Fire and Police Pension Association of Colorado v. Baker et al
Plaintiff: Fire & Police Pension Assocation of Colorado and Fire and Police Pension Association of Colorado
Defendant: John D. Baker, II, Steven D. Black, Muneera S. Carr, Mark A. Chancy, Celeste A. Clark, Theodore F. Craver, Jr., Richard K. Davis, Elizabeth A. Duke, Derek A. Flowers, Wayne M. Hewett, Donald M. James, Cecelia G. Morken, Maria R. Morris, Charles H. Noski, Felicia F. Norwood, C. Allen Parker, Richard B. Payne, Jr., Scott E. Powell, Juan A. Pujadas, James H. Quigley, Michael P. Santomassimo, Ronald L. Sargent, Charles W. Scharf, Timothy J. Sloan, Suzanne M. Vautrinot and Wells Fargo & Company
Case Number: 4:2023cv05112
Filed: October 5, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Donna M Ryu
Referring Judge: Jon S Tigar
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Securities Violation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2023 Filing 45 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jon S. Tigar: Motion Hearing held via Zoom on 12/7/2023. Re (48 in 4:23-cv-02445-JST) MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel Plaintiffs Thomas E. Martin, John E. Sickle, Jr., John R. Sindyla, Timothy L. Miller, Todd Alishusky, and Dan Findley in Their Capacities as Trustees of Sheet Metal Workers Local No. 33 (Cleveland D filed by Timothy L. Miller, John R. Sindyla, Dan Findley, John E. Sickle, Jr., Todd Alishusky, Thomas E. Martin, (24 in 4:23-cv-03564-JST, 24 in 4:23-cv-03564-JST) Cross MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel City of Hollywood Firefighters' Pension System and Kessler Topaz Meltzer & Check, LLPCross MOTION to Consolidate Cases 4:23-cv-02445-JST and 4:23-cv-03564-JST filed by City of Hollywood Firefighters' Pension System, (23 in 4:23-cv-03564-JST) MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel Plaintiffs Thomas E. Martin, John E. Sickle, Jr., John R. Sindyla, Timothy L. Miller, Todd Alishusky, and Dan Findley in Their Capacities as Trustees of Sheet Metal Workers Local No. 33 (Cleveland D filed by Timothy L. Miller, John R. Sindyla, Dan Findley, John E. Sickle, Jr., Todd Alishusky, Thomas E. Martin, (50 in 4:23-cv-02445-JST, 50 in 4:23-cv-02445-JST) Cross MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel City of Hollywood Firefighters' Pension System and Kessler Topaz Meltzer & Check, LLPCross MOTION to Consolidate Cases 4:23-cv-02445-JST and 4:23-cv-03564-JST filed by City of Hollywood Firefighters' Pension System, (81 in 4:23-cv-02445-JST) MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel Fire and Police Pension Association of Colorado and Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein, LLP filed by Fire & Police Pension Association of Colorado Total Time in Court: 41 minutes. Court Reporter: Stephen Franklin. Plaintiff Attorney: See Minutes. Defendant Attorney: See Minutes. Attachment: Civil Minutes. (tl, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/7/2023)
December 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #41 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Sean Adam Petterson.(tl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2023)
December 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #40 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Nicholas Robert Diamand.(tl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2023)
December 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #38 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Michelle A. Polizzano.(tl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2023)
December 6, 2023 Filing 41 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18911608.) filed by Fire and Police Pension Association of Colorado. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Petterson, Sean) (Filed on 12/6/2023)
December 6, 2023 Filing 40 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-18911378.) Filing fee previously paid on 12/06/2023 filed by Fire and Police Pension Association of Colorado. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Diamand, Nicholas) (Filed on 12/6/2023)
December 4, 2023 Filing 39 Defendant C. Allen Parker's Certification of Conflicts and Interested Entities or Persons Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 3-15 by C. Allen Parker (Wilkinson, Phillip) (Filed on 12/4/2023) Modified on 12/5/2023 (anj, COURT STAFF).
