2024 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (krp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2023)
September 25, 2023 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to 3Commas Technologies OU. (krp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2023)
September 25, 2023 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/10/2023. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2023)
September 25, 2023 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Mehdi, Azra) (Filed on 9/25/2023)
September 25, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 3Commas Technologies OU ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-18675650.). Filed by Lorne Tritt, Joseph Fishman, Bruce Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mehdi, Azra) (Filed on 9/25/2023) Modified on 9/25/2023 (bw, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tritt et al v. 3 Commas Technologies OU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorne Tritt
Represented By: Azra Z. Mehdi
Represented By: Candace Noelle Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce Johnson
Represented By: Azra Z. Mehdi
Represented By: Candace Noelle Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Fishman
Represented By: Azra Z. Mehdi
Represented By: Candace Noelle Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3Commas Technologies OU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?