Saba et al v. BMW of North America LLC
Plaintiff: Joanne Saba and Jacob Saba
Defendant: BMW of North America LLC
Case Number: 4:2023cv05133
Filed: October 6, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Joseph C Spero
Referring Judge: Jon S Tigar
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 10, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2023 Filing 17 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Case Management Statement due by 2/6/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/13/2024 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jst Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A combined list of names of all counsel appearing for all parties must be sent in one email to the CRD at JSTCRD@cand.uscourts.gov no later than February 12, 2024 by 2:00 p.m.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Case Management Statement due by 2/6/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/13/2024 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. (mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2023)
November 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 11/6/2023. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(ark, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2023)
November 6, 2023 Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2023)
November 3, 2023 Filing 14 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by BMW of North America LLC.. (Haddad, Georges) (Filed on 11/3/2023)
November 3, 2023 Filing 13 SECOND CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: #http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party was also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 11/17/2023. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jaf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2023)
October 27, 2023 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint by BMW of North America LLC. (Wagner, C. Brian) (Filed on 10/27/2023)
October 13, 2023 Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Jacob Saba, Joanne Saba.. (Oppenheim, Michael) (Filed on 10/13/2023)
October 11, 2023 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joanne Saba, Jacob Saba. BMW of North America LLC served on 10/10/2023, answer due 10/31/2023. (Daghighian, Sepehr) (Filed on 10/11/2023)
October 10, 2023 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to BMW of North America LLC. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2023)
October 6, 2023 Filing 8 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/29/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/5/2024 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom D, 15th Floor. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2023)
October 6, 2023 Filing 7 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/20/2023. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2023)
October 6, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael William Oppenheim (Oppenheim, Michael) (Filed on 10/6/2023)
October 6, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Harris Rosenstein (Rosenstein, Michael) (Filed on 10/6/2023)
October 6, 2023 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. (Daghighian, Sepehr) (Filed on 10/6/2023)
October 6, 2023 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Jacob Saba, Joanne Saba (Daghighian, Sepehr) (Filed on 10/6/2023)
October 6, 2023 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet by Jacob Saba, Joanne Saba . (Daghighian, Sepehr) (Filed on 10/6/2023)
October 6, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BMW of North America LLC ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-18715144.). Filed byJoanne Saba, Jacob Saba. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - RISC, #2 Exhibit B - Statement of Information)(Daghighian, Sepehr) (Filed on 10/6/2023)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Saba et al v. BMW of North America LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joanne Saba
Represented By: Sepehr Daghighian
Represented By: Michael William Oppenheim
Represented By: Michael Harris Rosenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob Saba
Represented By: Michael William Oppenheim
Represented By: Michael Harris Rosenstein
Represented By: Sepehr Daghighian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BMW of North America LLC
Represented By: C. Brian Wagner
Represented By: Brian Ming Hom
Represented By: Georges A. Haddad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?