December 4, 2023 Filing 38 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Michelle Polizzano ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18900584.) filed by John D. Baker, II, Steven D. Black, Mark A. Chancy, Celeste A. Clark, Theodore F. Craver, Jr, Richard K. Davis, Wayne M. Hewett, Donald M. James, Cecelia G. Morken, Maria R. Morris, Felicia F. Norwood, Charles H. Noski, Richard B. Payne, Jr, Juan A. Pujadas, Ronald L. Sargent, Suzanne M. Vautrinot. (Polizzano, Michelle) (Filed on 12/4/2023)
November 30, 2023 Filing 37 Certificate of Interested Entities by Charles W. Scharf (Hou, Victor) (Filed on 11/30/2023)
November 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #34 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Mark E. McDonald.(mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2023)
November 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #33 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Victor Hou.(mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2023)
November 28, 2023 Filing 34 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18874203.) filed by Charles W. Scharf. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(McDonald, Mark) (Filed on 11/28/2023)
November 28, 2023 Filing 33 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18874099.) Filing fee previously paid on 11/28/2023 filed by Charles W. Scharf. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Hou, Victor) (Filed on 11/28/2023)
November 28, 2023 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Kennedy Park (Park, Jennifer) (Filed on 11/28/2023)
November 16, 2023 Filing 31 Certificate of Interested Entities by John D. Baker, II, Steven D. Black, Mark A. Chancy, Celeste A. Clark, Theodore F. Craver, Jr, Richard K. Davis, Wayne M. Hewett, Donald M. James, Cecelia G. Morken, Maria R. Morris, Felicia F. Norwood, Charles H. Noski, Richard B. Payne, Jr, Juan A. Pujadas, Ronald L. Sargent, Suzanne M. Vautrinot (Cording, Charles) (Filed on 11/16/2023)
November 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #28 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Charles D. Cording.(mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2023)
November 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #27 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Todd Cosenza.(mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2023)
November 14, 2023 Filing 28 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18835360.) filed by John D. Baker, II, Steven D. Black, Mark A. Chancy, Celeste A. Clark, Theodore F. Craver, Jr, Richard K. Davis, Wayne M. Hewett, Donald M. James, Cecelia G. Morken, Maria R. Morris, Felicia F. Norwood, Charles H. Noski, Richard B. Payne, Jr, Juan A. Pujadas, Ronald L. Sargent, Suzanne M. Vautrinot. (Cording, Charles) (Filed on 11/14/2023)
November 14, 2023 Filing 27 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18835008.) filed by John D. Baker, II, Steven D. Black, Mark A. Chancy, Celeste A. Clark, Theodore F. Craver, Jr, Richard K. Davis, Wayne M. Hewett, Donald M. James, Cecelia G. Morken, Maria R. Morris, Felicia F. Norwood, Charles H. Noski, Richard B. Payne, Jr, Juan A. Pujadas, Ronald L. Sargent, Suzanne M. Vautrinot. (Cosenza, Todd) (Filed on 11/14/2023)
November 14, 2023 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander L. Cheney (Cheney, Alexander) (Filed on 11/14/2023)
November 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #24 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Karin A. DeMasi.(mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2023)
October 31, 2023 Filing 24 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18793944.) filed by C. Allen Parker. (DeMasi, Karin) (Filed on 10/31/2023)
October 27, 2023 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Phillip Hoyt Cordero Wilkinson (Wilkinson, Phillip) (Filed on 10/27/2023)
October 27, 2023 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan H. Heckenlively (Heckenlively, Bryan) (Filed on 10/27/2023)
October 27, 2023 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle W. Mach (Mach, Kyle) (Filed on 10/27/2023)
October 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER TO CONTINUE NOVEMBER 2, 2023 HEARING ON STATE PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO INTERVENE AND STAY OR DISMISS THE HOLLYWOOD AND MARTIN ACTIONS re (44 in 4:23-cv-03564-JST) MOTION to Intervene. Motion Hearing set for 2/1/2024 at 2:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Signed by Judge Tigar on 10/20/2023. (jlg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2023)
October 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT re (51 in 4:23-cv-03564-JST) Order on Stipulation, (67 in 4:23-cv-02445-JST) Order on Stipulation, (14 in 4:23-cv-05112-JST) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re: Service and to Extend Deadline to Respond to Complaint filed by Richard K. Davis, C. Allen Parker, Elizabeth A. Duke, Donald M. James, Timothy J. Sloan, Maria R. Morris, Scott E. Powell, Felicia F. Norwood, Wayne M. Hewett, Cecelia G. Morken, Ronald L. Sargent, Suzanne M. Vautrinot, Juan A. Pujadas, Celeste A. Clark, James H. Quigley, Steven D. Black, Wells Fargo & Company, Derek A. Flowers, Mark A. Chancy, Charles H. Noski, John D. Baker, II, Theodore F. Craver, Jr., Michael P. Santomassimo, Charles W. Scharf, Richard B. Payne, Jr., Muneera S. Carr. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 19,2023. (mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2023)
October 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar denying #3 Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Another Party's Material Should Be Sealed.(mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2023)
October 17, 2023 Filing 17 COMPLAINT (Unredacted) (Corrected Verified Shareholder Derivative Complaint re: docket no. #15 ) against John D. Baker, II, Steven D. Black, Muneera S. Carr, Mark A. Chancy, Celeste A. Clark, Theodore F. Craver, Jr, Richard K. Davis, Elizabeth A. Duke, Derek A. Flowers, Wayne M. Hewett, Donald M. James, Cecelia G. Morken, Maria R. Morris, Felicia F. Norwood, Charles H. Noski, C. Allen Parker, Richard B. Payne, Jr, Scott E. Powell, Juan A. Pujadas, James H. Quigley, Michael P. Santomassimo, Ronald L. Sargent, Charles W. Scharf, Timothy J. Sloan, Suzanne M. Vautrinot, Wells Fargo & Company. Filed byFire and Police Pension Association of Colorado. (Lubin, Katherine) (Filed on 10/17/2023) Modified on 10/17/2023 (anj, COURT STAFF).
October 17, 2023 Filing 16 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Case Management Statement due by 1/16/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/23/2024 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jst Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A combined list of names of all counsel appearing for all parties must be sent in one email to the CRD at JSTCRD@cand.uscourts.gov no later than January 22, 2024 by 2:00 p.m.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Case Management Statement due by 1/16/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/23/2024 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2023)
October 16, 2023 Filing 15 DISREGARD: See corrected filing at docket no. #17 .- COMPLAINT (Unredacted) Verified Shareholder Derivative Complaint against John D. Baker, II, Steven D. Black, Muneera S. Carr, Mark A. Chancy, Celeste A. Clark, Theodore F. Craver, Jr, Richard K. Davis, Elizabeth A. Duke, Derek A. Flowers, Wayne M. Hewett, Donald M. James, Cecelia G. Morken, Maria R. Morris, Felicia F. Norwood, Charles H. Noski, C. Allen Parker, Richard B. Payne, Jr, Scott E. Powell, Juan A. Pujadas, James H. Quigley, Michael P. Santomassimo, Ronald L. Sargent, Charles W. Scharf, Timothy J. Sloan, Suzanne M. Vautrinot, Wells Fargo & Company. Filed byFire and Police Pension Association of Colorado. (Lubin, Katherine) (Filed on 10/16/2023) Modified on 10/17/2023 (anj, COURT STAFF).
October 16, 2023 Filing 14 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re: Service and to Extend Deadline to Respond to Complaint filed by Muneera S. Carr, Derek A. Flowers, Scott E. Powell, Michael P. Santomassimo, Wells Fargo & Company, John D. Baker II, Steven D. Black, Mark A. Chancy, Celeste A. Clark, Theodore F. Craver, Jr., Richard K. Davis, Wayne M. Hewett, Donald M. James, Cecelia G. Morken, Maria R. Morris, Charles H. Noski, Felicia F. Norwood, Juan A. Pujadas, Richard B. Payne, Jr., Ronald L. Sargent, and Suzanne M. Vautrinot, Charles W. Scharf, Timothy J. Sloan, C. Allen Parker, Elizabeth A. Duke and James H. Quigley, Fire and Police Pension Association of Colorado, . (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brendan P. Cullen)(Cullen, Brendan) (Filed on 10/16/2023) Modified on 10/17/2023 (anj, COURT STAFF).
October 16, 2023 Filing 13 Certificate of Interested Entities by Elizabeth A. Duke, James H. Quigley (Gueli, John) (Filed on 10/16/2023)
October 16, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Hector Rees Laguardia for Defendants Elizabeth A. Duke and James H. Quigley (Laguardia, Daniel) (Filed on 10/16/2023)
October 16, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by John Gueli for Defendants Elizabeth A. Duke and James H. Quigley (Gueli, John) (Filed on 10/16/2023)
October 16, 2023 Filing 10 Statement re #3 Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Another Party's Material Should Be Sealed by Wells Fargo & Company. (Cullen, Brendan) (Filed on 10/16/2023)
October 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Chief Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by The Clerk on 10/11/2023. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bar, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2023)
October 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RELATING CASE 23-cv-05112-DMR to 23-cv-02445-JST. Motions terminated: (80 in 4:23-cv-02445-JST) ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related filed by Fire & Police Pension Association of Colorado. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 11, 2023. (mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2023)
October 10, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Collinge Lubin (Lubin, Katherine) (Filed on 10/10/2023)
October 10, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Martin Heimann (Heimann, Richard) (Filed on 10/10/2023)
October 6, 2023 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/27/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/3/2024 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (anj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2023)
October 5, 2023 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/19/2023. (bar, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2023)
October 5, 2023 Filing 3 Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Another Party's Material Should Be Sealed filed by Fire and Police Pension Association of Colorado. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sean A. Petterson, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Verified Shareholder Derivative Complaint)(Lubin, Katherine) (Filed on 10/5/2023) Modified on 10/6/2023 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
October 5, 2023 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Fire and Police Pension Association of Colorado (Lubin, Katherine) (Filed on 10/5/2023) Modified on 10/6/2023 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
October 5, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand (No Process)- Verified Shareholder Derivative Complaint against John D. Baker, II, Steven D. Black, Muneera S. Carr, Mark A. Chancy, Celeste A. Clark, Theodore F. Craver, Jr, Richard K. Davis, Elizabeth A. Duke, Derek A. Flowers, Wayne M. Hewett, Donald M. James, Cecelia G. Morken, Maria R. Morris, Felicia F. Norwood, Charles H. Noski, C. Allen Parker, Richard B. Payne, Jr, Scott E. Powell, Juan A. Pujadas, James H. Quigley, Michael P. Santomassimo, Ronald L. Sargent, Charles W. Scharf, Timothy J. Sloan, Suzanne M. Vautrinot, Wells Fargo & Company ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-18712095.). Filed by Fire and Police Pension Association of Colorado. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lubin, Katherine) (Filed on 10/5/2023) Modified on 10/6/2023 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 10/6/2023 (anj, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fire and Police Pension Association of Colorado v. Baker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fire & Police Pension Assocation of Colorado
Represented By: Katherine Collinge Lubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fire and Police Pension Association of Colorado
Represented By: Richard Martin Heimann
Represented By: Nicholas Diamand
Represented By: Sean Adam Petterson
Represented By: Katherine Collinge Lubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John D. Baker, II
Represented By: Alexander L. Cheney
Represented By: Charles Dean Cording
Represented By: Michelle Anne Polizzano
Represented By: Todd G. Cosenza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven D. Black
Represented By: Alexander L. Cheney
Represented By: Charles Dean Cording
Represented By: Michelle Anne Polizzano
Represented By: Todd G. Cosenza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Muneera S. Carr
Represented By: Brendan P. Cullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark A. Chancy
Represented By: Alexander L. Cheney
Represented By: Charles Dean Cording
Represented By: Michelle Anne Polizzano
Represented By: Todd G. Cosenza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Celeste A. Clark
Represented By: Alexander L. Cheney
Represented By: Charles Dean Cording
Represented By: Michelle Anne Polizzano
Represented By: Todd G. Cosenza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theodore F. Craver, Jr.
Represented By: Alexander L. Cheney
Represented By: Charles Dean Cording
Represented By: Michelle Anne Polizzano
Represented By: Todd G. Cosenza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard K. Davis
Represented By: Alexander L. Cheney
Represented By: Charles Dean Cording
Represented By: Michelle Anne Polizzano
Represented By: Todd G. Cosenza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth A. Duke
Represented By: Daniel Hector Rees Laguardia
Represented By: John Gueli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derek A. Flowers
Represented By: Brendan P. Cullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne M. Hewett
Represented By: Alexander L. Cheney
Represented By: Charles Dean Cording
Represented By: Michelle Anne Polizzano
Represented By: Todd G. Cosenza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald M. James
Represented By: Alexander L. Cheney
Represented By: Charles Dean Cording
Represented By: Michelle Anne Polizzano
Represented By: Todd G. Cosenza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cecelia G. Morken
Represented By: Alexander L. Cheney
Represented By: Charles Dean Cording
Represented By: Michelle Anne Polizzano
Represented By: Todd G. Cosenza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria R. Morris
Represented By: Alexander L. Cheney
Represented By: Charles Dean Cording
Represented By: Michelle Anne Polizzano
Represented By: Todd G. Cosenza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles H. Noski
Represented By: Alexander L. Cheney
Represented By: Charles Dean Cording
Represented By: Michelle Anne Polizzano
Represented By: Todd G. Cosenza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Felicia F. Norwood
Represented By: Alexander L. Cheney
Represented By: Charles Dean Cording
Represented By: Michelle Anne Polizzano
Represented By: Todd G. Cosenza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Allen Parker
Represented By: Kyle W. Mach
Represented By: Bryan H. Heckenlively
Represented By: Karin A DeMasi
Represented By: Phillip Hoyt Cordero Wilkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard B. Payne, Jr.
Represented By: Alexander L. Cheney
Represented By: Charles Dean Cording
Represented By: Michelle Anne Polizzano
Represented By: Todd G. Cosenza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott E. Powell
Represented By: Brendan P. Cullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juan A. Pujadas
Represented By: Alexander L. Cheney
Represented By: Charles Dean Cording
Represented By: Michelle Anne Polizzano
Represented By: Todd G. Cosenza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James H. Quigley
Represented By: Daniel Hector Rees Laguardia
Represented By: John Gueli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael P. Santomassimo
Represented By: Brendan P. Cullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald L. Sargent
Represented By: Alexander L. Cheney
Represented By: Charles Dean Cording
Represented By: Michelle Anne Polizzano
Represented By: Todd G. Cosenza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles W. Scharf
Represented By: Jennifer Kennedy Park
Represented By: Mark E McDonald
Represented By: Victor L. Hou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy J. Sloan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suzanne M. Vautrinot
Represented By: Charles Dean Cording
Represented By: Michelle Anne Polizzano
Represented By: Todd G. Cosenza
Represented By: Alexander L. Cheney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo & Company
Represented By: Brendan P. Cullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?